Kelley v. State of Nebraska
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nebraska District Court, Case No. 8:15-cv-00105

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 6:33 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Kenneth E. Kelley, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth E. Kelley
No Logo Diane Sabatka-Rhine, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Nebraska Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle J. Citta +1 402 471 1917 +1 402 471 4725 kyle.citta@nebraska.gov
Space Amie E. Larson +1 402 471 9652 +1 402 471 4725 amie.larson@nebraska.gov
No Logo Michael Kenney, Respondent
No Logo State Of Nebraska, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Michele M. Lewon +1 712 255 8050 +1 712 255 3047 mlewon@cableone.net
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Jonathan F. Mitchell +1 703 314 9276 +1 617 748 3960 jfmitchell@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BOUCHER LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Jennifer M. Tomka +1 402 475 3865 +1 402 475 2326 jtomka@boucherlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CAPELL & HOWARD PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Darryl J. Horowitt +1 559 248 4820 +1 559 248 4830 dhorowitt@ch-law.com
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska TTAB Attorney Placeholder sflynn@ch-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Lawrence VanDyke +1 775 684 1100 lvandyke@ag.nv.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by LANCASTER COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Kevin K. Stephenson kevin.stephenson@ago.ne.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Alabama Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Corey L Maze +1 334 353 4336 +1 334 353 8440 cmaze@ago.state.al.us
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Brett J. Talley +1 334 353 2187 btalley@ago.state.al.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Nicholas Bronni +1 501 682 6302

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Missouri Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska John A. Hirth +1 573 526 5679 +1 573 751 9456 andy.hirth@ago.mo.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Nebraska Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska David T. Bydalek +1 402 471 2682 +1 402 471 3297 dave.bydalek@nebraska.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Stephanie A. Caldwell +1 402 471 2682 +1 402 471 0006 stephanie.caldwell@nebraska.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Leslie Campbell-Levy +1 402 471 2811 +1 402 471 2957 leslie.levy@nebraska.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Frederick J. Coffman +1 402 471 1803 +1 402 471 4725 fred.coffman@ago.ne.us
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska David D. Cookson +1 402 471 2682 +1 402 471 3297 david.cookson@nebraska.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Ryan C. Gilbride +1 402 471 2682 +1 402 471 4725 ryan.gilbride@nebraska.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Kevin L. Griess +1 402 471 1813 +1 402 471 2957 kevin.griess@nebraska.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Blake E. Johnson +1 402 471 1912 blake.johnson@nebraska.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska COLLIN M. KESSNER +1 402 471 1928 collin.kessner@nebraska.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska David A. Lopez +1 402 471 2682 +1 402 471 3297 dave.lopez@nebraska.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Corey M. O'Brien +1 402 471 3833 +1 402 471 3591 corey.obrien@nebraska.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Ryan S. Post +1 402 471 1814 +1 402 471 3297 ryan.post@nebraska.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Linda L. Willard +1 402 471 2757 +1 402 471 3591 linda.willard@nebraska.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Texas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska John Campbell Barker +1 512 396 1700 +1 512 474 2697 cam.barker@texasattorneygeneral.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Adam Arthur Biggs +1 512 463 2120 +1 512 320 0667 adam.biggs@oag.texas.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Adam Nicholas Bitter +1 512 936 2422 +1 512 320 0667 adam.bitter@texasattorneygeneral.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Angela Veronica Colmenero +1 512 463 9917 +1 512 320 0667 angela.colmenero@oag.state.tx.us
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Arthur D'Andrea +1 512 936 2868 arthur.dandrea@texasattorneygeneral.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska William Terrell Deane +1 512 463 2120 +1 512 320 0667 bill.deane@oag.state.tx.us
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska David Jonathan Hacker +1 512 936 2330 +1 512 936 0545 david.hacker@oag.texas.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Eric A. Hudson +1 512 936 6417 +1 512 477 2348 eric.hudson@texasattorneygeneral.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Scott A. Keller +1 512 936 1700 +1 512 474 2697 scott.keller@texasattorneygeneral.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Austin R Nimocks +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 370 9337 austin.nimocks@texasattorneygeneral.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Andrew S. Oldham +1 512 936 1700 +1 512 474 2697 andy.oldham@texasattorneygeneral.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska David Austin Robert Nimocks +1 512 936 1414 austin.nimocks@oag.texas.gov
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Prerak Shah +1 512 936 1700 +51247269 512 247 2697 prerak.shah@texasattorneygeneral.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by PANSING, HOGAN LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska David L. Welch +1 402 397 5500 +1 402 397 4853 dwelch@pheblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Jon C. Bruning +1 402 261 3475 anita@bruninglawgroup.com
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Katherine J. Spohn +1 402 261 3475 katie@bruninglawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska Bennett J. Matelson +1 202 616 5871 +1 202 514 7308 bennett.matelson@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wanger Jones Helsley PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through, Jon C. Bruning, Atttorney General of the State of Nebraska John P. Kinsey +1 559 233 4800 +1 559 233 9330 jkinsey@wjhattorneys.com
No Logo Office of the Nebraska Attorney General, Interested Party
Officially listed as "Nebraska Attorney General"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Nebraska Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas J. Peterson +1 402 471 2683 +1 402 471 3297 kim.schwaninger@nebraska.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon C. Bruning +1 402 261 3475 anita@bruninglawgroup.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Respondent's 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Kelley's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. The Court will enter judgment by separate order. The Court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Brief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None State Court Records
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Substitute Party
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Kelleys Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 2 ) is denied without prejudice. The clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to Respondents and the Nebraska Atto rney General by regular first-class mail. By August 17, 2015, Respondents must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. If Respondents elect to file a motion for summary judgment, the procedures set forth in the order must be followed by Respondents and Petitioner. If Respondents elect to file an answer, the procedures set forth within the order must be followed by Respondents and Petitioner. No later than 30 days after Petitioners brief is filed, Respondents must file and serve a reply brief. In the event that Respondents elect not to file a reply brief, they should inform the court by filing a notice stating that they will not file a reply brief and that the merits of the petition are theref ore fully submitted for decision. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/17/2015: deadline for Respondents to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without fur ther notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO 240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/4/2015:Check for MIFP or payment) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form AO 240)(MKR)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (MKR)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Petitioner Kenneth E. Kelley.(MKR)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                          PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of Petitioner Kenneth E. Kelley. (MKR)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 19 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?