Librizzo v. The Berkshire Companies Limited et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10918-LTS

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Katerina Librizzo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Sales

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sol J. Cohen +1 617 621 1151 +1 617 494 0084 soljcohen@cohenandsales.com
v.
No Logo Berkshire Financial Company Limited P, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The McCormack Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph H. Aronson +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 jaronson@mccormackfirm.com
Space Erica L. Silverman +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 esilverman@mc-ep.com
No Logo Berkshire Income Realty Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The McCormack Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph H. Aronson +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 jaronson@mccormackfirm.com
Space Erica L. Silverman +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 esilverman@mc-ep.com
No Logo Berkshire Property Advisors, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The McCormack Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph H. Aronson +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 jaronson@mccormackfirm.com
Space Erica L. Silverman +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 esilverman@mc-ep.com
No Logo The Berkshire Companies Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The McCormack Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph H. Aronson +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 jaronson@mccormackfirm.com
Space Laura G. Ryan +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 lryan@mccormackfirm.com
Space Erica L. Silverman +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 esilverman@mc-ep.com
Office Boston
Filed 5/4/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand $2000000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Jury Verdict
County Middlesex
Terminated 11/30/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 48 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Order on Motion for New TrialCourt Filing
Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL; For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's motion for a new trial is DENIED. (Simeone, Maria)
    LREF
    Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006 Opposition to Motion
    Opposition re [45] MOTION for New Trial filed by The Berkshire Companies Limited. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Ryan, Laura)
      LREF
      Blank 46 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
      EXCERPT TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day Five held on November 17, 2006 before Judge Sorokin. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-8728 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
        LREF
        Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006, Terminated: 1/5/2007 Motion for New Trial
        MOTION for New Trial by Katerina Librizzo.(Cohen, Sol)
          LREF
          Blank 44 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Jury Charge Conference held on November 16, 2006 before Judge Sorokin. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-8728 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
            LREF
            Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
            Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against plaintiff(Simeone, Maria)
              LREF
              Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Jury Charge
              Charge to the Jury. (Simeone, Maria)
                LREF
                Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Jury Verdict
                JURY VERDICT in favor of defendant against plaintiff. (Simeone, Maria)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Order on Motion for Directed Verdict
                  Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Electronic ORDER entered denying [39] Motion for Directed Verdict, denying [40] Motion for Directed Verdict as stated in open court (Simeone, Maria)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Jury Verdict
                    JURY VERDICT in favor of defendant against plaintiff. 4:35pm(Simeone, Maria)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Jury Trial Held
                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Jury Trial Day 5 held held on 11/17/2006; Witness returns to the stand under oath and exam cont.; plaintiff cross examines witness; defense redirects; witness steps down; defense call next witness; witness sworn and examined; plaintiff cross examines witness; plaintiff rests; defense redirects; plaintff recrosses; witness steps down; defense rests; court recesses at 11:06; plaintiff moves for directed verdict; court denies the motion; court resumes at 11:45; defense gives closing arguments; plaintiff gives closing arguments; court charges the jury; court recesses at 1:30; jury deliberates; (Digital Recording #d.) (Simeone, Maria)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Motion for Directed Verdict
                        The Berkshire Companies LimitedMOTION for Directed Verdict (Simeone, Maria)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Motion for Directed Verdict
                          Plaintiffs MOTION for Directed Verdict as to issues of mitigation of damages(Simeone, Maria)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Status Conference
                            ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Status Conference held on 11/16/2006.; Court goes over the issues with counsel regarding the jury charge; (Court Reporter Marcia.) (Simeone, Maria)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Jury Trial Held
                              ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Jury Trial day 4 held on 11/16/2006.; Witness returns to the stand still under oath; plaintiff cont, the cross exam of the witness; Plaintiff rests; defense re-directs; plaintiff redirects; witness is excused; defense calls 2nd witness to the stand; witness sworn and examined; plaintiff cross exams the witness; witness steps down; defense calls 3rd witness; witness sworn; court recesses at 11:00; court resumes at 11:29; witness examined; plaintiff cross examines; witness steps down; defense calls 4th witness; witness sworn; court recesses for the day at 1:00; witness is to return to the stand when court resumes. (Court Reporter Marcia.) (Simeone, Maria)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Jury Trial Held
                                ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Jury Trial day 3 held on 11/15/2006.; Redirect continues on the witness by plaintiff; deft re-crosses; deft rests; witness steps down; Plaintiff calls second witness; witness sworn and examined; defense counsel cross examines; witness steps down; Plaintiffs rests; Defense calls first witness; witness sworn and examined; Court recesses at 11:00; court resumes at 11:58; examination of defense first witness cont; Plaintiffs counsel cross examines the witness; court recesses for the day at 1:00pm. (Court Reporter Marcia Patrisso.) (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 11/16/2006 (Simeone, Maria). Modified on 11/16/2006 (Simeone, Maria).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Stipulation
                                  STIPULATION re [37] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshire Income Realty, Inc. and Berkshire Financial Company Limited Partnership for Trial Record by Katerina Librizzo. (Cohen, Sol)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Jury Trial Held
                                    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Jury Trial day 2 held on 11/14/2006.; Counsel recalls the witness to the stand; witness remains under oath and examined; witness is cross examined; court recesses at 11:00; court resumes at 11:25; defense rests at 12:50; Plaintiffs counsel redirects; court recesses for the day at 1:00pm. (Digital Recording #d.) (Simeone, Maria)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                      Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Electronic ORDER entered granting [37] Motion to Dismiss; (Simeone, Maria)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006, Terminated: 11/14/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshire Income Realty, Inc. and Berkshire Financial Company Limited Partnership by all parties.(Ryan, Laura)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Jury Trial Held
                                          ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Jury Trial Day 1 held on 11/13/2006; court empanels the jury; jury sworn; plaintiff gives opening statements; defendants give opening statements; Plaintiffs call first witness, Katerina Librizzo; witness sworn and examined; court recesses for the day; 1:00pm; Witness to return to the stand on day 2; (Court Reporter Marie Cloonan.) (Simeone, Maria)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Order
                                            Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Electronic ORDER entered. Plaintiff's objection to certain emails is SUSTAINED only as to the content of the emails as to the May 6th email, the May 12th email, only as to Tammaro's response, the May 11th email, the May 10th email, the May 4th email and the May 7th email.(Simeone, Maria)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Pretrial Conference - Final
                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/6/2006. Atty Cohen present for the plaintiff; Attys. Aronson and Ryan present for the defendants. The Court reviews the jury selection process and remaining evidentiary issues with counsel. Defendants are ordered to produce financial information to plaintiff by close of business Weds. Nov. 8, 2006. Trial to commence at 9:00 A.M. 11/13/06. (Court Reporter none.) (Tyler, Rebecca)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Trial Brief
                                                TRIAL BRIEF by all defendants. (Ryan, Laura)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                  PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Katerina Librizzo. (Cohen, Sol)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Trial Brief
                                                    TRIAL BRIEF by Katerina Librizzo. (Cohen, Sol)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                      In Accordance with the order resetting the trial date the Final Pretrial Conference has been reset for 11/6/2006 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14 and the Jury Trial has been reset for 11/13/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                        Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Electronic ORDER entered ; Plainitff's Motion for Leave to Serve Limited Supplemental Interrogatories (Docket #25) is ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff is entitled to financial information from all defendants, not just Berkshire Income Realty, Inc. Accordingly, each defendant is hereby ORDERED to produce to plaintiff the most recent SEC filing which details its assets, liabilities, revenues, and gross and net income. The motion is DENIED with regard to plaintiff's request to serve further Interrogatories. Defendants' Motion in Limine (Docket #29) is ALLOWED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Fernandes' testimony, in light of some of the topics of her testimony. The Motion is ALLOWED as to Jenkins' testimony. The Motion is MOOT, at this time, as to the MCAD Complaint. A judicial commitment during the time of the scheduled trial has arisen. Accordingly, the trial is rescheduled for Monday November 13, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. Accordingly all dates in the pretrial order are advanced by one week and the Final Pretrial conference has been reset for Monday, November 6, 2006 @ 11:00am. [25] Motion to Compel, [29] Motion in Limine; (Simeone, Maria)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                                                          Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial The Final Pretrial Conference has been set for 10/30/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin.(Simeone, Maria)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : The Jury Trial has been set for 11/6/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. A pretrial order will issue.(Simeone, Maria)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                              Opposition re [25] MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Supplemental Interrogatories and to Compel a Further Supplemental Discovery Response filed by all defendants. (Ryan, Laura)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Objection
                                                                Objection by Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshire Income Realty, Inc., Berkshire Financial Company Limited P to Plaintiff's Trial Disclosures. (Ryan, Laura)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Opposition re [29] First MOTION in Limine Exclude Testimony&Evidence Relating to Allegations of Discrimination filed by Katerina Librizzo. (Cohen, Sol)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006, Terminated: 10/20/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                    First MOTION in Limine Exclude Testimony&Evidence Relating to Allegations of Discrimination by The Berkshire Companies Limited.(Ryan, Laura)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 Objection
                                                                      Objection by Katerina Librizzo to Defendants Pre-Trial Disclosures. (Cohen, Sol)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                                        Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by The Berkshire Companies Limited.(Ryan, Laura)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Order
                                                                          Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Electronic ORDER entered. Defendants shall respond to the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Interrogatories no later than the close of business Tuesday May 30, 2006.(Simeone, Maria)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [25] MOTION to Compel under Rule 7.1 by Sol J. Cohen on behalf of Katerina Librizzo. (Cohen, Sol)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006, Terminated: 10/20/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                              MOTION to Compel by Katerina Librizzo.(Cohen, Sol)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                                                Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Katerina Librizzo.(Cohen, Sol)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                                                  Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by The Berkshire Companies Limited.(Ryan, Laura)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Order case reassigned to Magistrate Judge for TriaCourt Filing
                                                                                    Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. ORDER entered: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. for all purposes, including trial and entry of final judgment. Judge Mark L. Wolf no longer assigned to the case.(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                      Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Consent by all parties to Jurisdiction by US MagisCourt Filing
                                                                                        CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Katerina Librizzo, The Berkshire Companies Limited, Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshire Income Realty, Inc., Berkshire Financial Company Limited P., FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial The Final Pretrial Conference has been set for 6/13/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14and the Jury Trial has been set for 6/19/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin.(Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                            ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Status Conference held on 3/14/2006. ; Counsel state status of the case and state they consent to a trial by magistrate; court sets a trial schedule; pretrial order to issue; A Final Pretrial Conference has been set for 6/13/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14 and the Jury Trial has been set for 6/19/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Digital Recording #d.) (Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                              ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Status Conference held on 1/31/2006. Counsel go over status of the case and report discovery almost complete; Court goes over issues consenting for trial and S/J, counsel state a trial is likely ; The court sets a Status Conference for 3/14/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Digital Recording #d.) (Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Katerina Librizzo. (Cohen, Sol)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Document disclosure
                                                                                                  Suppplement to Defts' Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by The Berkshire Companies Limited, Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshire Income Realty, Inc., Berkshire Financial Company Limited P, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Katerina Librizzo, FILED.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by The Berkshire Companies Limited, Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshire Income Realty, Inc., Berkshire Financial Company Limited Partnership, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Scheduling Conference held on 9/9/2005. Counsel state status of the case; Court inquires as to settlement discussions; The court requests a joint status report as to settlement filed by 11/1/05. A Status Conference has been set for 1/31/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Digital Recorder #y.)Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re: budgeting and ADR by Erica L. Silverman on behalf of all defendants. (Silverman, Erica)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                            JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Cohen, Sol)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThe Scheduling Conference has been set for 9/9/2005 11:15 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Referred for: full pretrial, dispositive motions(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Katerina Librizzo re: Mag. Judge transfer (Cohen, Sol)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Document disclosure
                                                                                                                    Automatic Document disclosure by The Berkshire Companies Limited, Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshore Income Realty, Inc., Berkshire Financial Company Limited, filed.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Berkshire Companies Limited, Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshore Income Realty, Inc., Berkshire Financial Company Limited, filed. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The parties are being ordered to inform the courtby July 27, 2005 whether they consent to a transfer of this case toMagistrate Judge for all purposes. (Attachments: # (1))(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Berkshire Companies Limited, Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshore Income Realty, Inc., Berkshire Financial Company Limited, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Berkshire Companies Limited, Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshore Income Realty, Inc., Berkshire Financial Company Limited P.(Silverman, Erica)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Berkshire Income Realty, Inc. served on 5/13/2005, answer due 6/2/2005, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed as to The Berkshire Companies Limited served on 5/13/2005, answer due 6/2/2005. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Berkshire Financial Company Limited Partnership served on 5/13/2005, answer due 6/2/2005, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C. served on 5/13/2005, answer due 6/2/2005, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against The Berkshire Companies Limited, Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshore Income Realty, Inc., Berkshire Financial Company Limited P Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 63961, filed by Katerina Librizzo. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to The Berkshire Companies Limited, Berkshire Property Advisors, L.L.C., Berkshore Income Realty, Inc., Berkshire Financial Company Limited P. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Sorokin. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?