Acker v. City of Somerville Police Department et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10848-MLW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William Z. Acker, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo City of Somerville Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Massachusetts Trial Court, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 4/27/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Lack of Jurisdiction
County Middlesex
Terminated 10/13/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Mail Returned
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Z. Acker returned. Memorandum and Order dated 10/13/05 re-mailed as it is not clear why the mail was returned. (Boyce, Kathy)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER DISMISSING CASE entered.(PSSA1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Mark L. Wolf : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees is Allowed. This action is dismissed for the reasons stated in the Memorandum and Order, dated October 13, 2005 Nunc Pro Tunc April 28, 2005. (PSSA1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
        Letter/Motion to the court to notify the court that the May 2nd, 2005 hearing at the Somerville Mass Trial Court has been continued to May 9, 2005 at 2:00 p.m., FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Motion for Order
          MOTION for an Order delaying a court hearing at Somerville District Court by William Z. Acker, FILED.(Boyce, Kathy)
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against City of Somerville Police Department, Massachusetts Trial Court Filing fee: $ 0.00, receipt number 0.00, filed by William Z. Acker. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Jenness, Susan)
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005, Terminated: 10/13/2005 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Z. Acker.(Jenness, Susan)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Jenness, Susan)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?