American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts v. Leavitt
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11000-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 2:17 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

ACLU of Massachusetts ACLU of Massachusetts, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts"

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caroline Mala Corbin +1 212 549 2633
Space Craig Cowie +1 202 637 6313
Space Avlana Kinnert Eisenberg +1 202 637 6313
Space Victoria Howard Jueds +1 202 637 6313
Space Thomas Pulham +1 202 637 6313
Space Jessica Tillipman +1 202 637 6313
Space Sarah R. Wunsch +1 617 482 3170 +1 617 451 0009 swunsch@aclum.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Mach +1 202 637 6313 dmach@aclu.org
Space Julie Sternberg +1 212 549 2633 +1 212 549 2652 jsternberg@aclu.org
v.
No Logo Harry Wilson, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Mike Leavitt, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Wade Horn, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo The Silver Ring Thing Ministries, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alliance Defense Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel L. Oster +1 913 685 8000 +1 913 685 8001 joster@telladf.org
Space Kevin H Theriot +1 913 685 8000 +1 913 685 8001 ktheriot@alliancedefendingfreedom.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert L. Kilroy +1 508 898 1501 +1 508 898 1502 rlkilroy@modl.com
Office Boston
Filed 5/16/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Suffolk
Terminated 2/23/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 E-mail Notice Returned
E-Mail Notice sent to secondary address for Daniel Mach returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Daniel Mach. The ECF Help desk contact the law firm, who advised that the attorney is no longer employed at the firm. The secondary e-mail address has been removed to prevent the return of additional undeliverable e-mail notices. (Hurley, Virginia)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [20] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts,, Mike Leavitt,, Wade Horn,, Harry Wilson,, The Silver Ring Thing Ministries, Inc., - APPROVED(Abaid, Kim)
      LREF
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by all parties (Coppolino, Anthony)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Terminated Case
        Civil Case Terminated. (Abaid, Kim)
          LREF
          Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Joint statement re scheduling conference
          JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Wunsch, Sarah)
            LREF
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
            NOTICE of Change of Address by Joel L. Oster (Oster, Joel)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
              NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference is rescheduled for 2/7/2006 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Abaid, Kim) Modified on 12/27/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2005 is re-scheduled for 1/4/2006 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ElectronicORDER entered denying as moot [14] Motion for Extension of Time (Abaid, Kim)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : RULE 26 DISCOVERY ORDER entered. (Abaid, Kim)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2005 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Abaid, Kim)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Answer
                        Intervenor ANSWER to Complaint by The Silver Ring Thing Ministries, Inc..(Oster, Joel)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. corrected because: Added attorney Kilroy to the docket. (Abaid, Kim)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005, Terminated: 11/8/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to September 6, 2005 to To respond to complaint by The Silver Ring Thing Ministries, Inc..(Oster, Joel)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [13] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Avlana Kinnert Eisenberg for American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Craig Cowie for American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Abaid, Kim)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                Filing fee: $ 100.00, receipt number 66001 regarding [13] Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Abaid, Kim)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005, Terminated: 8/5/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by avlana kinnert eisenberg and craig cowie by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit eisenberg certificate# (2) Affidavit cowie certificate)(Wunsch, Sarah)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Sarah R. Wunsch (Wunsch, Sarah)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Answer
                                      Federal Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by Mike Leavitt, Wade Horn, Harry Wilson.(Coppolino, Anthony)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Order on Motion to Intervene
                                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [8] Motion to Intervene (Abaid, Kim)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry 10 corrected because: Replaced unsigned document with signed version. (Abaid, Kim)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Coppolino on behalf of Mike Leavitt, Wade Horn, Harry Wilson (Coppolino, Anthony) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [3] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Julie Sternberg for American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Caroline Mala Corbin for American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Daniel Mach for American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Victoria Howard Jueds for American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Thomas Pulham for American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Jessica Tillipman for American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Abaid, Kim)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [7] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joel L. Oster for The Silver Ring Thing Ministries, Inc., Kevin H. Theriot for The Silver Ring Thing Ministries, Inc. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                  Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. corrected because: Corrected the Proposed Intervenor Silver Ring Thing, Inc. to be listed as Movant until motion to intervene is ruled on. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                    Filing fee: $ 100.00, receipt number 65205 regarding [7] Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Abaid, Kim)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [8] MOTION to Intervene Unopposed filed by The Silver Ring Thing Ministries, Inc.. (Kilroy, Robert)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005, Terminated: 7/7/2005 Motion to Intervene
                                                        MOTION to Intervene Unopposed by The Silver Ring Thing Ministries, Inc..(Kilroy, Robert)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005, Terminated: 6/27/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin H. Theriot and Joel L. Oster by The Silver Ring Thing Ministries, Inc..(Kilroy, Robert)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Kilroy on behalf of The Silver Ring Thing Ministries, Inc. (Kilroy, Robert)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. US Attorney's Office served on 5/16/2005, answer due 7/15/2005. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Mach, Jessica Tillipman, Thomas Gary Pulham, Victoria Howard Jueds, Julie Sternberg, and Caroline Mala Corbin Filing fee $ 300.00, receipt number 64282. by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Daniel Mach# (2) Certificate of Jessica Tillipman# (3) Certificate of Thomas Gary Pulham# (4) Certificate of Victoria Howard Jueds# (5) Certificate of Julie Sternberg# (6) Certificate of Caroline Mala Corbin)(Abaid, Kim) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Wunsch on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 64282, filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                        Summons Issued as to Mike Leavitt, Wade Horn, Harry Wilson, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?