USA v. Nelson et al
Criminal Case Alabama Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00048

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 31, 2021 at 1:29 PM DT (1.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Meoshi Shanta Nelson, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark & Deen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jefferson Deen, III +1 251 433 5860 tjeffdeen@deenlawpc.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Response
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release from Custody
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Response
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Transcript Information Form
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Release from Custody
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Response
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Letter - Correspondence
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Re: First Step Act
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release from Custody
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Response
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Release from Custody
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release from Custody
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Release from Custody
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Release from Custody
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Objection
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release from Custody
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Release from Custody
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Judgment on Revocation of SRT
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Preliminary Hearing
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Satisfaction of Criminal Monetary Penalties
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Position re: Sentencing Factors
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Position re: Sentencing Factors
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Downward Departure
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry entered as to Meoshi Shanta Nelson Guilty as to Count 3,10,11, charging the offense of Counts 3 & 10: access device fraud and aiding and abetting in violation of 18:1029(a)(2)&2(a); Count 11: mail fraud and aiding and abetting in violation of 18:1341&2(a). Defense Counsel T. Jefferson Deen, III. Government Counsel Michael D. Anderson. Defendant's guilty plea was accepted 6/22/15 and Defendant was found guilty as charged. The plea agreement was written. The maximum penalties are Counts 3 & 10: 10 Years/$250,000./SRT 3 Years/SA $100; Count 11: 20 Years/$250,000./SRT 3 Years/SA $100. Pending sentencing Defendant shall remain on conditions of release. Court Reporter Mary Frances Giattina. This is a text only order. Sentencing set for 9/25/2015 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Presentence Investigation Report due 8/21/2015. On or before 9/11/2015 the parties shall each file a Position with Respect to Sentencing Factors in accordance with this Courts Standing Order Number Five. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/23/2015. (mbp) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 133 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          PLEA AGREEMENT as to Meoshi Shanta Nelson with Factual Resume (mbp) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Arraignment
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Meoshi Shanta Nelson, Brittany Burton, Clarence Patterson, Patricia Williams, Adrianne Williams, Regina Evans, Sophia Nelson, Johnetta Baldwin, Nikita Dixon re 83 MOTION to Continue in Interest of Justice filed by USA, The motion is under submission. The parties are to file a joint proposal for setting pretrial deadlines and the final pretrial conference and trial term. The proposal is to be filed not later than May 8, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/4/2015. (eec) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Continue-Ends of Justice
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/15/2015. (eec) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Meoshi Shanta Nelson, et al. Referred in open court to Judge William E. Cassady. (eec) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Order on Initial Appearance as to Meoshi Shanta Nelson. Defendant informed of rights. AUSA Michael Anderson appeared for the Government. Christopher Knight appeared for purpose of initial appearance only. Arraignment RESET for 4/29/2015 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. Defendant released on conditions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/15/2015. (eec) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Meoshi Shanta Nelson (eec) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT as to Meoshi Shanta Nelson (1) counts 1-6,10,11; Brittany Burton (2) counts 1,8-9; Clarence Patterson (3) count 2; Patricia Williams (4) count 4, Adrianne Williams (5) counts 4,6-7; Regina Evans (6) count 5; Sophia Nelson (7) count 6; Johnetta Baldwin (8) count 8; Nikita Dixon (9) count 9. (Attachments: # 1 Penalty Page, # 2 Signed Indictment) (mpp) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 2,297 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?