Simone v. United States of America
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-935

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 5:19 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORMS C AND D, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [14], [15], [16], on behalf of Appellant Gertrude Simone and Philip Simone, FILED.[1482695] [15-935] [Entered: 04/13/2015 08:41 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 04/01/2015 by CM/ECF. [1474638] [15-935] [Entered: 04/01/2015 02:06 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 04/01/2015 by CM/ECF. [1474142] [15-935] [Entered: 04/01/2015 09:48 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
        ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1472506] [15-935] [Entered: 03/30/2015 03:42 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
          DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1472502] [15-935] [Entered: 03/30/2015 03:41 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
            DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1472498] [15-935] [Entered: 03/30/2015 03:41 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Gertrude Simone and Philip Simone, FILED. [1472490] [15-935] [Entered: 03/30/2015 03:38 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 41 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?