Banks v. Fischer
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-784

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 2:01 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3350 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[1462775] [15-784] [Entered: 03/17/2015 02:33 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
    AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[1462766] [15-784] [Entered: 03/17/2015 02:29 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
      ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1462741] [15-784] [Entered: 03/17/2015 02:18 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
        DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/10/2015, denying IFP, RECEIVED.[1462735] [15-784] [Entered: 03/17/2015 02:15 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
          DISTRICT COURT DECISION and ORDER, dated 02/10/2015, RECEIVED.[1462734] [15-784] [Entered: 03/17/2015 02:14 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Edwin Banks, FILED. [1462606] [15-784] [Entered: 03/17/2015 12:42 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 36 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?