National Electrical Benefit Fund v. Upper Cape Electrical, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10969-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo National Electrical Benefit Fund, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Ramtron International Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Mary T. Sullivan +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 msullivan@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Upper Cape Electrical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cape Cod Bank And Trust Company, Trustee
No Logo TD Banknorth, NA, Trustee
Office Boston
Filed 5/10/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Barnstable
Terminated 10/18/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. re [15] Agreement for Judgment filed by National Electrical Benefit Fund, (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Agreement for Judgment
      AGREEMENT FOR JUDGMENT by National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to File (Nicewicz, Craig)
          LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006, Terminated: 4/5/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to May 1, 2006 to File for Entry of Default Judgment by National Electrical Benefit Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
            Letter from Lindsay Trueblood regarding Court Order. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
              Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to File to March 17, 2006 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                LREF
                Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006, Terminated: 2/3/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                MOTION for Extension of Time to March 17, 2006 to File for Entry of Default Judgment by National Electrical Benefit Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Terminate Motions
                  Motions terminated: [10] MOTION for Entry of Default filed by National Electrical Benefit Fund,. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                    NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Upper Cape Electrical, Inc. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 1/10/2006 Motion for Entry of Default
                      MOTION for Entry of Default by National Electrical Benefit Fund.(Geiman, Gregory) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2005 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth).
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ElectronicORDER entered granting [9] Motion partrially dissolve attachment (Nicewicz, Craig)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005, Terminated: 10/7/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MOTION to Partially Dissolve Attachment by Trustee Process re [8] Summons to Trustee Returned Executed by National Electrical Benefit Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 Summons to Trustee Returned Executed
                            SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed Cape Cod Bank & Trust Company served on 8/29/2005, answer due 9/19/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Upper Cape Electrical, Inc. served on 9/12/2005, answer due 10/3/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Answer
                                ANSWER of Trustee by TD Banknorth, N.A.. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Answer
                                  ANSWER of Trustee by TD Banknorth, N.A.. (Elefther, Elizabeth) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2005 (Elefther, Elizabeth).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Sealed Document +
                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in secure file room.. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Order on Sealed Motion +
                                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [2] Sealed Motion (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Sealed Document +
                                        SEALED DOCUMENT Affidavit of Jennifer Bush Hawkins in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Ex Parte Order of Attachement by Trustee Process placed in secure file room. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Sealed Motion +
                                          SEALED MOTION for an Ex Parte order of attachment by Trustee Process by National Electrical Benefit Fund.(Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT against Upper Cape Electrical, Inc., Cape Cod Bank & Trust Company Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 64162, filed by National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Civil Cover Sheet)(Elefther, Elizabeth) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2005 (Elefther, Elizabeth).
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Summons Issued
                                              Summons Issued as to Upper Cape Electrical, Inc., Cape Cod Bank & Trust Company. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?