USA V. 160 Easy St.North Harwich
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10961-MEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Hay Zacks +1 617 748 3100 jennifer.zacks@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo 160 Easy Street, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Balliro & Mondano

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph J. Balliro, Jr. +1 617 737 8442 +1 617 737 8443 josephballiro@yahoo.com
No Logo Brenda Miranda, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Rugo +1 508 375 9975 +1 508 362 7770 trugo@msn.com
No Logo Leonard Miranda, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Rugo +1 508 375 9975 +1 508 362 7770 trugo@msn.com
Office Boston
Filed 5/10/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 625 - Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause Section 21 U.S.C. § 881 Forfeiture Property - Aircraft
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Barnstable
Terminated 3/20/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Stipulation
STIPULATION OF SETTELEMENT re [29] Judgment by Leonard Miranda, USA, Brenda Miranda. (Howarth, George)
    LREF
    Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
    Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER of FORFEITURE in favor of United States of America against 160 Easy Street,North Harwich,Mass. and Claimants Leonard Miranda & Brenda Miranda(Howarth, George)
      LREF
      Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006, Terminated: 3/20/2006 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
      Joint MOTION for Forfeiture of Property by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zacks, Jennifer)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Order on Motion to Compel
        Judge Morris E. Lasker : Electronic ORDER entered Motion granted on Default [26] Motion to Compel (Howarth, George)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
          Judge Morris E. Lasker : Electronic ORDER entered granting [27] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Motion Allowed for reasons articulated by the government and in view of defendant's failure to answer the motion to compel. (Howarth, George)
            LREF
            Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006, Terminated: 2/21/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
            MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/21/06 to Complete Discovery by USA.(Zacks, Jennifer)
              LREF
              Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006, Terminated: 2/21/2006 Motion to Compel
              MOTION to Compel by USA.(Zacks, Jennifer)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Terminate Motions
                Motion terminated as Moot : [2] MOTION to Seal Case filed by USA,. (Howarth, George)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  Judge Morris E. Lasker : Electronic ORDER entered granting [3] Motion Ex-Parte Finding and Endorsment of Memorandum of Lis Pendens Nunc Pro tonc 5/10/05 (Howarth, George)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 USM Process Receipt and Return
                    US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for 10/27/05. Compass Bank for Savings served Delivered on 10/22/05 (Howarth, George)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Balliro, Sr on behalf of 160 Easy Street (Howarth, George)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Scheduling Conference
                        Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Morris E. Lasker : Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2005. The parties proposed pre-trial schedule was approved by the Court (Court Reporter none.) (Howarth, George)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket entry 22 corrected because: Wrong event used. Should have been filed as joint statement. (Howarth, George)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Joint statement of counsel
                            JOINT STATEMENT of counsel. (Howarth, George)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by USA.(Zacks, Jennifer)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Publication served on 8/10/2005,. (Howarth, George)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2005 02:15 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Morris E. Lasker. (Howarth, George)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Answer
                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Brenda Miranda.(Howarth, George)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Answer
                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Leonard Miranda.(Howarth, George)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Statement of counsel
                                        Signed and Sworn Statement by Client-Petitioner Brenda J. Miranda Authorizing Representation by Attorney Thomas Rugo to Represent her in her Petition for Remission or Mitigation pursuant to 28 CFR Ch 1 (7-1-04 Edition )Department of Justice by Brenda Miranda. (Howarth, George)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Petition for Remission or Mitigation of a Judicial Forfeiture re [1] Complaint by Brenda Miranda.(Howarth, George)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Statement of counsel
                                            Signed and Sworn Statement by Client-Petitioner Leonard Miranda Authorizing Representation by Attorney Thomas R. Rugo to Represent him in his petiton for remission or Mitigation pursuant to 28 CFR Ch 1 (7-1-04 Edition) Department of Justice by Leonard Miranda. (Howarth, George)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              Petition for Remission or Mitigation of a Judicial Forfeiture re [1] Complaint by Leonard Miranda.(Howarth, George)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 USM Process Receipt and Return
                                                US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Complaint and Warrant & Monition. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc,. Final Documents X4701-22 served Delivered on 07/12/05 (Howarth, George)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 USM Process Receipt and Return
                                                  US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Complaint and Warrant & Monition. Jeremiah Miranda served Delivered on 07/12/05 (Howarth, George)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 USM Process Receipt and Return
                                                    US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Complaint and Warrent & Monition. Leonard Miranda served Delivered on 07/12/05 (Howarth, George)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 USM Process Receipt and Return
                                                      US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Complaint and Warrant & Monition. Harwich tax Assessor's Office, ATTN: Dave Scannell served Delivered on 07/12/05 (Howarth, George)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 USM Process Receipt and Return
                                                        US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Complaint and Warrant & Monition. Brenda Miranda served Delivered on 07/12/05 (Howarth, George)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 USM Process Receipt and Return
                                                          US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Complaint and Warrant & Monition. Pamela M. Cioffi, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. served Delivered on 07/12/05 (Howarth, George)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed USA served on 6/30/2005, answer due 7/20/2005. Posted on Side Door of property (Howarth, George)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Warrant and Monition Issued
                                                              WARRANT AND MONITION issued (Howarth, George)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Order on Motion to Unseal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered granting [4] Motion to Unseal Document [4] MOTION to Unseal Document [2] MOTION to Seal Case filed by USA, Case is unseal.For Full Text See Docket No.[5]. (Howarth, George)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                  MOTION to Unseal Document [2] MOTION to Seal Case filed by USA, by USA.(Howarth, George)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                    MOTION findings and endorsement of memorandum of lis pendens by USA., filed(Catino3, Theresa)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                      EX PARTE MOTION to Seal Case by USA.(Catino3, Theresa)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against 160 Easy Street Filing fee: WAIVED , filed by USA.(Catino3, Theresa) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2005 (Catino3, Theresa).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Catino3, Theresa)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 381 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?