Allen v. The United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10886-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tammy Allen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lubin & Meyer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. Thompson +1 617 720 4447 +1 617 720 1229 bthompson@lubinandmeyer.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "The United States of America"
Office Boston
Filed 4/29/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Suffolk
Terminated 5/10/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE For failure of the plaintiff to file a return of service and/or show good cause why service has not been made, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 4.1(b).(Nicewicz, Craig)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Order on Motion for Disclosure
    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ElectronicORDER entered finding as moot [2] Motion for Disclosure. This pleading was improperly filed as a motion and is a discovery document. (Nicewicz, Craig)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005, Terminated: 9/20/2005 Motion for Disclosure
      First MOTION for Disclosure of Medical Information to Defendant, Michael Kelly, M.D. Pursuant to Rule 35.1 by Tammy Allen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C,D# (4) Exhibit E,F,G,H,I# (5) Exhibit J)(Thompson, William)
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against The United States of America Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 63876, filed by Tammy Allen. (Attachments: # (1) civil cover and category sheet)(Edge, Eugenia)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Edge, Eugenia)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Summons Issued as to USA
            Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Edge, Eugenia)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 16 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?