Wegh v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01648

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 18, 2017 at 8:07 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abraham Wegh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Richard D. Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Jon Fishbein +1 516 791 4400 +1 516 791 4411 fishbeinadamj@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Encore Capital Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
No Logo Midland Credit Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
Midland Funding LLC Midland Funding LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Initial Conference Hearing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Proposed Scheduling Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/18/2015, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION for pre motion conference concerning Motion for Class Certification filed by All Defendants. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION for pre motion conference concerning Motion for Class Certification by Abraham Wegh. (Fishbein, Adam)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, July 28, 2015, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than July 24, 2015, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/16/2015. (Guy, Alicia)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Johnson, Matthew)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                              Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Encore Capital Group Inc, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Johnson, Matthew)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Brady Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Johnson, Matthew)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Encore Capital Group Inc (Johnson, Matthew)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Funding, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Funding, LLC. (Johnson, Matthew)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Johnson, Matthew)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Abraham Wegh. Encore Capital Group Inc waiver sent on 3/30/2015, answer due 5/29/2015; Midland Credit Management, Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2015, answer due 5/29/2015; Midland Funding, LLC waiver sent on 3/30/2015, answer due 5/29/2015. (Fishbein, Adam)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                          Summons Issued as to Encore Capital Group Inc, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                            This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                              In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                COMPLAINT against Encore Capital Group Inc, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7624108 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Abraham Wegh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fishbein, Adam)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?