Mulvey v. Romney et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:05-cv-40054-FDS

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joseph Mulvey, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Charles Noyes, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Coonan, Defendant
No Logo Dennis Powers, Defendant
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitt Romney"
Office Worcester
Filed 3/23/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $20000000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Worcester
Terminated 6/21/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE.(Castles, Martin)
    LREF
    Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
    Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying [10] Motion for Default Judgment. (cc/cl) (Jones, Sherry)
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Mail Returned
      Return receipt received for letter of default sent to Governor Romney and Dennis Powers Delivered on 4/27/06 (Attachments: # (1) service on Dennis Powers# (2) service on Romney) (Jones, Sherry)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006, Terminated: 6/19/2006 Motion for Default Judgment
        MOTION for Default Judgment as to State of Massachusetts, Governor Romney and Town of Oxford by Joseph Mulvey, c/s.(Jones, Sherry)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered denying [9] Motion to stop domestic terrorism and default. (Castles, Martin)
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006, Terminated: 1/31/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
            MOTION to stop ongoing domestic terrorism, find default against all defendants, reassign case to Chief Judge and remove Oxford, MA Police Chief Noyes by Joseph Mulvey.(Hassett, Kathy)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Affidavit of Service
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Joseph Mulvey. Mitt Romney served on 8/16/2005, answer due 9/6/2005; Dennis Powers served on 8/15/2005, answer due 9/6/2005. Acknowledgement filed by Joseph Mulvey. (Hassett, Kathy)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Mail Returned
                Return receipts received for mail sent to Governor Mitt Romney and Town Manager, Oxford, MA. Delivered on 8/16 and 8/15 respectively. (Hassett, Kathy)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Notice of potential dismissal of action pursuant t
                  Notice of potential dismissal of action pursuant to FCRP 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1(b): This action will be dismisssed in twenty days unless proof of service is filed.. (Castles, Martin)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005, Terminated: 6/8/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Joseph Mulvey.(Jones, Sherry)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005, Terminated: 6/8/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                      MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Joseph Mulvey.(Jones, Sherry)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                        Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered denying [5] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Castles, Martin)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                          Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered denying [4] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Castles, Martin)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Order on Motion for Recusal
                            Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered denying [3] Motion for Recusal. (Castles, Martin)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Order on Motion to Amend
                              Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered denying [2] Motion to Amend without prejudice. Plaintiff has 120 days after filing of the complaint to effect service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). (Castles, Martin)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005, Terminated: 5/17/2005 Motion for RecusalCourt Filing
                                MOTION for Recusal of Judge Saylor by Joseph Mulvey.(Hassett, Kathy)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005, Terminated: 5/17/2005 Motion to Amend
                                  MOTION to Amend to Use legal right by Joseph Mulvey.(Hassett, Kathy)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT against Mitt Romney, Charles Noyes, Daniel Coonan, Dennis Powers, Commonwealth of Massachusetts Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 404538, filed by Joseph Mulvey.(Hassett, Kathy)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Summons Issued
                                      Summons Issued as to Mitt Romney, Charles Noyes, Daniel Coonan, Dennis Powers, Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 492 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?