Renkowic v. State of Massachusetts et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:05-cv-30103-MAP

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Donald Renkowic, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Anthony Sergeant Nevue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles M. Maguire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles M. Maguire +1 413 586 2294 charles@charlesmaguire.com
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Defendant
Officially listed as "State of Massachusetts"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William P. O'Neill +1 413 784 1240 +1 413 784 1244 william.o'neill@ago.state.ma.us
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitt Romney"
No Logo Hampshire County House of Correction and Jail, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles M. Maguire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles M. Maguire +1 413 586 2294 charles@charlesmaguire.com
No Logo Jeffery Fish, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles M. Maguire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles M. Maguire +1 413 586 2294 charles@charlesmaguire.com
No Logo Lieutenant Jeffery Fish, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles M. Maguire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles M. Maguire +1 413 586 2294 charles@charlesmaguire.com
No Logo Office of the Attorney General, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William P. O'Neill +1 413 784 1240 +1 413 784 1244 william.o'neill@ago.state.ma.us
No Logo Robert Garvey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles M. Maguire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles M. Maguire +1 413 586 2294 charles@charlesmaguire.com
No Logo Sheriff Robert Garvey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles M. Maguire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles M. Maguire +1 413 586 2294 charles@charlesmaguire.com
Office Springfield
Filed 4/27/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Hampshire
Terminated 3/6/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants State of Massachusetts, et al, against Plaintiff Donald Renkowic. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice)
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    Judge Michael A Ponsor : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered; adopting [19] Report and Recommendations, and granting Dft's [10] & [16] Motions to Dismiss. See the attached memo & order for complete details. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Notice regarding mandatory registration for ECF (W
      NOTICE issued to Attorney Charles M. Maguire regarding mandatory registration with ECF in compliance with the Standing Order entered by Judge Ponsor and Magistrate Judge Neiman. (Lindsay, Maurice)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
        Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Lindsay, Maurice)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Terminated Case
          Civil Case Terminated. (Lindsay, Maurice)
            LREF
            Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006, Terminated: 3/6/2006 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
            Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [16] MOTION to Dismiss and [10] MOTION to Dismiss ENTERED, cc:cl/Pltf. Recommendation: "...For the foregoing reasons, the court recommends that the Commonwealth Defendants' motion to dismiss (Document No. 10) and the Jail Defendants' motion to dismiss (Document No. 16) each be ALLOWED." Objections to R&R due by 3/2/2006(Healy, Bethaney)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ELECTRONIC ORDER denying [13] Motion to obtain transcript of Hampshire County Spuerior Criminal Docket No. 2004cr123 under motion to proceed IFP ENTERED, cc;cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: [11] Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss corrected because: Document was originally electronically filed as a motion rather than a memorandum in support of [10] motion to dismiss. Per instruction of court, the entry was edited. (Healy, Bethaney)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Opposition to Motion
                  Ptf's Opposition to Dft's [16] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Donald Renkowic. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 USM Process Receipt and Return
                    US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for summons and complaint. Gov. Mitt Romney served and delivered on 10/05/2005. (Finn, Mary)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005, Terminated: 3/6/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION to Dismiss by Jeffery Fish, Anthony Sergeant Nevue, Hampshire County House of Correction and Jail, Robert Garvey.(Lindsay, Maurice)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                        Judge Michael A Ponsor : Electronic ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION [11] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts,, State of Massachusetts,, Mitt Romney,, Office of the Attorney General,, [13] MOTION to obtain transcript of Hampshire County Superior Criminal Docket # 2004cr123 under his motion tp proceed IFP filed by Donald Renkowic,, [10] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts,, Robert Garvey,, Hampshire County House of Correction and Jail,, State of Massachusetts,, Mitt Romney,, Office of the Attorney General,, Jeffery Fish,, Anthony Sergeant Nevue, to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman(French, Elizabeth)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                          Marshals return of service re: SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jeffery Fish served on 8/24/2005, answer due 9/13/2005; Anthony Sergeant Nevue served on 8/24/2005, answer due 9/13/2005; Hampshire County House of Correction and Jail served on 8/24/2005, answer due 9/13/2005; Robert Garvey served on 8/24/2005, answer due 9/13/2005. (Finn, Mary)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005, Terminated: 2/10/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            Ptf's MOTION to obtain transcript of Hampshire County Superior Criminal Docket # 2004cr123 under his motion to proceed IFP., by Donald Renkowic.(Lindsay, Maurice)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Response
                              Ptf's Opposition to Dft. State of Mass, et al by Donald Renkowic. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005, Terminated: 2/10/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                Dft's Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Dismiss by State of Massachusetts, Mitt Romney, Office of the Attorney General, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Massachusetts.(Lindsay, Maurice) Modified on 2/10/2006 (Healy, Bethaney).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005, Terminated: 3/6/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                  Dfts' MOTION to Dismiss by State of Massachusetts, Mitt Romney, Office of the Attorney General, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Massachusetts filed. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                    Marshals return of service re: SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Office of the Attorney General - Tom Reilly, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Secretary of Public Safety, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Executive Office of Public Safety. All served on 7/7/2005. Answer due 7/27/2005. (Finn, Mary)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by William P. O'Neill on behalf of State of Massachusetts, Office of the Attorney General, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                        Judge Kenneth P. Neiman : Electronic ORDER entered denying [4] Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel as well as [5] Plaintiff's Motion for Service by Regular Mail. See [2] Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                          Judge Michael A Ponsor : Electronic ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION [4] MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Donald Renkowic,, [5] MOTION for service by regular first clas mail filed by Donald Renkowic, to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman(French, Elizabeth)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Donald Renkowic (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005, Terminated: 7/5/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              MOTION for service by regular first clas mail by Donald Renkowic.(Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005, Terminated: 7/5/2005 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donald Renkowic.(Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against Jeffery Fish, Anthony Sergeant Nevue, State of Massachusetts, Mitt Romney, Office of the Attorney General, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Hampshire County House of Correction and Jail, Robert Garvey Filing fee: waived, filed by Donald Renkowic. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits# (2) Exhibits (not scanned)# (3) Cover & Category Sheets)(Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                                                    Judge Kenneth P. Neiman : ORDER entered granting [1] Motion/Application to Proceed without prepayment of fees in forma pauperis. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                      MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed without prepayment of fees (in forma pauperis) by Donald Renkowic.(Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?