Durst v. Collier, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00139
District Judge Lee Yeakel, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Lee Yeakel
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 1:33 PM EST (8.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Robert Durst, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of Jason S. Landgraf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Ryan Buckley +1 713 223 5959 +1 713 223 9231 buckleysean@ymail.com

Represented by Law Offices of David M. Zeff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dick DeGuerin +1 713 223 5959 +1 713 223 9231 ddeguerin@aol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Habern +1 936 435 1380 +1 936 435 1089 bhabern@aol.com
v.
No Logo Alvin Shaw, Defendant
No Logo Brian Collier, Defendant

Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Reed Lockhoof +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 reed.lockhoof@oag.state.tx.us
No Logo Charles Aycock, Defendant
No Logo Elvis Hightower, Defendant
No Logo Gerald Garrett, Defendant
No Logo Jackie Denoylles, Defendant
No Logo Jose Aliseda, Defendant
No Logo Juanita Gonzales, Defendant
No Logo Linda Garcia, Defendant
No Logo Rissie Owens, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Timeline
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None
Return of service executed as to Linda Garcia on 2/24/06 (td) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None
Return of service executed as to Elvis Hightower on 2/24/06 (td) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Order granting motion to continue tro hearing [7-1] Motion hearing motion for preliminary injunction [3-1] for 9:00 3/8/06, motion for temporary restraining order [2-1] for 9:00 3/8/06 signed by Judge Lee Yeakel (td) (Entered: 02/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None
Motion by Robert Durst to continue tro hearing (td) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Order granting motion for Sean Buckley to appear pro hac vice [4-1] signed by Judge Lee Yeakel (td) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Order setting hearing for Temporary Restraining Order at 9:00 2/28/06 signed by Judge Lee Yeakel (af) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
Motion by Robert Durst for Sean Buckley to appear pro hac vice (af) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
Motion by Robert Durst for preliminary injunction (af) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
Motion by Robert Durst for temporary restraining order (af) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
Complaint filed. Filing Fee: $ 250.00 Receipt # 384554 (af) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 125 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?