USA v. Payne
Criminal Case Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:15-cr-00146
Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 7:23 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Justin E. Payne, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by DONNELL AND SMITH, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2015 Donnell Smith +1 314 361 2500 +1 314 361 2525 donnell.smith@smithlawpractice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment St. Louis Fed Public Defender +1 314 241 1255 +1 314 421 3177 moe_ecfnote@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by ROSENBLUM AND SCHWARTZ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2015 Joel J. Schwartz +1 314 862 4332 +1 314 862 8050 jschwartz@rsrglaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Government's Motion To Dismiss Information against defendant Justin E. Payne (Docket No. 34) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above cause is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's Motion for Bill of Particulars (Docket No. 30) is denied as moot. granting 34 Motion to Dismiss as to Justin E. Payne (1); denying 30 Motion for Bill of Particulars as to Justin E. Payne (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 6/3/15. (JWJ) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 34 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
    MOTION to Dismiss Information by USA as to Justin E. Payne. (Lang, Colleen) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER as to Justin E. Payne (1): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Second Motion To Extend The Time In Which To File Pretrial Motions (Docket No. 31 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant shall have to and including June 8, 2015, in which to file pretrial motions or a waiver of such motions. The government shall have until June 15, 2015, in which to respond to any motions filed by the defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pretrial evidentiary hearing will be set upon further order of the Court. [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] (Criminal Pretrial Motion due by 6/8/2015.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on May 7, 2015. (BRP) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Justin E. Payne re 30 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Lang, Colleen) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
          Second MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to File Pretrial Motions by Justin E. Payne. (Schwartz, Joel) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
            MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Justin E. Payne. (Schwartz, Joel) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
              Summons Returned Executed on 3/31/15 as to Justin E. Payne (JWJ) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Motion To Extend The Time In Which To File Pretrial Motions (Docket No. 26) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant shall have to and including May 7, 2015, in which to file pretrial motions or a waiver of such motions. The government shall have until May 14, 2015, in which to respond to any motions filed by the defendant.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pretrial hearing, including an evidentiary hearing on any pretrial motions, or a hearing on the waiver of motions will be set upon further order of the Court. granting 26 Motion for Extension as to Justin E. Payne (1) Criminal Pretrial Motion due by 5/7/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 4/14/15. (JWJ) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                  Letter Regarding Discovery as to Justin E. Payne (Schwartz, Joel) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of The Time in Which to File Pretrial Motions by Justin E. Payne. (Schwartz, Joel) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                      ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Colleen C. Lang appearing for USA. (Lang, Colleen) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None
                        Letter Regarding Discovery as to Justin E. Payne (Lang, Colleen) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None
                          REQUEST for Discovery as to Justin E. Payne (Lang, Colleen) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None
                            ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: by Joel J. Schwartz on behalf of Justin E. Payne (Schwartz, Joel) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Justin E. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on April 6, 2015. (BRP) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw (ECF No. 19 ) as counsel of record for defendant Justin E. Payne filed by attorney Donnell Smith is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on April 6, 2015. (MMG) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Donnell Smith. by Justin E. Payne. (Smith, Donnell) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 5 Motion to Detain as to Justin E. Payne (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on April 2, 2015. (MCB) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                      CLERKS WITNESS LIST as to Justin E. Payne as to Detention Hearing. (NEB) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III:Detention Hearing as to Justin E. Payne held on 4/2/2015. Testimony heard. Matter taken under advisement. (FTR Gold Operator initials:M. Berg.) (FTR Gold: Yes.) (proceedings started: 10:38 am.) (proceedings ended: 10:46.) (Defendant Location: Custody.) (NEB) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER CONCERNING PRETRIAL MOTIONS as to Justin E. Payne. Forthwith each party may propound to opposing party and may file w/the court any requestfor pretrial disclosure of evidence or information. The parties shall respond to any such request for pretrial disclosure not later than 4/23/2015. Counsel for defendant to file with the court a memorandum if defendant chooses not to file any pretrial motions not later than 4/16/2015. Criminal Pretrial Motion due by 4/16/2015. (See Order for Complete Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 4/2/2015. (NEB) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                            CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE on a Misdemeanor by Justin E. Payne (BRP) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER RELATING TO SPEEDY TRIAL COMPUTATIONS... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, defendants Motion For Additional Time To Obtain And Review Discovery Materials And To Determine Whether, And/Or What Pretrial Motions Are To Be Filed is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h) (7)(A) and (B)(iv), the time granted to defendant to investigate and prepare pretrial motions, or a waiver thereof, is excluded from computation of the time for a speedy trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 4/2/2015. (NEB) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Extension For Additional Time To Obtain and Review Discovery Materials and To Determine Whether and/or What Pretrial Motions are to be Filed by Justin E. Payne. (BRP) (Main Document 12 replaced on 4/2/2015) (BRP). (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins:Arraignment as to Justin E. Payne (1) held on 4/2/2015: Parties present for arraignment. Defendant is sworn, waives reading of indictment, and enters plea of not guilty as to Count 1. Motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions is granted. Attorney Donnell Smith appears for the defendant and advises that he has been retained. Asst. Federal Public Defender Kevin Curran moves withdraw the Federal Public Defender (FPD). The Court grants the FPD leave to withdraw. The defendant consents to proceed to disposition before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and signs the consent form. Attorney St. Louis Fed Public Defender terminated. (Criminal Pretrial Motion due by 4/16/2015.)(FTR Gold Operator initials:B. Porter.) (FTR Gold: Yes.) (proceedings started: 10:08 AM.) (proceedings ended: 10:19 AM.) (Defendant Location: CUSTODY.) (BRP) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                    ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: by Donnell Smith on behalf of Justin E. Payne (Smith, Donnell) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                      CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Justin E. Payne. (NEB) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III:Initial Appearance/Rule 5 as to Justin E. Payne held on 3/31/2015 Justin E. Payne (1) Custody. Defendant given copy of: Information. Court to appoint: FPD. Pretrial Services bail report received on: 3/31/2015. Pretrial Services Officer: Mallory Griep. Detention Hearing set for 4/2/2015 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert III. Arraignment set for 4/2/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (FTR Gold Operator initials:C. Long.) (FTR Gold: Yes.) (proceedings started: 2:45 pm.) (proceedings ended: 2:47 pm.) (Defendant Location: Custody.) (NEB) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                          BAIL REPORT(FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Justin E. Payne. (MKG) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Justin E. Payne. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender for this District is appointed to represent the above-named defendant in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 03/31/2015. (CBL) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Hearing by USA as to Justin E. Payne. (DJO) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Colleen C. Lang appearing for USA. (DJO) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 2 MOTION FOR SUPPRESSING AND SEALING ORDER as to Justin E. Payne (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 03/27/2015. (DJO) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION FOR SUPPRESSING AND SEALING ORDER by USA as to Justin E. Payne. (DJO) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      INFORMATION as to Justin E. Payne (1) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Cover Sheet) (DJO) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 310 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?