Alam v. Chertoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11134-RGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Syed Alam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark E. Pelosky +1 617 884 8100 +1 617 884 1654
v.
No Logo Denis Riordan, Defendant
No Logo Eduardo Aguirre, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 6/1/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 535 - Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Suffolk
Terminated 11/17/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Syed Alam, filed. (Flaherty, Elaine)
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 OrderCourt Filing
    Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. (Johnson, Mary)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (Johnson, Mary)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
        Judge Richard G. Stearns : ElectronicORDER entered granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time (Flaherty, Elaine)
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005, Terminated: 9/29/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to September 30, 2005 to answer or otherwise respond by Michael Chertoff, Eduardo Aguirre, Jr, Denis Riordan.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
            Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Michael Chertoff answer due 9/16/2005; Eduardo Aguirre, Jr answer due 9/16/2005; Denis Riordan answer due 9/16/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005, Terminated: 9/1/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 16, 2005 to File Answer or otherwise respond by Michael Chertoff, Eduardo Aguirre, Jr, Denis Riordan.(Cohen, Jeffrey)
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                SUMMONS Returned Executed Eduardo Aguirre, Jr served on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Denis Riordan served on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Chertoff served on 6/28/2005, answer due 8/28/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Pelosky on behalf of Syed Alam (Flaherty, Elaine)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT for Mandamus against Michael Chertoff, Eduardo Aguirre, Jr, Denis Riordan Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 64641, filed by Syed Alam. (Attachments: # (1))(Flaherty, Elaine)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Summons Issued
                            Summons Issued as to Michael Chertoff, Eduardo Aguirre, Jr, Denis Riordan. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 48 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?