Flight Attendants in Reunion v. American Airlines, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-869

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 3:20 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee American Airlines, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1536455] [15-869] [Entered: 06/19/2015 01:05 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
    BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Association of Professional Flight Attendants, FILED. Service date 06/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1536021] [15-869] [Entered: 06/19/2015 09:33 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
      BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Dixie Daniels, Flight Attendants in Reunion, Colleen Hawk, Merry Larson and James Gordon Tuller, FILED. Service date 05/15/2015 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1511875] [15-869] [Entered: 05/15/2015 04:34 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
        JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-116), on behalf of Appellant Dixie Daniels, Flight Attendants in Reunion, Colleen Hawk, Merry Larson and James Gordon Tuller, FILED. Service date 05/15/2015 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1511871] [15-869] [Entered: 05/15/2015 04:31 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
          LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellants' brief due date as 05/15/2015, appellees' brief due date as 06/19/2015,TRANSMITTED.[1482465] [15-869] [Entered: 04/10/2015 04:10 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None
            NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1480687] [15-869] [Entered: 04/09/2015 10:07 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
              FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Dixie Daniels, Flight Attendants in Reunion, Colleen Hawk, Merry Larson and James Gordon Tuller, FILED. Service date 04/08/2015 by CM/ECF.[1480233] [15-869] [Entered: 04/08/2015 03:05 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Dixie Daniels, Flight Attendants in Reunion, Colleen Hawk, Merry Larson and James Gordon Tuller, FILED. Service date 04/08/2015 by CM/ECF.[1480179] [15-869] [Entered: 04/08/2015 02:26 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                  FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Dixie Daniels, Flight Attendants in Reunion, Colleen Hawk, Merry Larson and James Gordon Tuller, FILED. Service date 04/08/2015 by CM/ECF.[1479960] [15-869] [Entered: 04/08/2015 12:05 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                    ORDER, dated 04/07/2015, dismissing appeal by 04/21/2015, unless appellants Dixie Daniels, Flight Attendants in Reunion, Colleen Hawk, Merry Larson and James Gordon Tuller, submits form D, FILED.[1478329] [15-869] [Entered: 04/07/2015 10:01 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [9], on behalf of Appellant Dixie Daniels, Flight Attendants in Reunion, Colleen Hawk, Merry Larson and James Gordon Tuller, FILED.[1478296] [15-869] [Entered: 04/07/2015 09:48 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Dixie Daniels, Flight Attendants in Reunion, Colleen Hawk, Merry Larson and James Gordon Tuller, FILED. Service date 04/06/2015 by email, CM/ECF.[1478080] [15-869] [Entered: 04/06/2015 09:44 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee American Airlines, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/06/2015 by CM/ECF.[1477613] [15-869] [Entered: 04/06/2015 01:11 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Association of Professional Flight Attendants, FILED. Service date 04/06/2015 by CM/ECF.[1477355] [15-869] [Entered: 04/06/2015 10:54 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                              ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1469000] [15-869] [Entered: 03/25/2015 10:52 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/23/2015, RECEIVED.[1468992] [15-869] [Entered: 03/25/2015 10:51 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                  DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/20/2015, RECEIVED.[1468989] [15-869] [Entered: 03/25/2015 10:50 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Dixie Daniels, Flight Attendants in Reunion, Colleen Hawk, Merry Larson and James Gordon Tuller, FILED. [1468971] [15-869] [Entered: 03/25/2015 10:44 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?