Public Storage v. Marchex Voice Services, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-02470

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 7:15 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Public Storage, Inc. Public Storage, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Public Storage"

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Chao +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 dhc@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hernan D Vera +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 hvera@birdmarella.com
v.
No Logo Citygrid Media, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Felix Calls, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Marchex Sales, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Marchex Voice Services, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                            21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Citygrid Media LLC, Felix Calls LLC, Marchex Sales LLC, Marchex Voice Services, Inc. (et) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                              Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Public Storage. (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (car) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Public Storage, (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Public Storage. (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15487846 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Public Storage. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C) (Attorney Ekwan E Rhow added to party Public Storage(pty:pla))(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 218 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?