"In re: IDreamSky Technology Limited Securities Litigation"
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-02514
District Judge J. Paul Oetken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 7, 2018 at 4:30 PM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Troy Hung, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lionel Zevi Glancy +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lglancy@glancylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Bradley Linkh +1 646 722 4180 glinkh@glancylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesley Frank Portnoy +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 LPortnoy@glancylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert V. Prongay +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 rprongay@glancylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey Edwards Sadler +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 csadler@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
TERMINATED: 03/28/2016 Lionel Zevi Glancy +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lglancy@glancylaw.com
v.
No Logo Anfernee Song Guan, Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Eric Kazanoff +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pkazanoff@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Emily Phillips +1 212 455 2231 +1 212 455 2502 sarah.phillips@stblaw.com
No Logo David Yuan, Defendant
No Logo Erhai Liu, Defendant
No Logo Idreamsky Technology Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Alexander Fumerton +1 212 735 3902 +1 212 777 3902 rfumerto@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott D. Musoff , +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 smusoff@skadden.com
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Eric Kazanoff +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pkazanoff@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Emily Phillips +1 212 455 2231 +1 212 455 2502 sarah.phillips@stblaw.com
No Logo Jeffrey Lyndon Ko, Defendant
No Logo Jun Zou, Defendant
No Logo Michael Xiangyu Chen, Defendant
No Logo Mingyao Wang, Defendant
No Logo Piper Jaffray & Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Eric Kazanoff +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pkazanoff@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Emily Phillips +1 212 455 2231 +1 212 455 2502 sarah.phillips@stblaw.com
No Logo Steven Xiaoyi Ma, Defendant
No Logo STIFEL, NICOLAUS AND COMPANY, INC., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Eric Kazanoff +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pkazanoff@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Emily Phillips +1 212 455 2231 +1 212 455 2502 sarah.phillips@stblaw.com
No Logo Abraham Jeremias, Movant
No Logo IDream Group, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip C. Kim +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 pkim@rosenlegal.com
No Logo Michael Rubin, Movant
No Logo Roger Mariani, Movant
No Logo Stephen Crane, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M Apton +1 202 524 4290 +1 202 333 2121 AApton@zlk.com
No Logo Bin Yu, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Ruby Rong Lu, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo James Patrick Griffith, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gallet Dreyer & Berkey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dov Berger +1 212 935 3131 +1 212 935 4514 dab@gdblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Vincent Dahlstrom +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 pdahlstrom@pomlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Jets Holdings, LLC, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Masoud Shemirani, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Stephen Mansour, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott Scott, L.L.P.( NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Laughlin +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 tlaughlin@scott-scott.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1391
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (96) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER: re: 42 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, 40 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Idreamsky Technology Limited. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants are directed to answer Plaintiffs' remaining claims within twenty-one days of the date of this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Number 40 and Docket Number 42.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/22/2017) (ama) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keith Robert Lorenze on behalf of Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Lorenze, Keith) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 42 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint., 40 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Idreamsky Technology Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER granting 89 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION for Jacob A. Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12562985. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Jacob) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 42 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint., 40 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Crowell, Joshua) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Lon Crowell on behalf of Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Crowell, Joshua) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER: Lead Plaintiff shall have the option to file a single memorandum of law in opposition to, the motions to dismiss filed by both iDreamSky and the Underwriter Defendants, which shall not exceed forty-five (45) pages in length; and iDreamSky and the Underwriter Defendants shall have the option to file a single, consolidated reply memorandum of law, which shall not exceed twenty-five (25) pages in length. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/21/2016) (tn) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (pc) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated. (pc) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anfernee Song Guan. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven Xiaoyi Ma. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Erhai Liu. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Lyndon Ko. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Yuan. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Xiangyu Chen. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jun Zou. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mingyao Wang. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Piper Jaffray & Co.. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Idreamsky Technology Limited. (pc) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 6/15/2016 (pc). (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Piper Jaffray & Co., re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Mingyao Wang, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Jun Zou, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Michael Xiangyu Chen, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to David Yuan, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Credit Suisse Securities LLC, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 6/15/2016 (pc). (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Anfernee Song Guan, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Steven Xiaoyi Ma, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Erhai Liu, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Jeffrey Lyndon Ko, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to iDreamsky Technology Limited, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Piper Jaffray & Co., re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit Suisse Securities LLC, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Yuan, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mingyao Wang, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Erhai Liu, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Xiaoyi Ma, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey Lyndon Ko, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anfernee Song Guan, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jun Zou, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Xiangyu Chen, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to iDreamsky Technology Limited, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 5/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 42 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated. (Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Scott D. Musoff in Support re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Idreamsky Technology Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated.(Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Idreamsky Technology Limited. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Idreamsky Technology Limited.(Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Xiangyu Chen, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Anfernee Song Guan, Idreamsky Technology Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffrey Lyndon Ko, Erhai Liu, Steven Xiaoyi Ma, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mingyao Wang, David Yuan, Jun Zou, re: 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin, Masoud Shemirani. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Summons (Yuan), # 2 Request for Summons (Wang), # 3 Request for Summons (Ma), # 4 Request for Summons (Liu), # 5 Request for Summons (Ko), # 6 Request for Summons (Guan), # 7 Request for Summons (Zou), # 8 Request for Summons (Chen), # 9 Request for Summons (Suisse), # 10 Request for Summons (JP Morgan Securities LLC), # 11 Request for Summons (Piper Jaffray & Co.), # 12 Request for Summons (Stifel, Nicolaus & Company))(Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 4/19/2016 (pc). (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Michael Xiangyu Chen, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Anfernee Song Guan, Idreamsky Technology Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffrey Lyndon Ko, Erhai Liu, Steven Xiaoyi Ma, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mingyao Wang, David Yuan, Jun Zou with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michael Rubin, Roger Mariani, Masoud Shemirani, Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong, Jets Holdings, LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Troy Hung. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 36 Letter filed by Idreamsky Technology Limited re: Pursuant to Your Honor's January 25, 2016 Order. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2016. Motions due by 5/9/2016. Responses due by 6/23/2016, Replies due by 7/25/2016.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/9/2016) (kko) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Scott D. Musoff dated February 9, 2016 re: Pursuant to Your Honor's January 25, 2016 Order. Document filed by Idreamsky Technology Limited.(Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            OPINION AND ORDER: In case number 15-cv-3794, the motion to remand (Dkt. No. 19) is DENIED. In case number 15-cv-2514, the iDream Groups motion to consolidate cases is GRANTED, the motion to appoint lead counsel is GRANTED, and the motion to appoint lead plaintiff is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (Dkt. No. 18.) Case numbers 15-cv-2514, 15-cv-2944, 15-cv-3484, and 15-cv-3794 are consolidated as "In re IDreamSky Technology Limited Securities Litigation under the master docket number 15-cv-2514. Melvyn Boey Kum Hoong is designated lead plaintiff, and The Rosen Firm, P.A., and Glancy Prongay & Murray, LLP are designated co-lead counsel. The remaining motions to consolidate and appoint lead counsel are DENIED. The request for judicial notice (No. 15-cv-2514, Dkt. No. 31) is DENIED as moot. The parties are directed to meet and confer and, by February 9, 2016, submit a joint letter with a proposed schedule including dates for the filing of a consolidated complaint and the defendants' response. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at docket numbers 6, 15, 18, and 31 in 15-cv-2514, docket number 7 in 15-cv-2944, docket number 12 in 15-cv-3484, and docket numbers 11 and 19 in 15-cv-3794. SO ORDERED. re: (15 in 1:15-cv-02514-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) filed by Stephen Crane, (31 in 1:15-cv-02514-JPO) MOTION Request for Judicial Notice re: (15) MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . filed by IDream Group, (12 in 1:15-cv-03484-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15-cv-02514; 15-cv-02944; 15-cv-03484; 15-cv-03794 Notice of Motion by Plaintiffs Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, and Michael Rubin for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead filed by Abraham Jeremias, Michael Rubin, Roger Mariani, (11 in 1:15-cv-03794-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15-cv-02514; 15-cv-02944; 15-cv-03484; 15-cv-03794 Notice of Motion by Plaintiffs Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, and Michael Rubin for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead filed by Abraham Jeremias, Michael Rubin, Roger Mariani, (6 in 1:15-cv-02514-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15-cv-02514; 15-cv-02944; 15-cv-03484; 15-cv-03794 Notice of Motion by Plaintiffs Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, and Michael Rubin for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead filed by Abraham Jeremias, Michael Rubin, Roger Mariani, (19 in 1:15-cv-03794-JPO) MOTION to Remand . filed by Stephen Mansour, (18 in 1:15-cv-02514-JPO, 18 in 1:15-cv-02514-JPO, 18 in 1:15-cv-02514-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen and Glancy Firms. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Consolidate Cases . filed by IDream Group, (7 in 1:15-cv-02944-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15-cv-02514; 15-cv-02944; 15-cv-03484; 15-cv-03794 Notice of Motion by Plaintiffs Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, and Michael Rubin for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead filed by Abraham Jeremias, Michael Rubin, Roger Mariani. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/25/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02514-JPO, 1:15-cv-02944-JPO, 1:15-cv-03484-JPO, 1:15-cv-03794-JPO(ama) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 31 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . . Document filed by IDream Group. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 31 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . . Document filed by Stephen Crane. (Apton, Adam) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Phillip Kim in Support re: 31 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . .. Document filed by IDream Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MOTION Request for Judicial Notice re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by IDream Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The briefing schedule jointly proposed by the parties is hereby adopted. Defendants are relieved from their obligation to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint until after the appointment of lead plaintiff(s) and lead counsel. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Adam M. Apton in Support re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen and Glancy Firms. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Consolidate Cases .. Document filed by Stephen Crane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Apton, Adam) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen and Glancy Firms. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Consolidate Cases . . Document filed by Stephen Crane. (Apton, Adam) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            REPLY AFFIRMATION of Phillip Kim in Support re: 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen and Glancy Firms. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Consolidate Cases .. Document filed by IDream Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen and Glancy Firms. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Consolidate Cases . . Document filed by IDream Group. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Peter E. Kazanoff dated June 24, 2015. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated.(Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Adam M. Apton in Opposition re: 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15-cv-02514; 15-cv-02944; 15-cv-03484; 15-cv-03794 Notice of Motion by Plaintiffs Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, and Michael Rubin for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead, 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen and Glancy Firms. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Consolidate Cases .. Document filed by Stephen Crane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Apton, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15-cv-02514; 15-cv-02944; 15-cv-03484; 15-cv-03794 Notice of Motion by Plaintiffs Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, and Michael Rubin for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead, 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen and Glancy Firms. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Consolidate Cases . . Document filed by Stephen Crane. (Apton, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Lesley F. Portnoy in Opposition re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by IDream Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Declaration)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by IDream Group. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Non-Opposition re: 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen and Glancy Firms. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Consolidate Cases .. Document filed by Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin. (Smilow, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen and Glancy Firms. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Consolidate Cases . . Document filed by IDream Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen and Glancy Firms., MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff., MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Document filed by IDream Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Adam M. Apton in Support re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Stephen Crane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification, # 2 Exhibit Loss Chart, # 3 Exhibit Notice, # 4 Exhibit Firm Resume)(Apton, Adam) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Stephen Crane. (Apton, Adam) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Stephen Crane to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Stephen Crane. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Apton, Adam) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Emily Phillips on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated. (Phillips, Sarah) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JP Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase & Co for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC.(Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Guernsey Branch, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Piper Jaffray Companies for Piper Jaffray & Co.. Document filed by Piper Jaffray & Co..(Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp. for Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated. Document filed by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated.(Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Eric Kazanoff on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated. (Kazanoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Joseph H. Weiss in Support re: 7 Memorandum of Law in Support, 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15-cv-02514; 15-cv-02944; 15-cv-03484; 15-cv-03794 Notice of Motion by Plaintiffs Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, and Michael Rubin for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead. Document filed by Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Weiss, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15-cv-02514; 15-cv-02944; 15-cv-03484; 15-cv-03794 Notice of Motion by Plaintiffs Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, and Michael Rubin for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin. (Weiss, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15-cv-02514; 15-cv-02944; 15-cv-03484; 15-cv-03794 Notice of Motion by Plaintiffs Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, and Michael Rubin for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Abraham Jeremias, Roger Mariani, Michael Rubin.(Weiss, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Alexander Fumerton on behalf of Idreamsky Technology Limited. (Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent, Other Affiliate THL A19 Limited, Other Affiliate Tencent Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate LC Fund V, L.P., Other Affiliate LC Parallel Fund V, L.P., Other Affiliate LC Fund V GP Limited, Other Affiliate Legend Holdings Corporation for Idreamsky Technology Limited. Document filed by Idreamsky Technology Limited.(Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Idreamsky Technology Limited. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Michael Xiangyu Chen, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Anfernee Song Guan, Idreamsky Technology Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffrey Lyndon Ko, Erhai Liu, Steven Xiaoyi Ma, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mingyao Wang, David Yuan, Jun Zou. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401121554)Document filed by Troy Hung.(moh) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 385 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?