Rasetta et al v. RSG Contracting Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10837-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Christopher Barletta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo John J. Shaughnessy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis G. Rasetta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo RSG Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Enterprise Bank And Trust Company, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity P

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip S. Nyman +1 978 459 0754 +1 978 934 0614 pnyman@prospeed.net
Office Boston
Filed 4/25/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Middlesex
Terminated 10/19/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Nicewicz, Craig)
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprenticeship and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
      NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RSG Contracting. (Nicewicz, Craig)
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
          Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [13] Motion for Entry of Default (Nicewicz, Craig)
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005, Terminated: 8/31/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
            MOTION for Entry of Default by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprenticeship and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Answer
              ANSWER to Complaint by Eastern Contractors, Inc..(Elefther, Elizabeth)
                LREF
                Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 Answer
                ANSWER to Complaint by Enterprise Bank and Trust Company (Trustee).(Elefther, Elizabeth)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed RSG Contracting Corporation served on 7/11/2005, answer due 8/1/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered Authorizing the Issuance of Attachment by Trustee ProcessNote: Clerk mailed Summons to Trustee. (Attachments: # (1) Summons to Trustee)(Elefther, Elizabeth)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION(Elefther, Elizabeth)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [2] Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Affidavit
                          AFFIDAVIT of Gregory A. Geiman Pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 4(g) by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprenticeship and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                            Proposed Document(s) submitted by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprenticeship and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. Document received: Order for Preliminary Injunction. (Geiman, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Motion Hearing
                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2005 re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John J. Shaughnessy,, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund,, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4,, Christopher Barletta,, Louis G. Rasetta,, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund,, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund,, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprenticeship and Training Fund,. Plaintiff will prepare draft order for court. (Court Reporter Dahlstrom.) (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document #8 deleted and corrected because: entered order in wrong case. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                  NOTICE of Hearing on Motion motion for preliminary injunction and attachment: Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2005 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig) Modified on 7/11/2005 (Nicewicz, Craig).
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Summons Issued
                                    Trustee Summons Issued as to Enterprise Bank and Trust Company. Certified mail sent by Elizabeth E. Elefther. (Elefther, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/13/2005 (Elefther, Elizabeth).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Affidavit in Support
                                      AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci in Support of [2] Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Stanhope, Don)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                        Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Support of [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprenticeship and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Stanhope, Don)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                          Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprenticeship and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund.(Stanhope, Don)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT for Delinquent Fringe Benefit Contributions against RSG Contracting Corporation, Eastern Contractors, Inc. Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 63756, filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprenticeship and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C)(Stanhope, Don)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Stanhope, Don)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Summons Issued
                                                Summons Issued as to RSG Contracting Corporation, Eastern Contractors, Inc.. (Stanhope, Don)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?