Anderson v. Merck & Co., Inc.,
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10947-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeanette Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thornton & Naumes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Strouss +1 617 720 1333 +1 617 720 1333 dstrouss@tenlaw.com
v.
Merck & Company, Inc. Merck & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merck & Co., Inc.,"
Unknown Role, SCHERING PLOUGH CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Dillon +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 jdillon@foleyhoag.com

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley E. Abruzzi +1 617 832 1291 +1 617 832 7000 bradley_abruzzi@harvard.edu
Office Boston
Filed 5/9/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $7500000
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Middlesex
Terminated 7/29/2005
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 05-00367[Middlesex Superior Court]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, STAY
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Mail Returned
Return receipt received for mail sent to US District Court, New Orleans, LA Delivered on August 4, 2005. (Abaid, Kim)
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 case transferred out - district transfer
    Case transferred to to District of Louisiana;. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 7, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Abaid, Kim)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Order on Motion to Stay
      Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] Motion to Stay (Abaid, Kim)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 state court record
        STATE COURT Record Merck & Co., Inc., served on 4/20/2005, answer due 5/10/2005.. (Attachments: # (1) State Court Record Part II# (2) State Court Record Part III# (3) State Court Record Part IV)(Abaid, Kim)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
          MEMORANDUM in Support re [4] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Merck & Co., Inc.,. (Attachments: # (1))(Abruzzi, Bradley)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
            AFFIDAVIT in Support re [4] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Merck & Co., Inc.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to E)(Abruzzi, Bradley)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005, Terminated: 6/16/2005 Motion to Stay
              MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Merck & Co., Inc.,.(Abruzzi, Bradley)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Answer
                ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Merck & Co., Inc.(Abaid, Kim)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merck & Co., Inc.,. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Notice of Removal
                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Merck & Co., Inc., from Middlesex Superior, case number 05-00367. $ 250, receipt number 64086, filed by Merck & Co., Inc.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit A PART2# (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Elefther, Elizabeth)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 50 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?