New Earthshell Corporation v. Jobookit Holdings Ltd
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-920

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 9:29 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-177), on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 05/13/2015 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1510342] [15-920] [Entered: 05/14/2015 02:55 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
    BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 05/13/2015 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1510328] [15-920] [Entered: 05/14/2015 02:51 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF & APPENDIX, [28], on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED.[1510300] [15-920] [Entered: 05/14/2015 02:37 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None
        LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant' brief due date as May 14, 2015, appellee's brief due date as June 18, 2015,TRANSMITTED.[1481177] [15-920] [Entered: 04/09/2015 03:12 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None
          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 04/09/2015 by CM/ECF.[1481144] [15-920] [Entered: 04/09/2015 02:50 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
            NEW CASE MANAGER, Deborah Holmes, ASSIGNED.[1480151] [15-920] [Entered: 04/08/2015 01:51 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jobookit Holdings Ltd, Rafi Shkolnik, Viumbe, LLC and Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 04/07/2015 by CM/ECF. [1478726] [15-920] [Entered: 04/07/2015 12:46 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                FORM D, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 04/07/2015 by email, CM/ECF.[1478697] [15-920] [Entered: 04/07/2015 12:32 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                  FORM C, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. Service date 04/07/2015 by email, CM/ECF.[1478695] [15-920] [Entered: 04/07/2015 12:31 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel, [9], on behalf of Appellee Jobookit Holdings Ltd, Rafi Shkolnik and Viumbe, LLC, FILED.[1478481] [15-920] [Entered: 04/07/2015 11:01 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Forms C and D, [8], [7], on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED.[1478368] [15-920] [Entered: 04/07/2015 10:14 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                        ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1471556] [15-920] [Entered: 03/27/2015 03:52 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                          DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/06/2015, RECEIVED.[1471554] [15-920] [Entered: 03/27/2015 03:51 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant New Earthshell Corporation, FILED. [1471552] [15-920] [Entered: 03/27/2015 03:48 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 47 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?