Toya Wilson v. LNV Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-1304

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 6:29 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4371 - Truth in Lending
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: appellants and attorneys Hutchens and Collins. Informal Opening Brief due 04/20/2015 Informal response brief, if any: 17 days after informal opening brief filed. [15-1304] (MR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
    FEE NOTICE issued to Harry Smith - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 04/24/2015 Originating case number: 7:14-cv-00145-FL. Mailed to: appellants and attorneys Hutchens and Collins. [15-1304] (MR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
      RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 04/08/2015 [15-1304] (MR)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
        Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:14-cv-00145-FL. Case manager: MRadday. [15-1304] (MR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 50 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?