Arbella Mutual Insurance Company v. Motor Coach Industries, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10955-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arbella Mutual Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Anthony Dwyer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven R. Kruczynski +1 978 232 9500 +1 978 232 9222 steven.kruczynski@cna.com
v.
No Logo Espar Heater Systems, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boise Cascade Wood Products Holdings Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Barry +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 barry@srbc.com
No Logo Motor Coach Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boise Cascade Wood Products Holdings Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Barry +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 barry@srbc.com
Office Boston
Filed 5/9/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 385 - Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Norfolk
Terminated 8/15/2005
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff(Patch, Christine)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
    Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [19] Motion for Entry of Separate and Final Judgment. (Patch, Christine)
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005, Terminated: 8/15/2005 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
      MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law for Entry of Separate and Final Judgment by Motor Coach Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Barry, David)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Motion Hearing
        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2005 re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Motor Coach Industries, Inc. Court allows the Motion to Dismiss. Counsel to submit a form of Judgment. Plaintiff informs the Court that it is attempting to efectuate service on the foreign defendant. (Court Reporter Nancy Eaton.) (Alba, Robert)
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Certificate of Consultation
          CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Steven R. Kruczynski on behalf of Arbella Mutual Insurance Company. (Kruczynski, Steven)
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
            Amended JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(D). (Barry, David)
              LREF
              Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Motor Coach Industries, Inc..(Barry, David)
                LREF
                Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(D). (Barry, David)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY to Opposition to [5] MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Motor Coach Industries, Inc.. (Patch, Christine)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                    Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [13] Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. (Patch, Christine)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005, Terminated: 6/9/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Motor Coach Industries, Inc..(Barry, David)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Arbella Mutual Insurance Company. (Kruczynski, Steven)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Opposition to Motion
                          Opposition re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Arbella Mutual Insurance Company. (Kruczynski, Steven)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED MOTION HEARING AND CONFERENCE. At the request of counsel, the Motion Hearing re: Motion to Dismiss and Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for July 11, 2005, have been rescheduled to July 20, 2005, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 state court record
                              STATE COURT Record Motor Coach Industries, Inc. served on 4/25/2005; Espar Heater Systems served on 2/18/2005. (Patch, Christine)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [5] MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Patch, Christine)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                  CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint, [6] Memorandum in Support of Motion by David A. Barry on behalf of Motor Coach Industries, Inc., Motor Coach Industries, Inc. by on behalf of Motor Coach Industries, Inc., Motor Coach Industries, Inc.. Related document: [5] MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Motor Coach Industries, Inc.,, [6] Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Motor Coach Industries, Inc.,.(Barry, David)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Motor Coach Industries, Inc.. (Barry, David)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005, Terminated: 8/15/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Motor Coach Industries, Inc..(Barry, David)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2005 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Barry on behalf of Motor Coach Industries, Inc. (Patch, Christine)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Affidavit
                                            AFFIDAVIT of Timothy J. Nalepka by Motor Coach Industries, Inc.. (Patch, Christine)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Notice of Removal
                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Motor Coach Industries, Inc., Espar Heater Systems from Norfolk County Superior Court, case number 05-00301-B. $ 250, receipt number 64143. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Patch, Christine)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Patch, Christine)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?