Allen et al v. Pfizer, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10797-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alfred Morabito, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonsignore & Brewer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Bonsignore +1 781 391 9400 +1 781 391 9496 rbonsignore@bandblaw.net

Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

No Logo Laura Allen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonsignore & Brewer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Bonsignore +1 781 391 9400 +1 781 391 9496 rbonsignore@bandblaw.net

Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

No Logo Timothy Bridges, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonsignore & Brewer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Bonsignore +1 781 391 9400 +1 781 391 9496 rbonsignore@bandblaw.net

Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

v.
No Logo PARKE-DAVIS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by HARE & CHAFFIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David B. Chaffin +1 617 330 5000 +1 617 330 1996 dchaffin@hare-chaffin.com
Pfizer, Inc. Pfizer, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Arqule, Inc.
Unknown Role, Icagen, Inc.
Unknown Role, Zoetis Inc.
Unknown Role, Celladon Corp
Unknown Role, Pfizer Production LLC
Unknown Role, Icu Medical Inc/de
Unknown Role, Upjohn Inc
Unknown Role, Insite Vision, Inc.
Unknown Role, pSivida LTD
Unknown Role, Cortexyme, Inc.
Unknown Role, Imara Inc.
Unknown Role, Bioatla, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by HARE & CHAFFIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David B. Chaffin +1 617 330 5000 +1 617 330 1996 dchaffin@hare-chaffin.com
Office Boston
Filed 4/20/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Barnstable
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
104-cv-10981-PBS
Other Court Case 04-5600[Suffolk Superior Court]
Def Custody Status
Flag MDL
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Terminate Motions
Motions terminated: [2] MOTION to Remand filed by Laura Allen,, [6] MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Laura Allen,. Terminated per electronic order of 3/15/06. (Patch, Christine)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Order on Motion to Remand
    Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered staying [2] Motion to Remand, staying [6] Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. (Patch, Christine)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
      Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION to Remand filed by Laura Allen. (Bonsignore, Robert)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE by Laura Allen of Additional Relevant Authority In Support of Motion to Remand (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Bonsignore, Robert)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE by Laura Allen of Additional Relevant Authority in Support of Motion to Remand (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5)(Bonsignore, Robert)
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
            MEMORANDUM in Support re [6] MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Laura Allen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4)(Bonsignore, Robert)
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005, Terminated: 3/17/2006 Motion for Leave to File
              MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand by Laura Allen.(Bonsignore, Robert)
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE by Alfred Morabito, Laura Allen, Timothy Bridges Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(A)(1) (Bonsignore, Robert)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION to Remand filed by Laura Allen. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents# (2) Table of Authorities# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 1# (4) Exhibit Exhibit 2# (5) Exhibit Exhibit 3# (6) Exhibit Exhibit 4# (7) Exhibit Exhibit 5# (8) Exhibit Exhibit 6# (9) Exhibit Exhibit 7# (10) Exhibit Exhibit 8# (11) Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Bonsignore, Robert)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005, Terminated: 3/17/2006 Motion to Remand
                    MOTION to Remand by Laura Allen.(Bonsignore, Robert)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 state court record
                      STATE COURT Record Pfizer, Inc. served on 3/22/2005; Parke-Davis served on 4/18/2005.. (Patch, Christine)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Notice of Removal
                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pfizer, Inc., Parke-Davis from Suffolk Superior Court, case number 04-5600. $ 250, receipt number 63689. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Part 1# (2) Exhibit Part 2# (3) Exhibit Part 3# (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Patch, Christine)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Patch, Christine)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 113 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?