Peter Trepp v. Inktank Storage, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-02008

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 5:40 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peter Trepp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Whitney Leigh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee A Hepner +1 415 912 5950 +1 415 912 5951

Toggle Switch Represented by The Tariq Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gilbert Whitney Leigh +1 415 345 9500 +1 415 345 9501 whitney@leighlegal.com
v.
No Logo Inktank Storage, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P Donovan, Jr. +1 310 883 6435 +1 310 883 6500 wdonovan@cooley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia A Eberwine +1 310 883 6400 +1 310 883 6500 peberwine@cooley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Bernard Woodring +1 310 883 6400 +1 310 883 6500 jwoodring@cooley.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P Donovan, Jr. +1 310 883 6435 +1 310 883 6500 wdonovan@cooley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia A Eberwine +1 310 883 6400 +1 310 883 6500 peberwine@cooley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Bernard Woodring +1 310 883 6400 +1 310 883 6500 jwoodring@cooley.com
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Response
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Change of address by Gilbert Whitney Leigh attorney for Plaintiff Peter Trepp. Changing attorneys address to One Sansome Street, 35th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94104. Filed by Plaintiff Peter Trepp. (Leigh, Gilbert) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address at AGR_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Judge Andre Birotte Jr. is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. All proposed sealed documents must be submitted, via e-mail, to the Judge's Chambers email at AB_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the Judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 14-03 (CV-52)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                SCHEDULING NOTICE VACATING by Judge Christina A. Snyder previously scheduled for 04/27/2015 at 10:00 AM has been terminated, based on plaintiff's filing of a First Amended Complaint 9 . Therefore, defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and/or Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint 7 is MOOT. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS OSC WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT STRIKE ANY AND ALL PLEADINGS FILED BY COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TOSUBMIT AN APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION AND FEE. by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs attorney, Lee A. Hepner, show cause in writing not later than April 27, 2015 why he has failed to file an Application for Admission and fee, or proof of admission in this action and why this Court should notstrike any and all pleadings filed by this attorney.In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7.15, oral argument shall not be heard in the above matter unless so ordered by the Court. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of briefs.Plaintiffs counsel is advised that the Court will consider the following:1) Application for Admission with the fee payment, or proof of admission or before the above date, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. (pj) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Peter Trepp amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plainitiff Peter Trepp (Leigh, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Inktank Storage, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., identifying none. (Donovan, William) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC568524 Receipt No: 0973-15394628 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Red Hat, Inc., Inktank Storage, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Declaration of Paul J. Argiry, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Proof of Service) (Attorney William P Donovan, Jr added to party Inktank Storage, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney William P Donovan, Jr added to party Red Hat, Inc.(pty:dft))(Donovan, William) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?