USA, et al v. Londono, et al
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:98-mj-01009-ZRK

Tags
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 1:45 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Farley +1 617 748 3252 +1 617 748 3954 john.farley@usdoj.gov
Office Boston
Filed 3/13/1998
County Middlesex
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
21846 conspire and knowingly intend to distribute cocaine
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag INTERP
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : denying [28-1] motion for reconsideration of [19-1] detention order as to Maria L. Florez (2). "no new information has been presented that warrants reconsideration" (fmr)
    LREF
    Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : denying [28-1] motion for reconsideration of [19-1] detention order as to Maria L. Florez (2). "no new information has been presented that warrants reconsideration" (fmr)
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/10/1998 Motion for Reconsideration
      MOTION by Maria L. Florez for reconsideration of [19-1] detention order , filed. (sealed)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Motion to Unseal Case
        MOTION by USA , as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez to unseal [24-1] order, [23-1] affidavit, [22-1] motion for authorization of trape and trace device , filed. (fmr)
          LREF
          Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
          Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : granting [25-1] motion to unseal [24-1] order, [23-1] affidavit, [22-1] motion for authorization of trape and trace device as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2). (fmr)
            LREF
            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
            Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : granting [25-1] motion to unseal [24-1] order, [23-1] affidavit, [22-1] motion for authorization of trape and trace device as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2). (fmr)
              LREF
              Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
              Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : granting [21-1] motion for Charles McGinty to withdraw as attorney (Terminated as to Maria L. Florez (2). (fmr)
                LREF
                Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : granting [21-1] motion for Charles McGinty to withdraw as attorney (Terminated as to Maria L. Florez (2). (fmr)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                  MOTION by Maria L. Florez for Charles McGinty to withdraw as attorney , filed. (fmr)
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono , re: detention hearing; Court hears agruement. Court finds probable cause. The defendant consents to detentions at this time ; Court Reporter: Tape (fmr)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Appearance Through Counsel
                      First appearance through counsel as to Gustavo Londono . (fmr)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Appearance Through Counsel
                        First appearance through counsel as to Gustavo Londono . (fmr)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Detention Hearing
                          Detention hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . (fmr)
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                            Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered for detention as to Maria L. Florez Bond set to NO BAIL for Maria L. Florez. (fmr)
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                              Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CJA appointment for Gustavo Londono , Attorney Lenore Glaser appointed. Voucher # 0986404. (fmr)
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono : for temporary detention . (fmr)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                  Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono , re: scheduled detention hearing; Peter Krupp informs court of conflict and askes to be excused. Court excuses Peter Krupp. Court informs defendant of right of hearing and right of counsel. Defendant detained pending detention hearing on 3/23/98 ; Court Reporter: Tape (fmr)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                    Scheduled detention hearing hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . (fmr)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                      Scheduled detention hearing hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . (fmr)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                        Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CJA appointment for Gustavo Londono , Attorney Peter B. Krupp appointed. Voucher # 0986403. (fmr)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                          Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono : for temporary detention . (fmr)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                            Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono , re: defendant moves for continuance; Court orders defendant detained pending detention hearing ; Court Reporter: Tape (fmr)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                              Scheduled detention hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . (fmr)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                Scheduled detention hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . (fmr)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                  Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono : for temporary detention . (fmr)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono , re: scheduled detention hearing; Atty Donohue has a conflict and detention hearing is reset ; Court Reporter: Tape (fmr)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Docket Annotation
                                                      Suggested conditions of release by Maria L. Florez (fmr)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                        Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Maria L. Florez , re: detention hearing; Arguement heard. Court finds probable cause. The court takes the matter of detention under advisement ; Court Reporter: Tape (fmr)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Appearance Through Counsel
                                                          First appearance through counsel as to Gustavo Londono . (fmr)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                            Detention hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . (fmr)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                              Detention hearing as to Maria L. Florez held . (fmr)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : for temporary detention . (fmr)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                  Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez , re: scheduled detention hearing; Dfts move for continuance. Court explains to dft Londono that counsel has been appointed and will represent him tomorrow. Dft Londono assents to continuance. Court orders dfts detained pending hearing ; Court Reporter: Tape (fmr)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : for temporary detention . (fmr)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Order Appointing Federal Defender Program.Court Filing
                                                                      Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered Appointing Federal Public Defender for Maria L. Florez . (fmr)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                        CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Maria L. Florez , as to Maria L. Florez , filed. (fmr)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                          CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Gustavo Londono , as to Gustavo Londono , filed. (fmr)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                            Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez , re: initial appearance; dfts file a financial affidavits. Dfts request counsel. Court orders counsel. Gov't moves for detention and for continuance. Court orders defendants detained pending hearing on 3/17/98 at 2:30 ; Court Reporter: Tape (fmr)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                              Initial appearance as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez held (Defendant informed of rights.) . (fmr)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Arrest
                                                                                ARREST of Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . (fmr)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Docket Annotation
                                                                                  Search Warrant as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez (fmr)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    MOTION by USA , as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez for search warrant filed. (fmr)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez , filed. Pretrial Services (fmr) Modified on 03/25/1998
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Arrest Warrant Issued
                                                                                        Arrest warrant issued as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . (fmr) Modified on 03/25/1998
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                          Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : granting [22-1] motion for authorization of trape and trace device as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2) . (fmr)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Agent Dermot Quinn, as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez , re: [22-1] motion for authorization of trape and trace device , filed. (fmr)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                              MOTION by USA , as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez for authorization of trape and trace device filed. (fmr)
                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?