Bellavia Blatt & Crossett, P.C. v. Kel & Partners LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01478

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 12:25 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons set forth herein, the Court grants defendants' motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 12/16/2015. (Dolecki, Lauren)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Reply in Support
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Proposed Scheduling Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?