Winn et al v. Guardian Management, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:04-cv-06307
Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 6:17 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jeanette Schiwal, Plaintiff
No Logo June Waters, Plaintiff
No Logo Vicki Winn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Jean Gast +2655 265 265 5305 linda.gast@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Johnson +1 503 473 8310 +1 503 295 0676 ejohnson@oregonlawcenter.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur E. Schmidt +1 503 473 8316 +1 503 295 0676 aschmidt@oregonlawcenter.org
v.
No Logo Guardian Management, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Leichtfuss +1 503 778 5286 +1 503 778 5299 peterleichtfuss@dwt.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 405
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
Order Dismissing Case: Counsel having informed the Court that this action has been settled, This action is dismissed with prejudice, without costs and with leave for good cause shown within 60 days, to have the dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if settlement is not consummated. Signed on 2/28/05 by Clerk. (ljb, ) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
    CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Proceedings: Settlement Conference held 2/28/05. Case settles. Ordered Clerk enter 60 day order of dismissal. The court retains jurisdiction over the settlement agreement. Ann L. Aiken presiding. (lae, ) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
      CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Ann L. Aiken: Settlement Conference set for 2/28/2005 at 10:00AM in Portland before Judge Ann L. Aiken. PRESENCE OF ALL PARTIES WITH SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY REQUIRED. Settlement documents to be submitted by 4:30PM, 2/22/05. Click on main document number hyperlink for complete text of minute order and settlement document instructions. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Attachments: # 1 Settlement document instructions) (lae, ) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
        CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Proceedings: Telephone Rule 16 Conference held. Case schedule reset as follows: Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 4/28/2005. Discovery to be completed by 3/28/2005.Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2005. Pretrial Documents due by 6/13/2005. Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2005 at 10:00AM in Eugene before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. 2-day Jury Trial set for 7/12/2005 at 09:00AM in Eugene before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Linda Gast present as counsel for plaintiffs. Peter Leichtfuss present as counsel for defendant. Thomas M. Coffin presiding. (cw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None
          Notice of Appearance of attorney Arthur E. Schmidt. Filed by Arthur E. Schmidt appearing on behalf of Jeanette Schiwal, June Waters, Vicki Winn.(ljb, ) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
            Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (sln, ) (Entered: 10/05/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
              CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Thomas M. Coffin. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/6/2004 at 09:30AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. The court will initiate the call. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, magistrate consent, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Ordered issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. Pursuant to this minute order the parties are relieved of their responsibility set forth in the Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, Section (c). (cw, ) (Entered: 10/05/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by Jeanette Schiwal, June Waters, Vicki Winn.(ljb, ) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None
                  Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Guardian Management, LLC. (Leichtfuss, Peter) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None
                    Answer to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses By Defendant Guardian Management, LLC. Filed by Guardian Management, LLC.(Leichtfuss, Peter) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None
                      Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment. Discovery to be completed by 12/28/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 1/27/2005.Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2005. (ljb, ) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None
                        Complaint Filing Fee in amount of $150.00 collected. Receipt No. 177318 issued.Summons issued as to Defendant Guardian Management, LLC.Filed by Jeanette Schiwal, June Waters, Vicki Winn against Guardian Management, LLC.(ljb, ) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 201 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?