Credit Acceptance Corporation v. Niemeier
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:15-cv-00555-CEJ
District Judge Carol E. Jackson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 4:55 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Bennett +1 314 889 7302 +1 314 863 2111 jbennett@dowdbennett.com
Space John D. Comerford +1 314 889 7311 +1 314 863 2111 jcomerford@dowdbennett.com
v.
No Logo Darren M. Niemeier, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell B. Stoddard +1 314 692 2001 +1 314 692 2002 mbs@clalaw.com
Office St. Louis
Filed 3/30/2015
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 896 - Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause Section 09 U.S.C. § 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Within US but Outside District
Terminated 11/10/2015
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal)Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In accordance with the parties joint stipulation for dismissal, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/10/15. (JAB)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/7/2015, Entered: 11/7/2015 stipulation
    STIPULATION or Dismissal With Prejudice by Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Comerford, John)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Memorandum & ORDERCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that respondents motion to dismiss [Doc. #[13]] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petition to compel arbitration [Doc. #[1]] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is stayed pending completion of arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, not later than ten (10) days after the conclusion of the arbitration, the parties shall file a notice informing the Court that the arbitration has concluded. If the arbitration is not concluded by January 1, 2016, the parties must on that date file a joint report setting forth the status of the arbitration. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/10/15. (JAB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 response in opposition to motion
        Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Its Petition to Compel Arbitration and for an Injunction in Aid of Arbitration/RESPONSE in Opposition re [13] MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Comerford, John) Modified text on 5/22/2015 (KKS).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 memorandum in support of motion
          MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re [13] MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Darren M. Niemeier. (Stoddard, Mitchell)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015, Terminated: 7/10/2015 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Darren M. Niemeier. (Stoddard, Mitchell)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Docket Text OrderCourt Filing
              Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING [11] MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration and for Injunctive Relief in Aid of Arbitration by Defendant Darren M. Niemeier. ( Response to Court due by 5/18/2015.). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/27/15. (KKS)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2015, Entered: 4/26/2015, Terminated: 4/27/2015 Motion for Extension
                MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond by Defendant Darren M. Niemeier. (Stoddard, Mitchell)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2015, Entered: 4/26/2015 Entry of Appearance
                  ENTRY of Appearance by Mitchell B. Stoddard for Defendant Darren M. Niemeier. (Stoddard, Mitchell)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                    ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to continue and reschedule hearing [Doc. #8] is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/23/2015. (KMS)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015, Terminated: 4/23/2015 Motion to Continue
                      MOTION to Continue Hearing on Petition to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Comerford, John)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 summons returned executed
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. Darren M. Niemeier served on 4/6/2015, answer due 4/27/2015. (Comerford, John)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Case Opening Notification
                          Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorneys James F. Bennett & John D. Comerford. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Carol E. Jackson. (BAK)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Entry of Appearance
                            ENTRY of Appearance by John D. Comerford for Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Comerford, John)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Disclosure of OrganizationalInterests Certificate
                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bennett, James)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice of Process Server
                                NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation Process Server: Robert Thomure (Bennett, James)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice - other
                                  NOTICE by Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation of Petition to Compel Arbitration (Bennett, James)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 3/30/2015 Motion to compel
                                    MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bennett, James) Modified on 3/31/2015 (BAK).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT - Petition to Compel Arbitration against defendant Darren Niemeier with receipt number 0865-4797198, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Civil Cover Sheet, # (8) Original Filing Form)(Bennett, James) Modified on 3/31/2015 (BAK). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2015: # (9) Summons) (BAK).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 210 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?