USA v. Force et al
Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-mj-70370-MAG

Tags
Last Updated August 15, 2017 at 11:40 PM EDT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Frentzen +1 415 436 6959 william.frentzen@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn R. Haun +1 415 436 6740 kathryn.haun@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Carl Mark Force, IV, Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 3/25/2015
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level 4
18641 - Theft of Government Property, 181343 - Wire Fraud, 181956(h) - Money Laundering, 18208 - Conflict of Interest
Defendant Custody Status
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 34 Stipulation TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME UNDER RULE 5.1 AND EXCLUSION OF TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT as to Carl Force (1) and Shaun W. Bridges (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/10/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 30 Stipulation TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME UNDER RULE 5.1 AND EXCLUSION OF TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/20/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
          First MOTION for Medical Treatment Motion for Court Order for Defendant's Medication by Carl Mark Force, IV as to Carl Mark Force, IV, Shaun W. Bridges. (Bates, Ivan) (Filed on 5/12/2015) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 27 Joint Stipulated Protective Order as to Carl Mark Force IV (1), Shaun W. Bridges (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/11/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Carl Mark Force, IV, Shaun W. Bridges RE: Discovery filed by Shaun W. Bridges. (Levin, Steven) (Filed on 5/11/2015) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Continue
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                    Sealed Document as to Carl Mark Force, IV, Shaun W. Bridges (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE [REDACTED UNITED STATES' MOTION IN SUPPORT OF DETENTION] by USA as to Carl Mark Force, IV, Shaun W. Bridges (Haun, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/28/2015) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                        Sealed Document as to Shaun W. Bridges (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                          Sealed Document as to Shaun W. Bridges (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Warrant Returned Executed
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/30/2015 as to Shaun W. Bridges. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Richard B Evans appearing for USA. (Evans, Richard) (Filed on 4/17/2015) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Attorney: IVAN BATES. ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9417107.) by Carl Mark Force, IV as to Carl Mark Force, IV, Shaun W. Bridges. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge. (Bates, Ivan) (Filed on 4/3/2015) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Application and Order to Unseal Document 3 re Sealed Paragraph from affidavit as to Carl Mark Force, IV, Shaun W. Bridges. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/31/2015. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Shaun W. Bridges (2) $500,000 unsecured. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/30/15. (rhwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James:Initial Appearance as to Shaun W. Bridges held on 3/30/2015, Added attorney Steven Hale Levin for Shaun W. Bridges. Government moved to unseal entire case--granted. Status Conference set for 5/5/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (Recording #FTR 9:53-9:56; 10:46-10:54.) (rhwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
                                            LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document  Set/Reset Hearings
                                            Set/Reset Hearing re [1] Complaint (Sealed) Initial Appearance set for 3/30/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Order to Seal Document
                                              Document under seal (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/30/2015 (rhwS, COURT STAFF).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Order to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                                                Sealing Application and Order to Seal as to Carl Mark Force, IV, Shaun W. Bridges. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/25/2015. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015) (rhwS, COURT STAFF).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Complaint(Sealed)
                                                  COMPLAINT as to Carl Mark Force, IV (1), Shaun W. Bridges (2). (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/30/2015 (rhwS, COURT STAFF). (rhwS, COURT STAFF).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Case Referred to ECF
                                                    CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (rhwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 1,219 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?