United States v. ROSSI
Criminal Case Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cr-00109

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 7, 2021 at 10:36 AM DT (1.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DEAN ROSSI, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Cedrone & Mancano, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained MARK E. CEDRONE +1 215 925 2500 +1 215 925 6471 mec@cedrone-mancano.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (153) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Stay
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Modify
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Order to Suspend Sentence
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Modify
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Transcript - PDF
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Transcript - PDF
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Transcript - PDF
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Transcript - PDF
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Transcript - PDF
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Judgment
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Judgment of Forfeiture
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Sentencing
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Request
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Request
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Transcript - RESTRICTED
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Transcript - RESTRICTED
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Sentencing
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Judgment of Forfeiture
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Transcript - RESTRICTED
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Transcript - RESTRICTED
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Transcript - RESTRICTED
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Transcript - RESTRICTED
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Transcript - RESTRICTED
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Transcript - RESTRICTED
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Transcript - RESTRICTED
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Abstract of Order for Presentence Investigation
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Order for Lunch
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Jury Verdict Sheet
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None jury verdict
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Acquittal
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None order on motion in limine
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None response
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/13/2018, Entered: None proposed voir dire
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/13/2018, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Jury Verdict Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None CJA 20 - Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Transcript - RESTRICTED
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Superseding Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Regarding United States Passport for Criminal Defendant as to DEAN ROSSI. (mac, ) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE AS TO DEAN ROSSI (1) THAT DEFENDANT IS RELEASED ON BAIL IN THE AMOUNT OF $50,000 O/R WITH THE FOLLOWING CONDITIONS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI on 4/1/15.4/2/15 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac, ) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 23 Financial Affidavit filed by DEAN ROSSI. (mac, ) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI: Initial Appearance/PTD as to DEAN ROSSI held on 4/1/15. The Government and Defense have agreed to conditions of release. Arraignment set for 4/9/2015 at 10:30 AM in COURTROOM 5A before HONORABLE MARILYN HEFFLEY. Signed by Judge Lynne A. Sitarski.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Letter to Unseal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF BENCH WARRANT AS TO DEAN ROSSI. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL on 3/19/15.3/19/15 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (jmvsl, ) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION AND ORDER TO SEAL INDICTMENT AS TO DEAN ROSSI. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL on 3/19/15.3/19/15 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (jmvsl, ) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED INDICTMENT as to DEAN ROSSI (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4. (jmvsl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2015: # 1 Designation Form) (jmvsl, ). (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 667 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?