Muransky v. Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:15-cv-60716-WPD
District Judge William P. Dimitrouleas, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 4, 2020 at 10:27 AM ST (9.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David S. Muransky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bret Lusskin, P.a.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bret Leon Lusskin, Jr. +1 954 454 5841 +1 954 454 5844 blusskin@lusskinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keogh Law, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Hilicki +1 312 726 1092 +1 312 726 1093 MHilicki@KeoghLaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lord Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Christopher Crotty +1 954 589 0588 +1 954 337 0666 pccrotty@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 55

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott David Owens +1 954 589 0588 +1 954 337 0666 scott@scottdowens.com
No Logo Dr. David S. Muransky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bret Lusskin, P.a.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bret Leon Lusskin, Jr. +1 954 454 5841 +1 954 454 5844 blusskin@lusskinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lord Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Christopher Crotty +1 954 589 0588 +1 954 337 0666 pccrotty@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 55

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott David Owens +1 954 589 0588 +1 954 337 0666 scott@scottdowens.com
v.
No Logo Godiva Chocolatier, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowman and Brooke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shawn Y. Libman +1 305 995 6092 +1 305 995 6100 Shawn.Libman@bowmanandbrooke.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Melendez +1 612 486 1589 +1 866 637 2804 bmelendez@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda M. Reck +1 954 765 0500 +1 954 765 1477 reckl@gtlaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/22/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michele L. Stocker +1 954 765 0500 +1 954 759 5571 stockerm@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seipp & Flick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Philip Flick +1 305 995 5604 +1 305 995 6100 cflick@seippflick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn Y Libman +1 305 995 6092 +1 305 995 6100 slibman@seippflick.com
Office Ft Lauderdale
Filed 4/6/2015
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Broward (Office
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags LSS,REF_DISCOV
  Entries (132) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: 100 Notice of Appeal, 105 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 16-16486-EE. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (hh) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE Of Posting Appeal Bond by Jonathan Feldman, Eric Alan Isaacson, James H Price re 121 Order on Report and Recommendations. (jas) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Clerks Receipt for Treasury Registry per Order of the Court DE# 121 received on 1/12/2017 in the amount of $ 2,500.00, receipt number FLS100136021. (fbn) Modified on 1/12/2017 (fbn). (Entered: 01/12/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 120 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to 118 Report and Recommendations of an Appeal Bond by David S. Muransky. (Lusskin, Bret) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                LREF
                Blank 119 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                OBJECTIONS to 118 Report and Recommendations by Eric Alan Isaacson. (Davis, John) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 107 Amended MOTION to Require Posting of Appeal Bond re 100 Notice of Appeal, 105 Notice of Appeal, filed by David S. Muransky. (Lusskin, Bret) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript ordered on: 11-7-16 by John W. Davis, Esq. has been filed by Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov re 108 Transcript Information Form, 110 Court Reporter Acknowledgment. (fs) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Fairness Hearing held on 9-21-16 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-83 pages, re: 105 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. USCA Case Number: 16-16486-E. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2017. (fs) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 107 Amended MOTION to Require Posting of Appeal Bond re 100 Notice of Appeal, 105 Notice of Appeal, filed by Eric Alan Isaacson. Replies due by 12/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11th C. Bill of Costs form)(Davis, John) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 108 Transcript Information Form. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. Estimated filing date of transcript 12-7-16. USCA number 16-16488-E. (fs) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION to Require Posting of Appeal Bond by James H. Price re 100 Notice of Appeal, , 107 Amended MOTION to Require Posting of Appeal Bond re 100 Notice of Appeal, 105 Notice of Appeal, and Not Opposing Appeal Bond in the Amount of $1,500 for "Costs on Appeal" filed by James H Price. Replies due by 11/14/2016. (McDonald, W) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Eric Alan Isaacson re 105 Notice of Appeal,. Rule 23 Fairness Hearing transcript(s) ordered. Order placed by John W. Davis. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. (Davis, John) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 105 Notice of Appeal, filed by Eric Alan Isaacson. Date received by USCA: 10/26/16. USCA Case Number: 16-16486-E. (hh) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 105 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Notice of Appeal as to 99 Judgment,, 98 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court by Eric Alan Isaacson. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-9198739. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Davis, John) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 100 Notice of Appeal, filed by James H Price. Date received by USCA: 10/11/2016. USCA Case Number: 16-16486-E. (amb) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Clerks Notice to Filer re 100 Notice of Appeal,. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (hh) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Notice of Appeal by James H Price re 99 Order. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-9149449. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (McDonald, W) (linked docket entry number) Text Modified on 10/11/2016 (hh). (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER OF FINAL APPROVAL AND JUDGMENT. The claims against Godiva on behalf of the Settlement Class in Muransky v. Godiva Chocolatier, Inc., Case No. 15-cv-60716-WPD (S.D. Fla.), are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and without costs to any party, except as otherwise provided herein. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/28/2016. (mc) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER DENYING APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE ORDER. The Appeal DE 94 / 95 is DENIED. Magistrate Judge Snow's Order DE 85 is hereby AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/28/2016. (mc) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas: Fairness Hearing held on 9/21/2016. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov (kc) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Clerks Notice to Filer re 94 Memorandum. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see de# 95 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 85 Order on Motion to Compel to District Court. It is not necessary to refile this document. (mc) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 85 Order on Motion to Compel to District Court (See DE# 94 for image) (mc) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 85 Order on Motion to Compel by Eric Alan Isaacson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Davis, John) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 82 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 76 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by David S. Muransky Recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses (ECF No. 76 ) be GRANTED, and that to District Court (McDonald, W) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      OBJECTIONS to 82 Report and Recommendations re Attorneys' Fees by Eric Alan Isaacson. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1 - Declaration of Eric Alan Isaacson, # 2 Appendix 2 - Declaration of John W. Davis, # 3 Appendix 3 - Declaration of C. Benjamin Nutley)(Davis, John) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        STATUS REPORT on Late Claims by David S. Muransky (Owens, Scott) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Declaration in Support of Supplemental Brief in Response to Motion for Final Approval and Motion for Attorneys' Fees re 88 Response/Reply (Other) by Eric Alan Isaacson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Davis, John) Modified to add document link on 9/21/2016 (mc). (Entered: 09/20/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              RESPONSE to 76 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses, 74 MOTION For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Eric Alan Isaacson. (Davis, John) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 83 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. (Melendez, Brian) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying 72 Class Member Eric Isaacson's Motion for Access to Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/16/2016. (mc) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 74 MOTION For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by James H Price. Replies due by 9/29/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit McDonald Declaration Filed in In re Enfamil, # 2 Exhibit DiMaggio Declaration Filed in In re Enfamil)(McDonald, W) (Entered: 09/17/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Replies due by 9/23/2016. (Melendez, Brian) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by David S. Muransky. Replies due by 9/23/2016. (Owens, Scott) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING 76 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by David S. Muransky. Motions referred to Judge Lurana S. Snow. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/13/2016. (mc) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re 74 MOTION For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. (Melendez, Brian) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by David S. Muransky re 69 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, (Owens, Scott) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice to Filer re 67 Sealed Document. Document Not Captioned; - The Filer must File a Notice of Filing Exhibits. It is not necessary refile the document, however future filings must have the proper caption pursuant to the Local Rules. (tpl) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Support re 66 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. (Melendez, Brian) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Letter from St. Louis, MO (mc) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Objection to Class Action Settlement, Attorney's Fees, and Incentive Award filed by James H Price. Attorney W Allen McDonald added to party James H Price(pty:obj). Replies due by 9/2/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Postcard Notice, # 2 Exhibit Claim Receipt)(McDonald, W) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Jonathan Feldman. Attorney Jonathan Samuel Feldman added to party Jonathan Feldman(pty:obj). Replies due by 9/2/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Claim Form)(Feldman, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE/REPLY Objection to Proposed Settlement by Eric Alan Isaacson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Davis, John) (Entered: 08/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Letter to the Court re: Objection to this Lawsuit from Cindy L. Hager (mc) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [56] Motion for Protective Order Regarding Production of Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/2/2016. (cbr)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016, Terminated: 6/2/2016 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Production of Confidential Information by Citibank, N.A.. Attorney Brian C Frontino added to party Citibank, N.A.(pty:ip). (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Frontino, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/24/2016 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [54] Motion to Compel Regarding Production of Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 5/23/2016. (cbr)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016, Terminated: 5/23/2016 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Compel Production of Confidential Information by David S. Muransky. Responses due by 6/9/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Owens, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Second Order Amending Order Granting Preliminary Approval to Settlement granting [52] Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/11/2016. (cbr)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: 5/11/2016, Terminated: 5/12/2016 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [40] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by David S. Muransky. Responses due by 5/31/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Owens, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: 4/28/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/28/2016. (srd)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: 4/28/2016 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION :ORDER denying as moot [47] Motion for Protective Order; granting [48] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/28/2016. (srd)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: 4/28/2016 Order Referring Case to JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING MOTION AND DISCOVERY: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for appropriate disposition of all discovery motions, and all motions that relate directly to these motions, such as motions for extension of time, motions for reconsideration, motions for sanctions. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/27/2016. (srd)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016, Terminated: 4/28/2016 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Production of Confidential Information by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, W.)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016, Terminated: 4/28/2016 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Production of Confidential Information by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Attorney W. Scott Mason added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:ip). (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, W.)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER AMENDING ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL TO SETTLEMENT; granting [45] Motion to Amend/Correct [40] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Final Approval Hearing set for 9/21/2016 02:00 PM before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/22/2016. (jas)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016, Terminated: 3/22/2016 Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [40] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by David S. Muransky. Responses due by 4/8/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Owens, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc. of Firm Name Change and New E-Mail Designations (Flick, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Letter and enclosures)(Melendez, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/28/2016 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [41] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/27/2016. (cbr)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 41 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/27/2016. (cbr) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                          Final Approval Hearing set for 6/22/2016 02:00 PM before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. per order [40] (mr1)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2016 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and Joint Motion for Protective Order by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Melendez, Brian) Modified to convert document to a motion on 1/27/2016 (cbr).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS, GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT,AND DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS re [39] Motion. Notice of the Settlement to be sent to the Settlement Class Members by 3/25/2016. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/25/2016. (jas)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS, GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT,AND DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS re 39 Motion. Notice of the Settlement to be sent to the Settlement Class Members by 3/25/2016. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/25/2016. (jas) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: 1/22/2016, Terminated: 1/25/2016 Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by David S. Muransky. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 1 - Settlement Agreement, # (2) Appendix 2 - Legg v. Spirit Airlines, Inc., No. 14-cv-61978-CIVJIC (S.D. Fla.) (June 10, 2015 Order), # (3) Appendix 3 - Declaration of D. Muransky, # (4) Appendix 4 - Declaration of Scott D. Owens, # (5) Appendix 5 - Declaration of Bret Lusskin, # (6) Appendix 6 - Declaration of Michael S. Hilicki, # (7) Appendix 7 - Legg v. E-Z Rent a Car, Inc., No. 14-cv-1716 (M.D. Fla. May 28, 2015 Order))(Owens, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [37] Motion for Extension of Time. Class Settlement due by 1/22/2016. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/19/2016. (jas)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time. Class Settlement due by 1/22/2016. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/19/2016. (jas) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/18/2016, Entered: 1/18/2016, Terminated: 1/19/2016 extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Briefly Extend Due Date to Submit Class Settlement for Approval by David S. Muransky. Responses due by 2/4/2016 (Owens, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time To File Motion To Approve Class Settlement re [35] Joint MOTION to Modify Request to Stay All Proceedings, and for Related Relief re [32] Notice of Settlement by David S. Muransky. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/18/2015. (jas)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015, Terminated: 12/18/2015 Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Modify Request to Stay All Proceedings, and for Related Relief re [32] Notice of Settlement by David S. Muransky. (Owens, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerks Notice to Filer re [33] MOTION to Stay, [32] Notice of Settlement. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (asl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015, Terminated: 3/25/2016 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay by David S. Muransky. Responses due by 12/7/2015. See [32] for image (asl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015 Notice of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Stay All Proceedings, and for Related Relief by David S. Muransky (Owens, Scott) Modified to add missing event [33] Motion to Stay on 11/20/2015 (asl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [30] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. -Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/23/2015. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/22/2015. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015, Terminated: 10/22/2015 extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report by All Parties by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Responses due by 11/9/2015 (Melendez, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand to First Amended Class Action Complaint by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. (Melendez, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [27] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/10/2015. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael Hilicki. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 7154. (ksa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael Hilicki. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 7154. (ksa) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [21] Motion to Dismiss [16] Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/2/2015. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re [21] MOTION TO DISMISS [16] Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. (Melendez, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [21] MOTION TO DISMISS [16] Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David S. Muransky. Replies due by 8/3/2015. (Owens, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [22] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Re: [21] MOTION TO DISMISS [16] Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Responses due by 7/24/2015 Replies due by 8/17/2015. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/7/2015. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015, Terminated: 7/7/2015 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [21] MOTION TO DISMISS [16] Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by David S. Muransky. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Owens, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015, Terminated: 9/2/2015 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION TO DISMISS [16] Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Responses due by 7/10/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Melendez, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [19] Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Linda M. Reck and Michele Leneve Stocker terminated. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/22/2015. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015, Terminated: 6/22/2015 Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Greenberg Traurig PA. by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Responses due by 7/9/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reck, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot [12] Motion to Dismiss [1] Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/12/2015. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Electronic Filing (NEFs) have been Activated for Brian Melendez to Receive Notices. (jc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First AMENDED COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FAIR AND ACCURATE CREDIT TRANSACTIONS ACT (FACTA) against David S. Muransky, filed by David S. Muransky. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Visa Notice, # (2) Exhibit B - MasterCard Notice, # (3) Exhibit C - AMEX Notice, # (4) Exhibit D - Flash Drive Notice, # (5) Exhibit E - Laptop Notice)(Owens, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Melendez on behalf of Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Attorney Brian Melendez added to party Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.(pty:dft). (Melendez, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc. (Libman, Shawn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Y. Libman on behalf of Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Attorney Shawn Y. Libman added to party Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.(pty:dft). (Libman, Shawn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015, Terminated: 6/12/2015 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS [1] Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Attorney Charles Philip Flick added to party Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/12/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-1: 10-K Statement, # (2) Exhibit A-2: 10-K Statement, # (3) Exhibit A-3: 10-K Statement, # (4) Exhibit B: Docket from Ruggiero v. The Children's Place Retail Stores, Inc. et al, USDC Northern Districit of Ohio, # (5) Exhibit C: Docket from Lipkis v. Domino's Pizza, Inc. et al, USDC Northern Districit of Illinois)(Flick, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/5/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [8] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document; Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Answer due 5/26/2015. Re: [1] Complaint, filed by David S. Muransky. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/4/2015. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document; Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Answer due 5/26/2015. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by David S. Muransky. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/4/2015. (ls) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michele Leneve Stocker on behalf of Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Attorney Michele Leneve Stocker added to party Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.(pty:dft). (Stocker, Michele)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by David S. Muransky. Godiva Chocolatier, Inc. served on 4/14/2015, answer due 5/5/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Owens, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015, Terminated: 5/4/2015 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [1] Complaint, by Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reck, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Linda M. Reck on behalf of Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Attorney Linda M. Reck added to party Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.(pty:dft). (Reck, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Christopher Crotty on behalf of David S. Muransky. Attorney Patrick Christopher Crotty added to party David S. Muransky(pty:pla). (Crotty, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/7/2015. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. (ail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (ail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (ail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7619763, filed by David S. Muransky. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet, # (5) Summon(s))(Owens, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 6,096 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?