Sokolowski v. Wynn et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00536
District Judge Richard F. Boulware II, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Richard F. Boulware II
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 4:38 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo W A Sokolowski, Plaintiff

Represented by ALBRIGHT, STODDARD, WARNICK & ALBRIGHT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Albright +1 702 384 7111 +1 702 384 0605 gma@albrightstoddard.com
v.
No Logo Alvin V Shoemaker, Defendant

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo D Boone Wayson, Defendant

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo J Edward Virtue, Defendant

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo John J Hagenbuch, Defendant

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Ray R. Irani, Defendant

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Robert J Miller, Defendant

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Shapiro +1 310 556 7886 +1 310 282 0888 rs@glaserweil.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Wynn, Stephen A., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stephen A Wynn"
Officer/Director, Wynn Resorts Ltd

Represented by Campbell & Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Colby Williams +1 702 382 5222 +1 702 382 0540 jcw@campbellandwilliams.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Timeline
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice; filed by Plaintiff W A Sokolowski. (Albright, Mark) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing, no later than August 13, 2015, why they failed to comply with the Local Rules as outlined above. Alternatively, the filing of a joint proposed discovery plan by that date will suffice to discharge this order to show cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by John J Hagenbuch, Ray R. Irani, Robert J Miller, Alvin V Shoemaker, J Edward Virtue, D Boone Wayson, Stephen A Wynn that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Wynn Resorts, Limited for Alvin V Shoemaker, D Boone Wayson, J Edward Virtue, John J Hagenbuch, Ray R. Irani, Robert J Miller, Stephen A Wynn added. CERTIFICATE AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES PURSUANT TO L.R. 7.1-1. (Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that Defendants shall file a Certificate of Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1, no later than 4:00 p.m., July 9, 2015. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of James J. Pisanelli re 11 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendants John J Hagenbuch, Ray R. Irani, Robert J Miller, Alvin V Shoemaker, J Edward Virtue, D Boone Wayson, Stephen A Wynn. Declaration of James J. Pisanelli, Esq. in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants John J Hagenbuch, Ray R. Irani, Robert J Miller, Alvin V Shoemaker, J Edward Virtue, D Boone Wayson, Stephen A Wynn. Responses due by 7/2/2015. (Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer/Respond re 1 Complaint and Establish Briefing Schedule. John J Hagenbuch answer due 6/15/2015; Ray R. Irani answer due 6/15/2015; Robert J Miller answer due 6/15/2015; Alvin V Shoemaker answer due 6/15/2015; J Edward Virtue answer due 6/15/2015; D Boone Wayson answer due 6/15/2015; Stephen A Wynn answer due 6/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 1 Complaint, ; by Defendant Stephen A Wynn. (Williams, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
REPLY to 6 Response - Other ; DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES PURSUANT TO LR 7-2.1 filed by Defendants John J Hagenbuch, Ray R. Irani, Robert J Miller, Alvin V Shoemaker, J Edward Virtue, D Boone Wayson, Stephen A Wynn. (Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by W A Sokolowski that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Wynn Resorts Limited for W A Sokolowski added. Plaintiff W. A. Sokolowski's Certificate of Interested Parties. (Albright, Mark) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 5 Notice of Related Cases ; Plaintiff's Opposition to Notice of Related Cases filed by Plaintiff W A Sokolowski. (Albright, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:12-cv-00509-JCM-GWF, 2:13-cv-00136-JCM-NJK by Defendants John J Hagenbuch, Ray R. Irani, Robert J Miller, Alvin V Shoemaker, J Edward Virtue, D Boone Wayson, Stephen A Wynn. (Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by All Defendants on 3/25/2015; executed by W A Sokolowski re 1 Complaint, 3 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Albright, Mark) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to John J Hagenbuch, Ray R. Irani, Robert J Miller, Alvin V Shoemaker, J Edward Virtue, D Boone Wayson, and Stephen A Wynn. (ASB) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (ASB) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3603352), filed by W A Sokolowski. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/3/2015. Proof of service due by 7/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (Albright, Mark) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 365 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?