Lumbard v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11124-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Deborah M. Lumbard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rich May

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. Finnigan +1 617 482 1360 +1 617 556 3891 jfinnigan@richmaylaw.com
v.
State Street Bank & Trust Company, Inc. State Street Bank & Trust Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "State Street Bank and Trust Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carey L. Bertrand +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 carey.bertrand@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Prudential Insurance Company of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Prudential Insurance Company of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carey L. Bertrand +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 carey.bertrand@wilsonelser.com
Office Boston
Filed 5/31/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Norfolk
Terminated 12/20/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
This case is no longer associated with the ADR program. (Tyler, Rebecca)
    LREF
    Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Deborah M. Lumbard, The Prudential Insurance Company of America, State Street Bank and Trust Company. (Finnigan, James)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (Patch, Christine)
        LREF
        Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Response to Motion
        RESPONSE to Motion re [25] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, State Street Bank and Trust Company. (Bertrand, Carey)
          LREF
          Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE to Motion re [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Deborah M. Lumbard. (Finnigan, James)
            LREF
            Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Deborah M. Lumbard. (Finnigan, James)
              LREF
              Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Opposition to Motion
              Opposition re [25] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, State Street Bank and Trust Company. (Bertrand, Carey)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Notice of ADR Conference
                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing HELD on 11/16/2005 and SET for further hearing on 12/22/2005 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander.(JLA, int1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Statement of Facts
                  STATEMENT of facts re [25] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Finnigan, James)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [25] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Deborah M. Lumbard. (Finnigan, James)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005, Terminated: 12/20/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by Deborah M. Lumbard.(Finnigan, James)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                        Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: The attachment from document No. 22 was deleted and filed as a separate event. Please refer to Document No. 24 for that filing (Patch, Christine)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Statement of Facts
                          STATEMENT of facts re [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Re-entered by court staff to correct data entry error. (Patch, Christine)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [22] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, State Street Bank and Trust Company. (Bertrand, Carey)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005, Terminated: 12/20/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, State Street Bank and Trust Company. (Bertrand, Carey) Modified on 10/31/2005 (Patch, Christine).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                Proposed Document(s) submitted by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, State Street Bank and Trust Company. Document received: Documents in Administrative Record. (Bertrand, Carey)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of Rejection of Filing re: Proposed Administrative Record for Judicial Review sent to Carey L. Bertrand. (Patch, Christine)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 Notice of ADR ConferenceCourt Filing
                                    AMENDED NOTICE of ADR Conference: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing SET for 11/16/2005 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander.(JLA, int1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Transcript (Administrative Record)
                                      Proposed Administrative Record for Judicial Review. 3 volumes, bound. (Patch, Christine)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                        CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Carey Louise Bertrand on behalf of State Street Bank and Trust Company. (Bertrand, Carey)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Notice of ADR ConferenceCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE of ADR Conference: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing SET for 11/16/2005 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander.(Miner, Valencia)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney David C. Casey terminated. (Casey, David)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider
                                              Electronic Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander appointed. The Court will contact counsel with regard to scheduling.(Tyler, Rebecca)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER:Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2005; opposition due by 11/18/05; replies due 12/9/05. Hearing on Dispositive Motions or Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. Case to be referred to Mediation Program: Fall, 2005. (Patch, Christine)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                  Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation: Fall, 2005. (Patch, Christine)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held on 8/16/2005. Court adopts parties proposed schedule. Parties to notify Court within one week as to consent to trial before a Magistrate judge. Court refers parties to mediation in the Fall, 2005. Hearing on Dispositive Motions set for 1/11/2006 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE of Rejection of Filing re: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearances sent to David C. Casey and Laurie Drew Hubbard. (Patch, Christine)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Joint statement of counsel
                                                        JOINT STATEMENT of counsel. (Finnigan, James)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2005 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                            Notice of Reassignment. Judge Patti B. Saris added. Judge Morris E. Lasker no longer assigned to case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing. (Howarth, George) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2005 (Howarth, George).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                              Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Howarth, George)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2005 02:45 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Morris E. Lasker. (Howarth, George)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Street Bank and Trust Company. (Bertrand, Carey)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Answer
                                                                    Amended ANSWER to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, State Street Bank and Trust Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiff's Consent to Amendment of Answer)(Bertrand, Carey)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Bertrand, Carey)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Answer
                                                                        Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, State Street Bank and Trust Company.(Bertrand, Carey)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                          Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered granting [2] Motion for Extension of Time (Howarth, George)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to July 12, 2005 to To answer or otherwise respond to complaint by Deborah M. Lumbard, State Street Bank and Trust Company.(Howarth, George)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America, State Street Bank and Trust Company Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 64597, filed by Deborah M. Lumbard.(Howarth, George)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America, State Street Bank and Trust Company. (Howarth, George)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Howarth, George)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?