Wakefield Kennedy v. State Capital Holdings, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, Case No. 14-4044

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 12:14 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009386200 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
[10248501] Appellant/Petitioner's reply brief filed by Wakefield Kennedy. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 02/17/2015. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-4044] AUW
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009378516 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
    [10244176] Appellee's appendix filed by State Capital Holdings, LLC. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 01/30/2015. Manner of Service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 02/03/2015 by BV to attached a corrected (searchable) PDF and add book marks] [14-4044] EMM
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009378510 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
      [10244174] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by State Capital Holdings, LLC. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 01/30/2015. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-4044] EMM
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009378054 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
        [10243861] Notice of appellee's deficient brief and appendix received from State Capital Holdings, LLC. Type of deficiencies for brief: no statement re: prior/related appeals. Type of deficiencies for appendix: no table of contents or certificate of service. Appellee's corrected brief and supplemental appendix or errata sheet due 02/09/2015 for State Capital Holdings, LLC. [14-4044]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009368715 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
          [10239220] This matter is before the court on appellee State Capital's second motion for extension of time to file response brief (7 days). At the direction of the court, the motion is granted. State Capital's response brief shall be served and filed on or before 1/28/2015. Served on 01/12/2015. [14-4044]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009368276 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
            [10239029] Motion filed by Appellee State Capital Holdings, LLC to extend time to file appellee/respondent's brief until 01/28/2015 at 11:59 pm. Served on: 01/12/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-4044] CRW
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009361856 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None
              [10236001] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: no appellee's brief or motion for extension filed (Metro National). Appellee's brief now due 01/08/2015 for Metro National Settlement Services, LLC [14-4044]
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 71 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?