USA v. Crinel et al
Criminal Case Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cr-00061-SM-JCW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 25, 2018 at 9:34 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andre Jude Lagarde +1 504 680 3009 andre.lagarde@usdoj.gov
Space Sharan Ellen Lieberman +1 504 680 3129 sharan.lieberman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lisa A. Crinel, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Chaffe McCall, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/05/2015, Designation: Retained Walter F Becker, Jr. +1 504 585 7046 +1 504 544 6071 becker@chaffe.com
TERMINATED: 08/05/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, Designation: Retained Charles Donald Marshall, III +1 504 585 7000 +1 504 585 7075 marshall@chaffe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara A. Johnson +1 504 528 9500 sara@sarajohnsonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Herbert V. Larson, Jr., Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Sara A Johnson +1 504 528 9500 saj@hvllaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Herbert Victor Larson, Jr. +1 504 528 9500 hvl@hvllaw.com
No Logo State Bank And Trust Company,, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Newman, Mathis, Brady & Spedale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A Mathis +1 504 837 9040 +1 504 834 6452 rmathis@newmanmathis.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office New Orleans
Filed 3/12/2015
County Orleans
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 - CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT HEALTH CARE FRAUD
Count 15-22
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 - HEALTH CARE FRAUD
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 - CONSPIRACY TO PAY AND RECEIVE ILLEGAL HEALTH CARE KICKBACKS
Count 23
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 - CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Count 24-26
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 and 2 - WIRE FRAUD
Count 3-13
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 - HEALTH CARE FRAUD
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags MULTI,PROTO
  Entries (1366) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1518 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
REVISED PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1517 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER AND REASONS as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden -IT IS ORDERED that the Orders of [1507] September 23 and [1508] 24, 2018 are VACATED IN PART as to the personal money judgments against Defendants Henry Evans and Michael Jones. The United States is entitled to forfeiture from Henry Evans in the amount of $13,450.93 as a personal money judgment against him and from Michael Jones in the amount of $19,235.15 as a personal money judgment against him. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn) (Main Document 1517 replaced on 9/25/2018 to correct the date of participation from 8/15/2014 to 8/15/2012) (tsf).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1516 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 sentencingCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Sentencing held on 9/24/2018 as to Shelton Barnes, Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Gregory Molden, and Jonathon Nora. Court recessed at 3:50 p.m. until September 25, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (bwn)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1515 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
        Supplemental Memorandum by Henry Evans re [1402] MOTION to Seal Sentencing Memorandum Sentencing Memorandum (Booth, Vincent)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1514 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
          RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Henry Evans. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1513 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
            RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Shelton Barnes. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1512 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
              RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Jonathon Nora. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1511 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Paula Jones. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1510 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                  RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Michael Jones. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1509 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                    PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1508 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                      ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the [1317] Motion for Forfeiture of Property filed by the United States be and hereby is GRANTED IN PART. The United States is entitled to forfeiture in the following amounts: Shelton Barnes $371,784 as a personal money judgment against him; Michael Jones $19,203.14 as a personal money judgment against him and $35,000 in the form of a money judgment against Michael Jones and Paula Jones for which they are jointly and severally liable; Paula Jones $35,000 as a money judgment against Michael Jones and Paula Jones for which they are jointly and severally liable; and Gregory Molden $50,981.30 in the form of a personal money judgment against him. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1507 Filed: 9/23/2018, Entered: 9/23/2018 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                        ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the [1317] Motion for Forfeiture of Property filed by the United States be and hereby is GRANTED IN PART. Defendant Henry Evans is required to forfeit to the United States $13,137.97, which represents payments received from his Medicare Part B billings under Healthcare Common Procedure Coding System Codes G0179, 180, and 181 after he participated in a health care fraud scheme. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1506 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: 9/22/2018 Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                          MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Ruling of September 20, 2018 by Henry Evans. Motion set for 10/17/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Memorandum in Support, # (3) Exhibit)(Booth, Vincent) Modified on 9/24/2018 to edit docket text (bwn).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 1505 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                            Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [1503] Supplemental Memorandum. **Document has been marked as filed in error. Please see rec. doc. 1504 for corrected filing.** (jls)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1504 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
                              Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum by Henry Evans. (Booth, Vincent) Modified on 9/24/2018 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1503 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
                                **FILED IN ERROR - See rec. doc. 1504 for corrected filing** Supplemental Memorandum by Henry Evans re [1402] MOTION to Seal Sentencing Memorandum (Booth, Vincent) Modified on 9/21/2018 (jls).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1501 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Request for Subpoenas
                                  Request for Subpoenas by Henry Evans. 4 subpoenas issued (Attachments: # (1) Subpoena)(Booth, Vincent) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/21/2018) (jls).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1500 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
                                    Supplemental Memorandum on Forfeiture Issues by Henry Evans re [1317] MOTION for Forfeiture of Property (Booth, Vincent) Modified on 9/24/2018 to edit docket (bwn).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1502 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Telephone Status Conference as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 9/20/2018. The parties discussed the motion for forfeiture filed by the United States and the sentencing hearing scheduled to begin on Monday, September 24, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for Defendant Henry Evans may file supplemental briefing on loss calculations by no later than Friday, September 21, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. The United States will resend the Court and all parties a copy of its Sentencing Memorandum by no later than Friday, September 21, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. (bwn)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1499 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER a Telephone Status Conference set for 9/20/2018 04:00 PM as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, and Gregory Molden. The Court will provide all parties with the call-in instructions necessary to participate in the conference via telephone. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/20/2018. (tsf)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1498 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 MEMORANDUM
                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM as to Certain Pending Asset Forfeiture Matters by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Gregory Molden filed as directed by [1497] Minute Entry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Revised Preliminary Order of Forfeiture)(Lagarde, Andre) Modified on 9/20/2018 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1497 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Telephone Status Conference as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones held on 9/14/2018. The parties discussed the United States' [1317] Motion for Forfeiture of Property. The United States will file by no later than Wednesday, September 19, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. supplemental briefing on the calculation of its proposed money judgment against Defendant Henry Evans and on the issue of double recovery in its proposed money judgment against Defendant Paula Jones. Counsel for Defendants Henry Evans, Michael Jones, and Paula Jones, may file supplemental briefing on the calculation of money judgments by the same time. The United States will also file by no later than Wednesday, September 19, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. an amended proposed judgment. (bwn)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1496 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a telephone status conference be held on Friday, September 14, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. Counsel for the United States and Defendants, Henry Evans, Paula Jones, and Michael Jones, are required to participate. Counsel for all other parties may participate but are not required to. The Court will provide all parties with the call-in instructions necessary to participate in the conference via telephone. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1495 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Paula Jones. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Attachments: # (1) Surrender Order)(Coleman, Tracy)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1494 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                  SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Michael Jones. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Attachments: # (1) Surrender Order)(Coleman, Tracy)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1493 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                    AMENDED FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Lisa A. Crinel (1). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1492 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018, Terminated: 9/5/2018 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                      EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend Final Order of Forfeiture by USA as to Lisa A. Crinel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lagarde, Andre) Modified on 8/31/2018 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1491 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                        CONSENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties [1490] joint motion is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Peoples Health, Inc., through its authorized directors, agents, attorneys, or employees, pay the sum of SIX MILLION, EIGHT HUNDRED THOUSAND DOLLARS AND ZERO CENTS ($6,800,000.00) to the Clerk of Court upon the closing of its acquisition by UnitedHealthcare. Payment as ordered above shall be made payable and sent to the "Clerk, United States District Court, Eastern District of Louisiana, Financial Unit," 500 Poydras Street, New Orleans, LA 70130, and shall bear the name of Henry Evans and criminal case number 15-61-03. These funds shall be held on deposit until further order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States' pending emergency motion to restrain asset dissipation, Rec. Doc. [1486], is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1490 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018, Terminated: 8/31/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                          EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Deposit Funds with the Court re [1486] Emergency MOTION for Order to Restrain Asset Dissipation by USA as to Henry Evans. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Mansfield, Peter) Modified on 8/30/2018 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1489 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Telephone Status Conference as to Henry Evans held on 8/30/2018. The parties discussed the United States' [1486] Emergency Motion for an Order to Restrain Asset Dissipation. Counsel will submit a consent judgment on the order to the Court. (bwn)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1488 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER Telephone Status Conference set for 8/30/2018 10:00 AM as to Henry Evans re [1486] Emergency MOTION for Order to Restrain Asset Dissipation filed by USA. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/29/2018. (tsf)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1487 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of RecordCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [1485] Motion to Enroll Peter Mansfield as Counsel of Record for the USA. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/29/2018. (tsf)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1486 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018, Terminated: 8/31/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                  EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION for Order to Restrain Asset Dissipation by USA as to Henry Evans. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Proposed Order)Attorney Peter M. Mansfield added to party USA(pty:pla).(Mansfield, Peter) Modified on 8/30/2018 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1485 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018, Terminated: 8/29/2018 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Peter Mansfield as Counsel of Record by USA as to Lisa A. Crinel, Wilneisha Harrison Jakes, Henry Evans, Threasa Adderley, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Cary Payton, Evelyn Odoms, Sheila Mathieu, Suprenia Washington, Erica Edwards, Zellisha Dejean, Caren Battaglia, Sheila Hopkins, Eleshia Williams, Verinese Sutton, PCAH, Inc., Clara Aitch, Wendy Ervin, Rhonda Maberry, Gregory Molden, Jeff Koon, Larry Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1484 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Sentencing reset for 9/24/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1483 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that sentencing for Defendants, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Henry Evans, and Gregory Molden, will commence on September 24, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. and will continue on September 25, 2018, beginning at 9:00 a.m., until sentencing of all Defendants is complete. All Defendants and defense counsel are to be in attendance. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1482 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Order on Motion for New TrialCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER AND REASONS - it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Defendant Shelton Barnes' [1074] Motion for Judgment of Acquittal and, in the Alternative for New Trial, and in the Further Alternative, to Arrest Judgment is DENIED; (2) Defendant Jonathon Nora's [1080] Motion for Judgment of Acquittal and, in the Alternative, for New Trial is DENIED; (3) Defendant Michael Jones' [1085] Renewed Motion for Judgment of Acquittal and/or Motion for New Trial is DENIED; (4) Defendant Paula Jones' [1087] Motion for Acquittal and, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial is DENIED; (5) Defendant Henry Evans' [1102] Motion for Judgment of Acquittal and Alternatively, Motion for New Trial is DENIED; and (6) Defendant Gregory Molden's [1455] Motion for Judgment of Acquittal and, in the Alternative for New Trial, and in the Further Alternative, to Arrest Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1481 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of testimony of Shontrell Guzman as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 17, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 214-753-2354. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (rsg)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1480 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of testimony of Beverly Mandolph as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 1, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1479 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of testimony mentioning Shawnto Smith as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 27, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1478 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of continuation of testimony of Leanne Dodson as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 28, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1477 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of testimony of Leanne Dodson as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 28, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1476 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of testimony of Tumulesh Solanky as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 2, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1475 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of testimony of Brenda Saizan as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 19, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 214-753-2354. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1474 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Lee Mixon as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 19, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 214-753-2354. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1473 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Verinese Sutton as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 19, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 214-753-2354. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1472 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Wendy Ervin as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 19, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 214-753-2354. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1471 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of Closing Argument of Brian Capitelli as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 5, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1470 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 12, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Tana Hess, Telephone number 843-779-0837. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1469 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 4, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504-589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1468 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 3, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504-589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1467 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 2, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504-589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1466 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Status Conference as to Lisa A. Crinel held on 8/1/2018. The parties discussed issues related to unsold property subject to the Court's [1354] final order of forfeiture. (bwn)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1464 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [1462] Motion for Hearing as to Lisa A. Crinel (1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Status Conference shall be held in chambers on Wednesday, August 1, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1462 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018, Terminated: 7/12/2018 Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MOTION for Status Conference as to 6960 Martin Dr. by USA as to Lisa A. Crinel. Motion set for 7/25/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Hearing, # (2) Proposed Order)(Lagarde, Andre) Modified on 6/28/2018 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1461 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                Supplemental Reply Memorandum by Shelton Barnes re [1445] Response/Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Rec. Docs. [1419], [1421], [1435], [1438], [1439], [1440] and [1441]. (clc)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1460 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [1458] Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum as to Shelton Barnes (7). FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant's request for oral argument is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/17/2018. (clc)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 1459 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                    Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [1458] Reply to Response to Motion. ** Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Leave to File Document. Clerk took corrective action by either re-docketing the event or changing the event. In addition, a Request for Oral Argument is required to be filed as a separate filing and should not be incorporated within the Motion.** (clc)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1458 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018, Terminated: 4/17/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                      EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Shelton Barnes re [1445] Response/Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Rec. Docs. 1419 , 1421 , 1435 , 1438 , 1439 , 1440 and 1441. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Pleading)(Castaing, Edward) Modified text on 4/13/2018 (clc).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1457 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Appeal TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Eleshia Williams as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 24, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2018. (rsg) Modified on 4/9/2018 (rsg).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1456 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Eleshia Williams as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 21, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1455 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018, Terminated: 8/27/2018 Motion for AcquittalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judgment of Acquittal and, in the Alternative for New Trial, and in the Further Alternative, to Arrest Judgment by Gregory Molden. Motion set for 4/18/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Notice of Hearing, # (3) Proposed Order for new trial, # (4) Proposed order for arrest of judgment, # (5) Proposed order for judgment of acquittal)(Moore, Harold) Modified text on 3/30/2018 (jls).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1454 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018, Terminated: 3/29/2018 motion for new trial
                                                                                                                              **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for New Trial Memorandum in support of deficient document 1437 by Gregory Molden. (Moore, Harold) Modified on 3/29/2018 (clc).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1452 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Henry Evans re [1102] MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29 MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33 (clc)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1451 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [1448] Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum as to Henry Evans (3). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/15/2018. (clc)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1450 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Paula Jones re [1087] MOTION for New Trial Under FRCP 33, and Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Under FRCP 29 (clc)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1449 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [1447] Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief as to Paula Jones (6). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/15/2018. (clc)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1448 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018, Terminated: 3/19/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                        EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Five Page Reply Memorandum by Henry Evans. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Pleading)(Booth, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1447 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018, Terminated: 3/19/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                          EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 29 and Motion for a New Trial Under F.R.C.P. 33 by Paula Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Pleading)(Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1446 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [1444] Motion to Enlarge Page Limit as to Henry Evans (3), Michael Jones (5), Paula Jones (6), Shelton Barnes (7), Jonathon Nora (8), Gregory Molden (23). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/5/2018. (clc)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1445 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Response/Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                              Response/Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden re Rec. Docs. [1419], [1421], [1435], [1438], [1439], [1440] and [1441]. (Sullivan, Patrice) Modified on 3/5/2018 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1444 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018, Terminated: 3/5/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION To Enlarge Page Limit by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1442 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                  Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [1441] Supplemental MOTION for Acquittal Memorandum.** Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Supplemental Memorandum. Clerk took corrective action by either re-docketing the event or changing the event.** (clc)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1441 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 2/20/2018 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment of Acquittal by Jonathon Nora. (Craft, John) Modified text on 2/20/2018 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1440 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Memorandum by Henry Evans re [1102] MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29 MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33 (Booth, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1439 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Memorandum by Paula Jones re [1087] MOTION for New Trial Under FRCP 33, and Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Under FRCP 29 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1438 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Memorandum by Michael Jones re [1085] MOTION for Acquittal (Renewed) MOTION for New Trial , [1418] Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing and for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum as to Pending Post Trial Motion Based Upon the Recent Gandi Decision by the Fifth Circuit (Jenkins, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1437 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018, Terminated: 2/16/2018 Motion for AcquittalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            **DEFICIENT** First MOTION for Acquittal , First MOTION for New Trial by Gregory Molden. Motion set for 3/21/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Hearing, # (2) Proposed Order)(Moore, Harold) Modified on 2/16/2018 (mmv).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1436 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 5, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1435 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Memorandum by Shelton Barnes re [1419] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum to [1074] Motion for Judgment of Acquittal, And In The Alternative for New Trial, And In The Further Alternative, To Arrest Judgment Second Supplemental Memorandum (Castaing, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1434 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the redirect testimony of Krista Bradford, as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 3, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1433 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Krista Bradford, part 2 as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 3, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1432 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Krista Bradford, Part 1, as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 2, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1431 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Sylvia Walker as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 20, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1430 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Gaynell Leal, Volume II, as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 21, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1429 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Gaynell Leal, Volume I as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 20, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1428 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Linda Johnson as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 19, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1427 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                Letters to the Court re Henry Evans. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1426 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  Letters to the Court re Henry Evans. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1425 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                    Letters to the Court re Shelton Barnes. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1424 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Testimony of Rhonda Maberry as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 1, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2018. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1453 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Memorandum by Shelton Barnes re [1074] MOTION for New Trial Motion for Judgment of Acquittal and, in the Alternative for New Trial, and in the Further Alternative, to Arrest Judgment. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1423 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING [1418] Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing and for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum as to Pending Post Trial Motion Based Upon the Recent Gandi Decision by the Fifth Circuit filed by Gregory Molden, Jonathon Nora, Shelton Barnes, Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, [1419] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum to Motion for Judgment of Acquittal, And In The Alternative for New Trial, And In The Further Alternative, To Arrest Judgment. ORDERED that the sentencing hearings for Defendants is hereby continued without date. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants may file supplemental memoranda on their respective post-trial motions. These supplemental memoranda must be filed by Friday, February 16, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. The Government's opposition to Defendants' memoranda must be filed by Friday, March 2, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/5/2018. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1422 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                            Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [1419] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum to Motion for Judgment of Acquittal, And In The Alternative for New Trial, And In The Further Alternative, To Arrest Judgment (Doc. 1074). **Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and remove submission date. ** (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1421 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Gregory Molden Addendum to Sentencing Memorandum (Moore, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1420 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [1416] Motion for Leave to File Addendum to Sentencing Memorandum as to Gregory Molden (23). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/1/2018. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1419 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018, Terminated: 2/5/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum to [1074] Motion for Judgment of Acquittal, And In The Alternative for New Trial, And In The Further Alternative, To Arrest Judgment by Shelton Barnes. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Notice of Hearing, # (3) Proposed Order )(Castaing, Edward) Modified on 2/5/2018 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1418 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018, Terminated: 2/5/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing and for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum as to Pending Post Trial Motion Based Upon the Recent Gandi Decision by the Fifth Circuit by Paula Jones , Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Simmons, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2018 to add joint filers. (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1416 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018, Terminated: 2/2/2018 motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Leave to File Addendum to Sentencing Memorandum by Gregory Molden. Motion set for 2/6/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Moore, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1402 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018, Terminated: 1/25/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Sentencing Memorandum by Henry Evans. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Booth, Vincent) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2018: # (2) Proposed Pleading) (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1401 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Manual Attachment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Manual Attachment Received and Scanned re [1399] MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Shelton Barnes' Opposition Memorandum Under Seal. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1400 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018, Terminated: 1/25/2018 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Document by Paula Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Simmons, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2018: # (2) Proposed Pleading) (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1399 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018, Terminated: 1/25/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Shelton Barnes' Opposition Memorandum Under Seal by Shelton Barnes. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Manual Attachment, # (2) Proposed Order)(Castaing, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2018: # (3) Proposed Pleading) (clc). Modified text on 1/24/2018 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1398 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Downward Departure and Variance by Michael Jones. Motion set for 2/6/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Hearing)(Jenkins, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1396 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Release of Lis Pendens by USA as to Lisa A. Crinel (Lagarde, Andre) Modified text on 1/18/2018 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1395 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RE-NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Sentencing reset for 2/6/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1394 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Telephone Status Conference as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 1/5/2018. The Court reset the date of the sentencing hearing for these Defendants to February 6, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. If necessary, the sentencing hearing will continue on February 7, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1380 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Jonathon Nora. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1379 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Paula Jones. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1378 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Michael Jones. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1377 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Henry Evans. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1376 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden - IT IS ORDERED that the Government shall submit to the Court and opposing counsel by January 17, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. a supplemental sentencing memorandum on the issue of the amount of loss attributable to each defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defense counsel shall submit to the Court and opposing counsel any response to the Government's memorandum by January 23, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the sentencing of the above defendants shall be continued from January 4, 2018, to allow the Court time for consideration of the submitted memoranda. The Court will set the date of the sentencing hearing by separate order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will hold a telephone status conference on Thursday, January 4, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. to discuss the supplemental memoranda and to set a date for the sentencing hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any sentencing memoranda and/or motions for variance or departure on issues other than the loss calculation must be filed by January 23, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1366 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [1364] First MOTION for Leave to File Post-trial Motions. **Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion.** (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1365 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of RecordCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [1362] Motion to Enroll Attorney Harold P. Moore as Additional Counsel of Record as to Gregory Molden (23). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1364 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017, Terminated: 12/28/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Post-trial Motions by Gregory Molden. (Moore, Harold) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2017: # (1) Proposed Order) (clc). Modified on 12/28/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1363 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [1362] First MOTION to Enroll Harold P. Moore as Counsel of Record . **Main Document contained a blank page. clerk removed blank page and replaced image. No further action necessary.** (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1362 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017, Terminated: 12/28/2017 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Enroll Harold P. Moore as Counsel of Record by Gregory Molden. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Moore, Harold) (Main Document 1362 replaced on 12/28/2017) (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1361 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Presentence Investigation Report - Supplemental AddendumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL ADDENDUM TO FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Shelton Barnes. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1360 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Presentence Investigation Report - Supplemental AddendumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL ADDENDUM TO FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Henry Evans. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1357 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017, Terminated: 12/21/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                **DEFICIENT** First MOTION for Leave to File Post-trial Motions by Gregory Molden. Attorney Harold Paul Moore added to party Gregory Molden(pty:dft).(Moore, Harold) Modified on 12/21/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1356 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Presentence Investigation Report - Supplemental AddendumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL ADDENDUM TO FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Paula Jones. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1355 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Presentence Investigation Report - Supplemental AddendumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL ADDENDUM TO FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Gregory Molden. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1354 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [1352] Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Lisa A. Crinel (1). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/13/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1353 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RE-NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Sentencing reset for 1/4/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1352 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017, Terminated: 12/14/2017 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Final Order of Forfeiture of Property by USA as to Lisa A. Crinel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Proposed Order)(Lagarde, Andre) Modified text on 12/13/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1351 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Sentencing set for 1/4/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/11/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1350 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [1333] Objection to Presentence Investigation Report, by USA as to Shelton Barnes . NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1349 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to [1346] Objection to Presentence Investigation Report, by USA as to Paula Jones . NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1348 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of RecordCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [1347] Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record as to Suprenia Washington (12). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/16/2017. (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1347 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017, Terminated: 11/16/2017 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Samuel J. Scillitani as Counsel of Record by Suprenia Washington. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)Attorney Samuel John Scillitani, Jr added to party Suprenia Washington(pty:dft).(Scillitani, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1346 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION to [1345] Presentence Investigation Report - Final, by Paula Jones . NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1345 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Paula Jones. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1344 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Order on motion to appoint counselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [1340] Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court appoints the Federal Public Defender to assist her in the adjustment of the terms of her probation as to Suprenia Washington (12). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/25/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1343 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to the Court re Jeff Koon (24). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1342 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letters to the Court re Lisa Crinel(1). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1339 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to the Court from Melanie J. Parent re Shelton Barnes. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1338 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Gregory Molden re [1317] MOTION for Forfeiture of Property (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1337 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [1336] Motion for Leave to File Reply brief in support of motion for a preliminary order of forfeiture as to Henry Evans (3), Michael Jones (5), Paula Jones (6), Shelton Barnes (7), Gregory Molden (23). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1340 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Suprenia Washington. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1336 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017, Terminated: 10/23/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File REPLY brief in support of motion for a preliminary order of forfeiture by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Gregory Molden. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Pleading, # (2) Proposed Order)(Sandman, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1335 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Henry Evans. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Attachments: # (1) Surrender Order)(Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1334 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REVISED FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Henry Evans. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1333 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Shelton Barnes to Final Presentence Report. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Castaing, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1332 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letters to the Court re Jonathon Nora. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1331 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to the Court from Raquel Landry dated 9/29/2017. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1330 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: 10/9/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response/Memorandum in Opposition by Paula Jones re [1317] MOTION for Forfeiture of Property (Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1329 Filed: 10/8/2017, Entered: 10/8/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response/Memorandum in Opposition by Michael Jones re [1317] MOTION for Forfeiture of Property (Jenkins, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1328 Filed: 10/7/2017, Entered: 10/7/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Jonathon Nora. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Attachments: # (1) Surrender Order)(Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1327 Filed: 10/7/2017, Entered: 10/7/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Jonathon Nora. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1326 Filed: 10/7/2017, Entered: 10/7/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Shelton Barnes. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Attachments: # (1) Suurneder Order)(Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1325 Filed: 10/7/2017, Entered: 10/7/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Shelton Barnes. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1324 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Michael Jones. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1323 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Gregory Molden. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Attachments: # (1) Surrender Order)(Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1322 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Gregory Molden. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response/Memorandum in Opposition by Henry Evans re [1317] MOTION for Forfeiture of Property (Booth, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1320 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response/Memorandum in Opposition by Shelton Barnes re [1317] MOTION for Forfeiture of Property (Castaing, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1319 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letters to the Court on behalf of Jonathan Nora (8). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1318 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [1306] Objection to Presentence Investigation Report, by USA as to Henry Evans . NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1317 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017, Terminated: 9/24/2018 Motion for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Forfeiture of Property by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Gregory Molden. Motion set for 10/18/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Notice of Hearing)Attorney Jeffrey Keith Sandman added to party USA(pty:pla).(Sandman, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/29/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1316 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Judgment-OtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Lisa Crinel (1). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/27/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1315 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [1313] Motion to Correct Judgment as to Lisa A. Crinel (1). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/27/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1314 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER finding as moot [1302] Motion to Travel as to Sheila Mathieu (11). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/27/2017. (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1313 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017, Terminated: 9/27/2017 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct [1309] Judgment by Lisa A. Crinel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Johnson, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1312 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to the Court on behalf of Henry Evans(3). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1311 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [1307] Motion to Travel as to Verinese Sutton (18). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/25/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1308 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Order to SurrenderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER TO SURRENDER as to Lisa A. Crinel on 11/20/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/21/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1307 Filed: 9/24/2017, Entered: 9/24/2017, Terminated: 9/25/2017 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Travel by Verinese Sutton. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Haedicke, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1306 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: 9/22/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to [1271] Presentence Investigation Report - Final, by Henry Evans . NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Booth, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1305 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: 9/22/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letters to the Court on behalf of Henry Evans (3). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1310 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT as to PCAH, Inc. (19), Count(s) 1, Sentenced on 9/21/2017; Count(s) 15-22, 2, 3-13, Dismissed on 9/21/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/25/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1309 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT as to Lisa A. Crinel (1), Count(s) 1, 2, Sentenced on 9/21/2017; Count(s) 15-22, 23, 24-26, 3-13, Dismissed on 9/21/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/25/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1304 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: 9/22/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Sentencing held on 9/21/2017 for PCAH, Inc. (19), Count(s) 1, Sentenced on 9/21/2017. (Court Reporter Lanie Smith.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1303 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: 9/22/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Sentencing held on 9/21/2017 for Lisa A. Crinel (1), Count(s) 1, 2, Sentenced on 9/21/2017. (Court Reporter Lanie Smith.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1302 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: 9/21/2017, Terminated: 9/27/2017 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Travel by Sheila Mathieu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Settle, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1301 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: 9/21/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to the Court as to Henry Evans (3). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1300 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: 9/21/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to the Court as to Zellisha Dejean (14). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1299 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: 9/21/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Re-arraignment as to Lisa A. Crinel, Threasa Adderley held on October 2, 2015 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Terri Hourigan. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1298 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to PSR by USA as to Michael Jones to [1200] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1297 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letters to the Court on behalf of Lisa Crinel(1). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1294 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Lisa A. Crinel. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1293 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to PSR by USA as to Shelton Barnes to [1206] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1292 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Resolution of PCAH, Inc. filed by Lisa A. Crinel, PCAH, Inc. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1290 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Lisa A. Crinel. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Attachments: # (1) Surrender Order)(Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1289 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Lisa A. Crinel. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1288 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to PCAH, Inc.. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1287 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REVISED FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to PCAH, Inc.. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1286 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT as to Erica Edwards (13), Count(s) 1, 13, 1s, Dismissed on 9/13/2017; Count(s) 10s, Sentenced on 9/13/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/13/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1285 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Sentencing held on 9/13/2017 for Erica Edwards (13), Count(s) 10s, Sentenced on 9/13/2017. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1284 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JUDGMENT as to Jeff Koon (24), Count(s) 1, 25, 27, Dismissed on 9/13/2017; Count(s) 24, Sentenced on 9/13/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/13/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1283 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Sentencing held on 9/13/2017 for Jeff Koon (24),Count(s) 24, Sentenced on 9/13/2017. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1282 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT as to Suprenia Washington (12), Count(s) 1, 12, 1s, Dismissed 9/13/2017; Count(s) 9s, Sentenced 9/13/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/13/2017. (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1281 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Sentencing held on 9/13/2017 for Suprenia Washington (12), Count 9s, Sentenced 9/13/2017. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1280 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to the Court (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1279 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to PSR by Paula Jones to [1190] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1278 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION to PSR by Michael Jones to [1200] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1277 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: ORDERED that the sentencing for Defendants Paula Jones and Gregory Molden, presently scheduled for Thursday, September 21, 2017, and for Defendants Shelton Barnes, Henry Evans, Michael Jones, and Jonathan Nora, presently scheduled for Wednesday, September 27, 2017, be CONTINUED. The Court will issue a subsequent order setting the new sentencing dates for the Defendants listed above. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/11/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1276 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to PSR by USA as to Shelton Barnes to [1206] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1275 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to PSR by Shelton Barnes to [1206] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1274 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REVISED OBJECTION to PSR by Lisa A. Crinel, PCAH, Inc. to [1128] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft, [1181] Presentence Investigation Report - Final. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1273 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to PSR by Lisa A. Crinel, PCAH, Inc. to [1128] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft, [1181] Presentence Investigation Report - Final. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1272 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION to PSR by USA as to Paula Jones to [1190] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1271 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Henry Evans. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1270 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION to PSR by USA as to Gregory Molden to [1189] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1269 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to PSR by USA as to Henry Evans to [1191] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1268 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Objection to Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to PSR by USA as to Jonathon Nora to [1203] Presentence Investigation Report - Draft. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. After Quality Control by Probation, the document will be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (lag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1266 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT as to Verinese Sutton (18), Count(s) 2, Dismissed 9/6/2017; Count(s) 2s, Sentenced 9/6/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/7/2017. (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1267 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT as to Larry Taylor (25), Count(s) 2, Sentenced 9/6/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/7/2017. (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1265 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT as to Zellisha Dejean (14), Count(s) 1, 1s, 20, 8, 8s, Dismissed 9/6/2017; Count(s) 20s, Sentenced 9/6/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/7/2017. (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1264 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to the Court (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1263 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUGGESTION OF DEATH by USA as to Threasa Adderley. (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1259 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letters to the Court as to Shelton Barnes (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1262 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Sentencing held on 9/6/2017 for Larry Taylor (25), Count(s) 2, Sentenced 9/6/2017. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1261 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Sentencing held on 9/6/2017 for Zellisha Dejean (14), Count(s) 20s, Sentenced 9/6/2017. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1260 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Sentencing held on 9/6/2017 for Verinese Sutton (18), Count(s) 2s, Sentenced 9/6/2017. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (caa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1258 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Erica Edwards. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1257 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Erica Edwards. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1256 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Suprenia Washington. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1255 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Suprenia Washington. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1254 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Jeff Koon. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1253 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Jeff Koon. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1252 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Suprenia Washington. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Torres, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1251 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to the Court as to Zellisha Dejean (14). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1250 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letters to the Court as to Shelton Barnes (7). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1249 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Larry Taylor. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Torres, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1248 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [1242] Motion to Continue Sentencing, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections as to Michael Jones (5). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/5/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1247 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Zellisha Dejean. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Torres, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1246 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Verinese Sutton. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Torres, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1245 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RE-NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Henry Evans. Sentencing reset for 9/27/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1244 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JUDGMENT as to Rhonda Maberry (22), Count(s) 1, Sentenced on 8/30/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/31/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1243 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letters to the Court as to Gregory Molden (23). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1242 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017, Terminated: 9/5/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Sentencing, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections by Michael Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1241 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Order to SurrenderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO SURRENDER as to Rhonda Maberry on 11/28/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/30/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1240 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Sentencing held on 8/30/2017 for Rhonda Maberry (22), Count(s) 1, Sentenced on 8/30/2017. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1239 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT as to Sheila Hopkins (16), Count(s) 1, 1ss, 3-9, 3s-8s, Dismissed on 8/30/2017; Count(s) 1s, Sentenced on 8/30/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/30/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1238 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Sentencing held on 8/30/2017 for Sheila Hopkins (16); Count(s) 1s, Sentenced on 8/30/2017. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1237 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT as to Sheila Mathieu (11), Count(s) 1, 10-11, 17, Dismissed on 8/30/2017; Count(s) 1s, Sentenced on 8/30/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/30/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1236 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Sentencing held on 8/30/2017 for Sheila Mathieu (11); Count(s) 1s, Sentenced on 8/30/2017. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1235 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [1227] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Henry Evans (3). Sentencing reset for 9/27/2017 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Henry Evans to file any objections to the Presentence Investigation Report is Friday, September 15, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/30/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1234 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sentencing Memorandum by Jeff Koon (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Letters of Support)(Damico, Thomas) Modified text on 8/31/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1233 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Verinese Sutton. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Attachments: # (1) Surrender Order)(Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1232 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Verinese Sutton. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1231 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Zellisha Dejean. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Attachments: # (1) Surrender Order)(Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1230 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Zellisha Dejean. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1229 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Larry Taylor. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Attachments: # (1) Surrender Order)(Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1228 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Larry Taylor. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1227 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017, Terminated: 8/30/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Henry Evans. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Booth, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1226 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Sheila Hopkins. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1225 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Sheila Mathieu. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1224 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letters to the Court on behalf of Rhonda Maberry(22). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1223 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Rhonda Maberry. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1217 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [1199] EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Adopt Motions as to Jonathon Nora (8). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/24/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1216 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to the Court as to Shelton Barnes dated 8/23/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1210 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Rhonda Maberry. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Attachments: # (1) Surrender Order)(Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1209 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Rhonda Maberry. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Sheila Mathieu. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing Hearing as to Caren Battaglia held on August 23, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1215 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT as to Eleshia Williams (17), Count(s) 1, Dismissed on 8/23/2017; Count(s) 2, Sentenced on 8/23/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/23/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1214 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT as to Caren Battaglia (15), Count(s) 1, 18-19, 18s-19s, 1s, Dismissed on 8/23/2017; Count(s) 1ss, Sentenced on 8/23/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/23/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1206 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Shelton Barnes. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1205 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Sheila Hopkins. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1204 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Sheila Hopkins. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1203 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Jonathon Nora. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1202 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Sheila Mathieu. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1201 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REVISED FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Sheila Mathieu. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1200 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Michael Jones. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1199 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017, Terminated: 8/25/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Adopt Motions and, in the Alternative for New Trial by Jonathon Nora. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order)(Craft, John) Modified on 8/24/2017 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1198 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Sentencing held on 8/23/2017 for Eleshia Williams (17) Count(s) 2; Count(s) 1, Dismissed on 8/23/2017. (Court Reporter Mary Thompson.) (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1197 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Sentencing held on 8/23/2017 for Caren Battaglia (15) Count(s) 1ss; Count(s) 1, 18-19, 18s-19s, 1s, Dismissed. (Court Reporter Mary Thompson.) (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1195 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letters to the Court as to Caren Battaglia (15). (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1194 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/21/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Motion Hearing as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora held on Aguust 15, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (rsg) Modified on 8/25/2017 (rsg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1193 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: 8/18/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RE-NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to PCAH, Inc. Sentencing reset for 9/21/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1192 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: 8/18/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to PCAH, Inc. Sentencing reset for 9/21/2017 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/17/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1191 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Henry Evans. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1190 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Paula Jones. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1189 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Gregory Molden. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1187 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Eleshia Williams. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1186 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 Release Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RELEASE STATUS REPORT SENTENCING as to Caren Battaglia. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. It may be shared with the U.S. Attorney's Office and defense counsel but should not leave the courtroom. Other defendants in this case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. Any attachments will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Robert, Cheryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1185 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017, Terminated: 8/18/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Sentencing by USA as to PCAH, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brockett, Hayden)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1184 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Caren Battaglia. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1183 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Caren Battaglia. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1182 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to PCAH, Inc.. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1181 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to PCAH, Inc.. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1180 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Eleshia Williams. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1179 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Presentence Investigation Report FINALCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Eleshia Williams. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the District Judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1178 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [1175] Motion Acknowledging Acceptance of Responsibility as to Rhonda Maberry (22). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/16/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1177 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [1174] Motion Acknowledging Acceptance of Responsibility as to Lisa A. Crinel (1). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/16/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1188 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Motion Hearing as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora held on 8/15/2017 re [1074] MOTION for New Trial Motion for Judgment of Acquittal and, in the Alternative for New Trial, and in the Further Alternative, to Arrest Judgment filed by Shelton Barnes, [1085] MOTION for Acquittal (Renewed) MOTION for New Trial filed by Michael Jones, [1087] MOTION for New Trial Under FRCP 33, and Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Under FRCP 29 filed by Paula Jones, [1102] MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29 MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33 filed by Henry Evans. Motions submitted to the Court. (Court Reporter Lanie Smith.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1176 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RE-NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Lisa A. Crinel. Sentencing reset for 9/21/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1175 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017, Terminated: 8/16/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Acknowledging Rhonda Maberry's Acceptance of Responsibility by USA as to Rhonda Maberry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1174 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017, Terminated: 8/16/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Acknowledging Lisa Crinel's Acceptance of Responsibility by USA as to Lisa A. Crinel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1173 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [1171] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Lisa A. Crinel (1). Sentencing reset for 9/21/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1172 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Request for Oral Argument on [1102] MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29 MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33, [1085] MOTION for Acquittal (Renewed) MOTION for New Trial , [1087] MOTION for New Trial Under FRCP 33, and Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Under FRCP 29, [1074] MOTION for New Trial Motion for Judgment of Acquittal and, in the Alternative for New Trial, and in the Further Alternative, to Arrest Judgment. Oral Argument set for 8/15/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1171 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017, Terminated: 8/11/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Sentencing by USA as to Lisa A. Crinel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1170 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE: Because R. Docs. [1102] and [1118] contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submissions in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1169 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [1165] Motion to Adopt Argument as to Michael Jones (5).. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/7/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1168 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017 Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rebuttal Memorandum by Shelton Barnes to [1147] Response/Memorandum in Opposition re [1074] MOTION for New Trial Motion for Judgment of Acquittal and, in the Alternative for New Trial, and in the Further Alternative, to Arrest Judgment (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1167 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [1161] Motion for Leave to File Rebuttal Memorandum as to Shelton Barnes (7). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/7/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1166 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support by Henry Evans re [1102] MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29 MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33 (Booth, Vincent) Modified text on 8/3/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1165 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017, Terminated: 8/7/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Adopt Argument re [1163] RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support by Michael Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Robert) Modified text on 8/3/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1164 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONE/MEMORANDUM in Support by Paula Jones re [1087] MOTION for New Trial Under FRCP 33, and Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Under FRCP 29 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Simmons, Richard) Modified text on 8/3/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1163 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support by Michael Jones re [1085] MOTION for Acquittal (Renewed) MOTION for New Trial (Jenkins, Robert) Modified text on 8/3/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1162 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Request/Statement of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Shelton Barnes regarding [1074] MOTION for New Trial Motion for Judgment of Acquittal and, in the Alternative for New Trial, and in the Further Alternative, to Arrest Judgment, [1161] MOTION for Leave to File Rebuttal Memorandum (Castaing, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1161 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017, Terminated: 8/7/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Rebuttal Memorandum per Rec. Doc. [1146] Order by Shelton Barnes. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Pleading)(Castaing, Edward) Modified text on 8/3/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1160 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [1154] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paula Jones (6). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/1/2017. (Attachment(s) : # (1) Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1159 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [1156] Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Exceed Page Limit as to Paula Jones (6). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/1/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1158 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [1155] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Henry Evans (3). Ordered that Dr. Henry Evans' reply memorandum is to be no longer than 25 pages in length. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/1/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1157 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [1155] MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages **Motion was filed on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filing Fee Payment - Appear Pro Hac Vice - 100 dollars
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filing fee paid re [1154] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-6285892) (Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1156 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017, Terminated: 8/1/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of the Pages Allowed Under Local Rules by Paula Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1155 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017, Terminated: 8/1/2017 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Henry Evans. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Booth, Vincent) (Main Document 1155 replaced on 8/1/2017) (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1154 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017, Terminated: 8/2/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nick Oberheiden and Elizabeth K. Stepp (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-6283488) by Paula Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit)(Simmons, Richard) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/1/2017) (clc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2017: # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit) (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1153 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Rhonda Maberry. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Coleman, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1152 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of RecordCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [1151] Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Blair Elizabeth Brogan as to Paula Jones (6). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/24/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1151 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017, Terminated: 7/24/2017 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Blair Brogan as Counsel of Record by Paula Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1150 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [1148] Motion for Extension of Time to File objections as to Lisa A. Crinel (1). ORDERED that the deadline for Lisa A. Crinel and PCAH, Inc. to file objections to the presentence report is extended to July 28, 2017 Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/12/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1149 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [1145] Motion to Dismiss Indictment as to Wilneisha Harrison Jakes (2). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/12/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1148 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017, Terminated: 7/14/2017 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Presentence Report Objections by Lisa A. Crinel, PCAH, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Johnson, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1147 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response/Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden re [1074] MOTION for New Trial ,Motion for Judgment of Acquittal and, in the Alternative for New Trial, and in the Further Alternative, to Arrest Judgment, [1080] MOTION for Acquittal , [1085] MOTION for Acquittal, (Renewed) MOTION for New Trial , [1087] MOTION for New Trial Under FRCP 33, and Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Under FRCP 29, [1102] MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29, MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33, [1119] Supplemental Memorandum by Paula Jones re 1087 MOTION for New Trial, [1120] Second Supplemental Memorandum by Henry Evans re 1102 MOTION for Acquittal. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1146 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [1142] Motion for Extension of Time to File reply briefs as to Henry Evans (3), Michael Jones (5), Paula Jones (6), Shelton Barnes (7), Jonathon Nora (8). The deadline for the moving Defendants to file reply briefs in support of their post-trial motions is Wednesday, August 2, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/11/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1145 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017, Terminated: 7/12/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Indictment by USA as to Wilneisha Harrison Jakes. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1144 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [1143] Motion to Enlarge Page Limit as to Henry Evans (3), Michael Jones (5), Paula Jones (6), Shelton Barnes (7), Jonathon Nora (8), Gregory Molden (23). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/11/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1143 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017, Terminated: 7/11/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum to Enlarge Page Limit by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1142 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017, Terminated: 7/11/2017 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief by Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1141 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the closing argument by Edward Castaing on behalf of Shelton Barnes as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 5, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1140 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [1139] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Herbert Victor Larson, Jr withdrawn from case as to Lisa A. Crinel (1). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/7/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1139 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017, Terminated: 7/7/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Herbert V. Larson, Jr.. by Lisa A. Crinel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Larson, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1138 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Jeff Koon. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1137 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Larry Taylor. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1136 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Zellisha Dejean. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1135 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Suprenia Washington. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1134 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Eleshia Williams. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1133 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Verinese Sutton. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1132 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Caren Battaglia. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1131 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Sheila Hopkins. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to PCAH, Inc.. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1129 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Erica Edwards. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1128 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Presentence Investigation Report -Draft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Lisa A. Crinel. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. The judge in this case, other defendants and the general public will NOT be able to view this draft document. Parties should submit objections directly to the Probation Office not more than 14 days after the initial disclosure of the presentencing report. (Branch, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1127 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Closing Argument of Vincent Booth as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 5, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1126 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Closing Statements by Mr. Phillips as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 5, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1125 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Closing Statements by Mr. Simmons as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 5, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Waiver of Conflict of Interest Form by Eleshia Williams. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1123 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Waiver of Conflict of Interest Form by Michael Jones. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1122 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 Garcia/Rule 44(c) HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr:Garcia/Rule 44(c) Hearing as to Michael Jones, Eleshia Williams held on 6/19/2017. (Court Reporter- Criminal Magistrate Unit.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Order on Motion To Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [1106] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Robert Charles Jenkins for Michael Jones replacing Brian J. Capitelli and Justine S Geiger as to Michael Jones (5). FURTHER ORDERED that because Mr. Jenkins is already representing another Defendant in this case, this matter is hereby REFERRED to the duty magistrate to hold a Garcia hearing to determine whether Mr. Jenkins may represent both Michael Jones and one of his co-defendants. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/14/2017.(cc: Cr. Mag) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second Supplemental Memorandum by Henry Evans re [1102] MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29 MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33 (Booth, Vincent) Modified text on 6/14/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Memorandum by Paula Jones re [1087] MOTION for New Trial Under FRCP 33, and Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Under FRCP 29 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Memorandum by Henry Evans re [1102] MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29 MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Booth, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1117 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to the Court as to Paula Jones. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Testimony of Eartha Johnson as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 4, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1115 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of Mr. Simmons's cross-examination of Krista Bradford as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 3, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Testimony of Beverley Hitt-Christophe, Part II as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 1, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1113 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Testimony Beverly Hitts-Christophe as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 28, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Testimony of Mark C. Dyer as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 21, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1112 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [1105] Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Responses to Post-Verdict Motions as to Henry Evans (3), Michael Jones (5), Paula Jones (6), Shelton Barnes (7), Jonathon Nora (8), Gregory Molden (23). FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for the Government to file responses to post-verdict motions is extended to July 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/7/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Testimony of Lisa Crinel, Volume III as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 19, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Testimony of Lisa Crinel, Volume II as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 18, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Testimony of Lisa Crinel, Volume I, as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 17, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Testimony of Arnold Cano as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 18, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017, Terminated: 6/14/2017 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Michael Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Capitelli, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1105 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017, Terminated: 6/7/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Deadline for Filing Responses to Post-Verdict Motions Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29, 33 and 34 by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Patrice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1104 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the cross-examination testimony of Lisa Crinel by Mr. Phillips as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 18, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1103 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the Government's Rebuttal Closing as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 5, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (rsg) (Main Document 1103 replaced on 6/8/2017) (rsg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1102 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017, Terminated: 8/27/2018 Motion for AcquittalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29, MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33 by Henry Evans. Motion set for 9/8/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Notice of Hearing)(Booth, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Henry Evans, Morning Session as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 4, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Henry Evans-Afternoon Session as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 4, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1099 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the cross-examination testimony by Mr. Booth of Leanne Dodson as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 28, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1098 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Dr. Brobson Lutz-Volume IV as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 27, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1097 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Dr. Brobson Lutz-Volume III as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 26, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Dr. Brobson Lutz-Volume II as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 25, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1095 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Dr. Brobson Lutz-Volume I as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 24, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1094 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Defendant Paula Jones' [1086] Motion for Leave requesting an extension of twenty-one days to file supplemental memorandum with respect to her post-verdict motion. FURTHER ORDERED that those Defendants who have timely filed post-verdict motions pursuant to Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure 29 and 33 shall have until Tuesday, June 13, 2017 to file supplemental memoranda. The Government shall have until Tuesday, June 27, 2017 to respond. Those Defendants shall have until Monday, July 3, 2017 to file any replies to the Government's response in opposition. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/25/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RE-NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Michael Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora. Sentencing reset for 9/27/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RE-NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Henry Evans, Paula Jones, Gregory Molden. Sentencing reset for 9/21/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1091 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RE-NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Suprenia Washington, Erica Edwards, Jeff Koon. Sentencing reset for 9/13/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1090 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RE-NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Zellisha Dejean, Verinese Sutton, Larry Taylor. Sentencing reset for 9/6/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1089 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RE-NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Sheila Mathieu, Sheila Hopkins, Rhonda Maberry. Sentencing reset for 8/30/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1088 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RE-NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Lisa A. Crinel, Caren Battaglia, Eleshia Williams, PCAH, Inc. Sentencing reset for 8/23/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1087 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017, Terminated: 8/27/2018 motion for new trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for New Trial Under FRCP 33, and Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Under FRCP 29 by Paula Jones. Motion set for 8/9/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Notice of Hearing)(Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1086 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017, Terminated: 5/25/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum and References to the Transcripts with Regard to Her Moton for Judgment of Acquittal Under FRCP 29 or, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial Under FRCP 33 by Paula Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1085 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017, Terminated: 8/27/2018 Motion for AcquittalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Acquittal (Renewed), MOTION for New Trial by Michael Jones. Motion set for 8/9/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Notice of Hearing)(Capitelli, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [1082] Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Henry Evans (3). Defendant is granted an extension of time of seven days until May 30, 2017, to file his post-verdict motions. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/22/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: ORDERED that the Sentencings of the defendants have been continued as set out herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/22/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017, Terminated: 5/22/2017 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Verdict Motions by Henry Evans. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Booth, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1081 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [1069] Motion to Continue Sentencings. The Court will issue a subsequent order setting the new sentencing dates for all Defendants. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1080 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017, Terminated: 8/27/2018 Motion for AcquittalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Acquittal by Jonathon Nora. Motion set for 8/9/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Notice of Hearing)(Craft, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1079 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [1077] Response to Motion. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (mmv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Order on Motion for New TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER AND REASONS denying Motion for Judgment of Acquittal as to Shelton Barnes (7). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/19/2017. (clc) Modified text on 5/25/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response/Memorandum in Opposition by Verinese Sutton re [1069] MOTION to Continue Sentencing (Haedicke, Stephen) Modified event/text on 5/22/2017 (mmv).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1076 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017, Terminated: 5/18/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to [1069] Motion to Continue Sentencing by Caren Battaglia. (Reed, John) Modified text on 5/18/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Order on Motion To Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [1073] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Richard E. Moore for Gregory Molden replacing Eusi H. Phillips as to Gregory Molden (23). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/17/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1074 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017, Terminated: 8/27/2018 motion for new trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Judgment of Acquittal or, in the Alternative for New Trial, and in the Further Alternative, to Arrest Judgment by Shelton Barnes. Motion set for 8/9/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Notice of Hearing)(Castaing, Edward) Modified text on 5/18/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1073 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017, Terminated: 5/17/2017 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Gregory Molden. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Phillips, Eusi) (Main Document 1073 and Attachment 1 replaced on 5/17/2017 to adjust image size) (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Shelton Barnes re [1056] Response/Memorandum in Opposition (Brockett, Hayden) Modified text on 5/16/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [1061] Motion to Withdraw Document as to Rhonda Maberry (22). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/12/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re [1069] MOTION to Continue sentencings by the United States Probation Office. ORDERED that any objections to the motion to continue shall be filed by Friday, May 19, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/12/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017, Terminated: 5/22/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue Sentencing as to Defendants filed by United State Probation Office. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1068 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Sentencing set for 8/23/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017, Terminated: 5/12/2017 Motion to withdraw document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document [1060] MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Rhonda Maberry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Utley, Dylan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Jury Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JURY VERDICT FORM.(clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Court's Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Court's Jury Instructions.(clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1065 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Trial Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Government TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Trial Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Trial Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dr. Barnes' TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1062 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 jury verdictCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 5/9/2017. JURY VERDICT as to Henry Evans (3) Guilty on Count 31ss,43ss-46ss and Michael Jones (5) Guilty on Count 1ss,2ss,18ss,22ss-27ss and Paula Jones (6) Guilty on Count 1ss,2ss and Shelton Barnes (7) Guilty on Count 1ss,2ss,3ss-17ss,47ss and Jonathon Nora (8) Guilty on Count 1ss,2ss,27ss and Gregory Molden (23) Guilty on Count 1s,2s,32s-42s. Henry Evans (3) Not Guilty on Count 1ss,2ss,28ss-30ss and Michael Jones (5) Not Guilty on Count 19ss,20ss,21ss. Sentencings set for August 23, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. All defendants were released on their present bonds. (Court Reporter Lanie Smith.) (Attachments: # (1) Jury Note No. 1, # (2) Jury Note No. 2, # (3) Jury Note No. 3, # (4) Jury Note No. 4, # (5) Jury Note No. 5) (my)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1060 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017, Terminated: 5/12/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **WITHDRAWN** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Rhonda Maberry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Utley, Dylan) Modified on 5/12/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1058 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Paula Jones Theory of Defense No. 2 (Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1057 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Paula Jones Theory of Defense No. 1 (Simmons, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 5/8/2017. Court recessed at 5:00 p.m. until May 9, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Lanie Smith.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1056 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response/Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Shelton Barnes re [1052] MOTION Memorandum in Support of Dr. Shelton Barnes' Rule 29 Motion (Brockett, Hayden)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1052 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017, Terminated: 5/9/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support of Dr. Shelton Barnes' Rule 29 Motion by Shelton Barnes. (Castaing, Edward) Modified text on 5/9/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION of Trial Exhibits as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/5/2017. (cml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1054 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Court's Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Court's Jury Instructions as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden (cml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1053 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 5/5/2017. All defendants re-urged their Rule 20 motions for judgment of acquittal motions denied by the Court. The Court recessed at 5:00 p.m. until May 8, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Mary Thompson.) (cml) (Main Document 1053 replaced on 5/19/2017 to correct image) (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1051 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial Re: Mr. Capitelli as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on May 5, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1050 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Court's Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Jury Instructions- Court Version 2. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 5/4/2017. Court recessed jury at 5:10 until May 5, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Court recessed at 6:00 p.m. (Court Reporter Mary Thompson/ Lanie Smith.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1048 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 5/3/2017. Jury released at 5:30 p.m. until May 4, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Mary Thompson.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial-Day 7 of the Cross-Examination of Lisa Crinel by Mr. Capitelli and Mr. Simmons as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 19, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1045 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial-Day 9 of the testimony of Larry Taylor as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 21, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1047 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 5/2/2017. Court recessed at 5:40 p.m. until May 3, 2017 at 8:50 a.m. (Court Reporter Mary Thompson.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1044 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial #2 of the testimony of Leanne Dodson as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 28, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1042 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017, Terminated: 5/3/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum regarding Theory of Defense by Henry Evans. (Booth, Vincent) Modified text on 5/3/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1043 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 5/1/2017. The Court recessed at 5:30 p.m. until May 2, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Mary Thompson.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1041 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Gregory Molden Theory of Defense (Phillips, Eusi) (Main Document 1041 replaced on 5/2/2017) (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Shelton Barnes Theory of Defense Instruction Pertaining to Regulations (Castaing, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1039 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Shelton Barnes Memorandum No. 2 - Chapter 7 and Related Regulations (Castaing, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Shelton Barnes Memorandum No. 1 - Submitted by Dr. Shelton Barnes (Castaing, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden Regarding Defendants' Proposed Inclusion of Regulations in Jury Instructions (Brockett, Hayden)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1034 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017, Terminated: 5/2/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum regarding Theory of Defense by Michael Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Capitelli, Brian) Modified text on 5/2/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/28/2017. The Court recessed at 5:00 p.m. until May 1, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1033 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial-Day 8 of the testimony of Caren Battaglia,Volume I as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 20, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7781. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1032 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt (#2) from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Dr. Brobson Lutz as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 27, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1031 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Leanne Dodson as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 27, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/27/2017. Court recessed at 5:00 p.m. until April 28, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1029 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Dr. Brobson Lutz as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 26, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1030 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/26/2017. Court recessed at 5:00 p.m. until April 27, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/25/2017. Court recessed at 5:00 p.m. until April 26, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: ORDERED that the Clerk of Court pay jurors who have served eleven (11) or more days in the captioned matter $50.00 per day. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/25/2017.(NEF: Jury Unit) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1025 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the government opening statement as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 12, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Tana Hess, Telephone number 504-589-7781. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2017. (rsg) (Main Document 1025 replaced on 4/28/2017) (rsg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response/Memorandum in Opposition by Michael Jones, Paula Jones re [1021] MOTION for Reconsideration by the Government (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Capitelli, Brian) (Main Document 1024 replaced on 4/25/2017 to correct links to the citations) (tsf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/24/2017. Court recessed at 5:00 p.m. until April 25, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1023 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Memorandum by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden re [1021] MOTION for Reconsideration (Lieberman, Sharan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 4/23/2017, Entered: 4/23/2017, Terminated: 5/4/2017 Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Motion set for 5/17/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Notice of Hearing, # (3) Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Sharan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/21/2017. Court recessed at 5:10 p.m. until April 24, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Lanie Smith.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/20/2017. Court recessed at 5:00 until April 21, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Lanie Smith.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/19/2017. Court recessed at 4:45 p.m. until April 20, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Lanie Smith.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/18/2017. Court recessed at 5:00 p.m. until April 19, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Lannie Smith.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/17/2017. Court recessed at 5:00 p.m. until April 18, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Lanie Smith.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1016 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Wendy Naquin as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 12, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Tana Hess, Telephone number 504-589-7781. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1015 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of an Excerpt from the Jury Trial of the testimony of Wilneisha Jakes as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 13, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Tana Hess, Telephone number 504-589-7781. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 4/15/2017, Entered: 4/15/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden on the Admission of Co-Conspirator Statements (Brockett, Hayden)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 4/15/2017, Entered: 4/15/2017, Terminated: 4/17/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum regarding co-conspirator hearsay by Michael Jones Henry Evans, Paula Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Capitelli, Brian) Modified text on 4/17/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/13/2017. Court recessed at 5:00 p.m. until April 17, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Tana Hess.) (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1008 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on April 10, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Trial as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/12/2017. Defendant Paula Jones re-urged her motion to sever Count denied motion.Court recessed at 5:00 p.m. until April 13, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Tana Hess.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Jury SelectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury Voir Dire Concluded as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/11/2017. The jury was sworn to truly try case. Preliminary instructions were given to the jury and they were released until April 12, 2017 a 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Tana Hess.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on March 17, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Jodi Simcox, Telephone number 504-589-7780. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Jury - Voir DireCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Jury - Voir Dire held on 4/10/2017 as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Court recessed the jury panel at 5:20 p.m. until April 11, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Mary Thompson.) (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Status Conference held on 4/10/2017. The Court treated Record Document [991] as a Motion in Limine and granted as set forth on the record. The Court granted Defendant Michael Jones' [958] Motion in Limine Regarding 404(b) Evidence as set forth on the record. The Court ruled that, after balancing relevance versus unfair prejudice, Government Exhibit 223 is inadmissible at trial. The Court denied Defendants Michael and Paula Jones' [998] Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Jobie Crear. The Court denied the Government's [974] Motion in Limine to Exclude Improper Impeachment of Jobie Crear. The Court denied Paula Jones' [972] request for a continuance and/or severance. With respect to the Government's [976] Motion in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Evidence and Self-Serving Hearsay, Defendant Henry Evans clarified that he has withdrawn Exhibits 5060, 5061, and 5063. The Government's Motion is dismissed as moot with respect to Exhibits 5060, 5061, and 5063. The Government's Motion is denied with respect to Exhibit 5062. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDERED that a status conference will be held in Judge Lemmon's Courtroom on Tuesday, April 11, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument regarding the Government's [976] Motion in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Evidence and Self-Serving Hearsay1 presently scheduled for Tuesday, April 11, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/10/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying as moot [995] Motion to Expedite as to Henry Evans (3), Michael Jones (5), Paula Jones (6), Shelton Barnes (7), Jonathon Nora (8), Gregory Molden (23). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/10/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA re [976] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Evidence and Self-Serving Hearsay (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1000 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [994] Motion for Leave to File Reply as to Henry Evans (3), Michael Jones (5), Paula Jones (6), Shelton Barnes (7), Jonathon Nora (8), Gregory Molden (23). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/10/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [993] Motion to Seal Response to Rec. Doc. No. [974] *SEALED* MOTION as to Michael Jones (5) . Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/10/2017. (tsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [992] Motion to Seal Motion to Exclude proposed testimony of Jobie Crear as to Michael Jones (5) and Paula Jones (6). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/10/2017. (tsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 4/9/2017, Entered: 4/9/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Government's Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Defendant Evans's Opposition to Its Motion in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Evidence and Self-Serving Hearsay by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brockett, Hayden)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 4/9/2017, Entered: 4/9/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant Evans's Opposition to Government's Motion to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence and Self-Serving Hearsay by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Motion set for 4/19/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Pleading, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Notice of Hearing)(Brockett, Hayden)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 993 Filed: 4/9/2017, Entered: 4/9/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Response to Rec. Doc. No. 974 by Michael Jones, Paula Jones as to All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Capitelli, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2017: # (2) Proposed Pleading - SEALED) (tsf). Modified on 4/10/2017 to add Paula Jones as a filer (tsf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 4/9/2017, Entered: 4/9/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Motion to Exclude proposed testimony of Jobie Crear by Michael Jones, Paula Jones as to All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)Attorney Brian J. Capitelli added to party Paula Jones(pty:dft).(Capitelli, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2017: # (2) Proposed Pleading - SEALED, # (3) Proposed Pleading - SEALED, # (4) Proposed Pleading - SEALED Exh A, # (5) Proposed Pleading - SEALED Exh B) (tsf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental MOTION Regarding Gov. Ex. 1465 by Michael Jones. Motion set for 4/10/2017 08:30 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Hearing, # (2) Proposed Order)(Capitelli, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Michael Jones re [986] MOTION to exclude reference to convictions of doctors indicted in unrelated matters (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Lieberman, Sharan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Oral Argument on [976] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Evidence and Self-Serving Hearsay : Motion set for 4/11/2017 08:30 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/6/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Request/Statement of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Henry Evans regarding [976] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Evidence and Self-Serving Hearsay (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Booth, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 987 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response/Memorandum in Opposition by Henry Evans re [976] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Evidence and Self-Serving Hearsay (Booth, Vincent) (Main Document 987 replaced on 4/7/2017) (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017, Terminated: 4/5/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to exclude reference to convictions of doctors indicted in unrelated matters by Michael Jones as to Lisa A. Crinel, Wilneisha Harrison Jakes, Henry Evans, Threasa Adderley, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Cary Payton, Evelyn Odoms, Sheila Mathieu, Suprenia Washington, Erica Edwards, Zellisha Dejean, Caren Battaglia, Sheila Hopkins, Eleshia Williams, Verinese Sutton, PCAH, Inc., Clara Aitch, Wendy Ervin, Rhonda Maberry, Gregory Molden, Jeff Koon, Larry Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Capitelli, Brian) Modified on 4/5/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Lisa A. Crinel, Wilneisha Harrison Jakes, Henry Evans, Threasa Adderley, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Cary Payton, Evelyn Odoms, Sheila Mathieu, Suprenia Washington, Erica Edwards, Zellisha Dejean, Caren Battaglia, Sheila Hopkins, Eleshia Williams, Verinese Sutton, PCAH, Inc., Clara Aitch, Wendy Ervin, Rhonda Maberry, Gregory Molden, Jeff Koon, Larry Taylor held on April 3, 2017 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2017. (rsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Subpoena(s) Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Subpoenas(s) Issued as requested by Michael Jones. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [971] Motion for Issuance of Subpoena as to Michael Jones (5). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Telephone Conference as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 4/3/2017. Any Defendant who wishes to file a motion in limine with respect to topics discussed during today's telephone status conference may do so by Wednesday, April 5, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. The Government shall have until Friday, April 7, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. to file its opposition. Any Defendant who wishes to file an objection regarding the composition of the jury venire must do so by Wednesday, April 5, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. If filed, the Government may respond by Friday, April 7, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 979 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [977] Motion to Expedite Hearing on Rec. DOc. [976] as to Henry Evans (3), Michael Jones (5), Paula Jones (6), Shelton Barnes (7), Jonathon Nora (8), Gregory Molden (23). Defendants shall have until Thursday, April 6, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. to file their oppositions. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [975] Motion to Expedite Hearing on Rec. Doc. [974] as to Henry Evans (3), Michael Jones (5), Paula Jones (6), Shelton Barnes (7), Jonathon Nora (8), Gregory Molden (23). Defendants shall have until Thursday, April 6, 2017 at 9:00 a.m to file their oppositions. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 4/2/2017, Entered: 4/2/2017, Terminated: 4/3/2017 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite hearing on Rec. Doc. 976, Motion in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Evidence and Self-Serving Hearsay by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brockett, Hayden)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 4/2/2017, Entered: 4/2/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Evidence and Self-Serving Hearsay by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. Motion set for 4/19/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Attachment B, # (3) Attachment C, # (4) Notice of Hearing)(Brockett, Hayden)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 4/1/2017, Entered: 4/1/2017, Terminated: 4/3/2017 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite hearing on Rec. Doc. 974 by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Sharan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 4/1/2017, Entered: 4/1/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response/Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Michael Jones, Paula Jones re [972] Supplemental Brief re [958] MOTION in Limine Regarding 404(b) Evidence (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Lieberman, Sharan) Modified on 4/3/2017 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017, Terminated: 3/31/2017 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Brief re [958] MOTION in Limine Regarding 404(b) Evidence by Michael Jones, Paula Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)Attorney Richard Terrell Simmons, Jr added to party Michael Jones(pty:dft).(Simmons, Richard) Modified on 3/31/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017, Terminated: 4/3/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas by Michael Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Subpoena)(Capitelli, Brian) . (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/31/2017) (clc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2017: # (3) Proposed Order) (clc). Modified on 3/31/2017 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Order on Motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER AND REASONS denying [731] Motion to Exclude as to Michael Jones (5). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/30/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [966] Motion for Leave to Replace Rec. Doc. 731-4 and 751-1 with Exhibit A . Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/29/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [965] Motion to Amend/Correct as to Michael Jones (5). FURTHER ORDERED that the Government may file Exhibit A, the Amended Response to Defendant Michael Jones's Motion in Limine into the record, in place of Rec. Doc. 961. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/29/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition by USA as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden re [957] MEMORANDUM by Michael Jones to [952] Proposed Jury Instructions for Anti-Kickback Statute Charges (Brockett, Hayden) Modified on 3/29/2017 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 966 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017, Terminated: 3/29/2017 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Replace Rec. Doc. [731] MOTION to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence and [751] Response/Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Michael Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Pleading, # (2) Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Sharan) Modified on 3/29/2017 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017, Terminated: 3/29/2017 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Amend [961] Response to Motion filed by USA by USA as to Michael Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Pleading, # (2) Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Sharan) Modified on 3/29/2017 to edit docket text (bwn).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [959] Motion to Seal Exhibit as to Michael Jones (5). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/27/2017. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry and Amended Scheduling Order for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan:Telephone Conference as to Henry Evans, Michael Jones, Paula Jones, Shelton Barnes, Jonathon Nora, Gregory Molden held on 3/27/2017 Telephone Conference set for 4/3/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. Parties shall comply with the amended scheduling order included herein. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 961 Filed: 3/26/2017, Entered: 3/26/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Michael Jones re [958] MOTION in Limine Regarding 404(b) Evidence (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Lieberman, Sharan) (Main Document 961 replaced on 3/29/2017) (clc). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/29/2017) (clc). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/29/2017) (clc). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/29/2017) (clc). Modified on 3/29/2017 per Rec. Doc. #968 (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017, Terminated: 3/27/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Exhibit by Michael Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Capitelli, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine Regarding 404(b) Evidence by Michael Jones. Motion set for 4/10/2017 08:30 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Notice of Hearing, # (6) Proposed Order)(Capitelli, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2017: # (7) Exhibit) (clc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Michael Jones to [952] Proposed Jury Instructions for Anti-Kickback Statute Charges (Capitelli, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [948] Motion for Leave to File [947] Exhibit List Under Seal as to Shelton Barnes (7). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/20/2017. (bwn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 2,420 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?