Tradex Corporation v. Richard T. King
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10867-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Richard T. King, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach & Carpenter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Ellen Carpenter +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phoebe D. Morse +1 617 788 0440 +1 617 565 5601 phoebe.morse@usdoj.gov
Space Lisa D. Tingue +1 508 793 0555 +1 508 793 0558 lisa.d.tingue@usdoj.gov
No Logo Tradex Corporation, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence G. Green +1 617 345 3299 lgreen@burnslev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Block, Schorr and Solis-Cohen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Juliane Balliro +1 617 226 4000 +1 617 226 4500 jballiro@wolfblock.com
Space Paul A. Leoni +1 617 226 4027 +1 617 226 4500 pleoni@wolfblock.com
Office Boston
Filed 4/26/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Suffolk
Terminated 3/31/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Status Conference
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status Conference held on 12/20/2007: Jess Rae Booth appearing Pro Se and by telephone; As to case 04-cv-12227: no further argument as to Motion for Summary Judgment; Court sets an Evidentiary Hearing as to [375] Motion for Order to Show Cause on 2/13/08 through 2/15/08 @ 9:00 AM. Discovery requests re: parties who are subject to contempt are due by 1/4/08 and responses are due 2 weeks thereafter; as to case 06-cv-40199: Court grants the parties request to participate in the ADR Program, any further submissions shall be filed by 1/4/08; as to case 05-cv-12150: with the consent of the parties, the Court takes this matter off the trial list pending the outcome of pending motions for summary judgment in related matters; as to case 05-cv-10268: Courts ruling as to motion for summary judgment still pending; as to case 05-cv-12252 the parties are amenable to await the resolution of pending motions for summary judgment in related matters. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock)(Attorneys present: Panos, Salvage via telephone, Rein, Connolly, White, Stacey, Roach, Davilas, McGee, Butters, Stern) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-12227-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE.(Rynne, Michelle)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered affirming the decision of the bankruptcy court to appoint a Chapter 11 trustee. (Woodlock, Douglas)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal
        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal held on 5/31/2005. Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Valerie O'Hara.) (Rynne, Michelle)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Appellees Brief
          Appellee's BRIEF by Richard T. King. (Tingue, Lisa)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Remark
            BANKRUPTCY RECORD received. (Rynne, Michelle)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005, Terminated: 3/31/2006 Motion to Correct
              MOTION to Correct [3] Brief by Recaptioning it as "Tradex Corporation" as Appellant by Tradex Corporation.(Leoni, Paul)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 Opposition to Motion
                Opposition re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Appeal and to Strike Brief of Charles Gitto filed by Tradex Corporation. (Leoni, Paul)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005, Terminated: 3/31/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss Appeal and to Strike Brief of Charles Gitto by Richard T. King.(Morse, Phoebe)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Appendix/Exhibit
                    APPENDIX to the [3] Brief of Appellant by Tradex Corporation. ***Bound and Unscanned*** (Nici, Richard)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Brief
                      BRIEF of Appellant by Tradex Corporation. ***Bound and Unscanned*** (Nici, Richard)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order
                        Bankruptcy Scheduling Order setting expedited briefing schedule: Appellant Brief due by 5/13/2005. Appellee Brief due by 5/27/2005. Hearing on Bankruptcy Appeal 5/31/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Rynne, Michelle)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Notice of hearing(other)
                          NOTICE of Hearing re on Bankruptcy Appeal :Hearing set for 5/31/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Order on Motion to Stay
                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered denying [1] Motion to Stay (Rynne, Michelle)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005, Terminated: 5/2/2005 Motion to Stay
                              Expedited MOTION to Stay the Bankruptcy Court's Order of April 7, 2005 Appointing a Chapter 11 Trustee Pending Appeal by Tradex Corporation. (Attachments: # (1))(Gawlik, Cathy)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?