Rasetta v. South Shore Crane Rental, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10802-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:57 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Christopher Barletta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo John J. Shaughnessy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis G. Rasetta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo South Shore Crane Rental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Community Bank, Trustee
Office Boston
Filed 4/21/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Middlesex
Terminated 11/10/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket No. 14,15,16,17,18,19 corrected because these entries were entered in this case inadvertently. These docket entries are part of Civil Case 06-cv-10663. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Terminate Motions
    Motions terminated: [14] SEALED MOTION filed by John J. Shaughnessy,, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund,, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4,, Christopher Barletta,, Louis G. Rasetta,, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund,, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund,, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund,. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Certificate Of Service.
      Sealed CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Affidavit
        Sealed AFFIDAVIT of Gregory A. Geiman by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Affidavit
          Sealed AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Affidavit
            Sealed AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
              MEMORANDUM in Support re [14] SEALED MOTION filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006, Terminated: 4/19/2006 Sealed Motion +
                Ex Parte SEALED MOTION by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund.(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Writ Issued
                  WRIT of First Execution issued.(clerk mailed original to Gregory A. Geiman) (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs (Nicewicz, Craig)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ElectronicORDER entered granting [6] Motion for Default Judgment (Nicewicz, Craig)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                        AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills in Support re [6] MOTION for Default Judgment as to South Shore Crane Rental, Inc. filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                          AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci in Support re [6] MOTION for Default Judgment as to South Shore Crane Rental, Inc. filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                            AFFIDAVIT of Gina Alongi in Support re [6] MOTION for Default Judgment as to South Shore Crane Rental, Inc. filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                              Proposed Document(s) submitted by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. Document received: Default Judgment. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [6] MOTION for Default Judgment as to South Shore Crane Rental, Inc. filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005, Terminated: 11/10/2005 Motion for Default Judgment
                                  MOTION for Default Judgment as to South Shore Crane Rental, Inc. by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to File (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005, Terminated: 7/13/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/31/05 to File For Entry of Default Judgment by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Mail Returned
                                        Notice of Default- Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to South Shore Crane Rental Inc was returned again because address is as follows: 785 Washington Street, P.O. Box 541, South Easton, MA 02325. Clerk remailed by certified mail to address. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Mail Returned
                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail re-sent by certified mail to South Shore Crane Rental Inc (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                                            NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to South Shore Crane Rental, Inc. SERVED at 785 Washington Street, South Easton, MA. (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                                              Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [3] Motion for Entry of Default (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005, Terminated: 6/15/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                MOTION for Entry of Default by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed South Shore Crane Rental, Inc. served on 5/10/2005, answer due 5/31/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT for Delinquent Fringe Benefit Contributions and to Obtain an Audit against South Shore Crane Rental, Inc. Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 63696, filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Annuity Fund, Christopher Barletta, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaughnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Civil Cover Sheet # (5) Category Sheet)(Stanhope, Don)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Stanhope, Don)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Summons Issued
                                                        Summons Issued as to South Shore Crane Rental, Inc.. (Stanhope, Don)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?