Aguilar v. Muscletech Research and Development, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10871-RCL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sharon Aguilar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boise Cascade Wood Products Holdings Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Appel +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 appel@srbc.com
v.
No Logo Gn Oldco Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peabody & Arnold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher R. Conroy +1 617 951 2079 +1 617 951 2125 cconroy@peabodyarnold.com
No Logo Muscle Tech Research And Development, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Albert P. Zabin +1 617 289 9283 +1 617 289 9201 apzabin@duanemorris.com
Office Boston
Filed 4/28/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Middlesex
Terminated 2/28/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 case transferred out - district transfer
Case transferred out District to the Southern District of New York pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 6/28/05. Original file with documents numbered 1-10, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (York, Steve)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Remark
    Conditional Transfer Order., Filed (York, Steve)
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Muscletech Research and Development, Inc.. (Nici, Richard)
        LREF
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GN Oldco Corporation. (Abaid, Kim)
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Answer
            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by GN Oldco Corporation.(Abaid, Kim)
              LREF
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Conroy on behalf of GN Oldco Corporation (Abaid, Kim)
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Campbell on behalf of GN Oldco Corporation (Abaid, Kim)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Answer
                  ANSWER to Complaint by Muscletech Research and Development, Inc..(Nici, Richard)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Stipulation
                    STIPULATION extending time for defendant to file responsive pleading by 6/20/05 by Sharon Aguilar, Muscletech Research and Development, Inc. filed. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against Muscletech Research and Development, Inc., GN Oldco Corporation Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 63855, filed by Sharon Aguilar. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Stanhope, Don)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Summons Issued
                        Summons Issued as to Muscletech Research and Development, Inc., GN Oldco Corporation. (Stanhope, Don)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Stanhope, Don)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 68 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?