Alliance Companies LLC et al v. Alliance Data Systems Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10781-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alliance Affinity Services LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Hosp +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 rdhosp@goodwinprocter.com
Space Sheryl A. Koval +1 617 570 1147 +1 617 523 1231 skoval@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Alliance Companies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Hosp +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 rdhosp@goodwinprocter.com
Space Sheryl A. Koval +1 617 570 1147 +1 617 523 1231 skoval@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Alliance Credit Services LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Hosp +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 rdhosp@goodwinprocter.com
Space Sheryl A. Koval +1 617 570 1147 +1 617 523 1231 skoval@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Alliance Financial Services LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Hosp +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 rdhosp@goodwinprocter.com
Space Sheryl A. Koval +1 617 570 1147 +1 617 523 1231 skoval@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Alliance Marketing Services LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Hosp +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 rdhosp@goodwinprocter.com
Space Sheryl A. Koval +1 617 570 1147 +1 617 523 1231 skoval@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Alliance Partnership Services LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Hosp +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 rdhosp@goodwinprocter.com
Space Sheryl A. Koval +1 617 570 1147 +1 617 523 1231 skoval@goodwinprocter.com
v.
No Logo Alliance Data Systems Corporation, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 4/19/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Middlesex
Terminated 12/13/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by Alliance Financial Services LLC, Alliance Affinity Services LLC, Alliance Marketing Services LLC, Alliance Companies LLC, Alliance Partnership Services LLC, Alliance Credit Services LLC (Revised Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (Hosp, Richard)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Nicewicz, Craig)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alliance Financial Services LLC, Alliance Affinity Services LLC, Alliance Marketing Services LLC, Alliance Companies LLC, Alliance Partnership Services LLC, Alliance Credit Services LLC (Hosp, Richard)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 OrderCourt Filing
        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER pursuant to Rule 4(m) entered. The above-entitled action will be dismissed without prejudice in twenty (20) days from the date of this Order unless a proof of service is filed or good cause shown why service has not been made(Nicewicz, Craig)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alliance Financial Services LLC, Alliance Affinity Services LLC, Alliance Marketing Services LLC, Alliance Companies LLC, Alliance Partnership Services LLC, Alliance Credit Services LLC. (Patch, Christine)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against Alliance Data Systems Corporation Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 63638, filed by Alliance Financial Services LLC, Alliance Affinity Services LLC, Alliance Marketing Services LLC, Alliance Companies LLC, Alliance Partnership Services LLC, Alliance Credit Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Patch, Christine)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Summons Issued
              Summons Issued as to Alliance Data Systems Corporation. (Patch, Christine)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Sorokin. (Patch, Christine)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 61 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?