Madison Oslin, Inc. v. Interstate Resources, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-1359

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 5:46 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405528572 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
(ENTRY RESTRICTED) SEALED BRIEF by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to court: 07/06/2015.. Filed Ex parte: N. [15-1359]--[Edited 07/24/2015 by ALC] Rodney Miller
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
    CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 5/10/16 - 5/12/16 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 02/22/2016 [15-1359] (JLC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
      ORDER filed [999670886] sealing the sealed version of the reply brief. Copies to all parties. [15-1359] (ALC)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc.. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Reply Brief of Appellants - Under Seal. [15-1359] Rodney Miller
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
          Redacted BRIEF by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/02/2015. [999670876] [15-1359]--[Docket Text Edited 10/02/2015 by ALC to Add "Redacted" Modifier] Rodney Miller
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
            ORDER filed [999658084] granting Motion to extend filing time [48]. Reply brief due 10/01/2015. Copies to all parties. [15-1359] (ALC)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
              MOTION by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc. to extend filing time for reply brief until October 1, 2015. Date and method of service: 09/10/2015 ecf. [999657998] [15-1359] Perry Yancey
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                ORDER filed [999654403] sealing the sealed version of the response brief. Copies to all parties. [15-1359] (ALC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                  Redacted BRIEF by Appellees John Cristos, Interstate Corrpack, LLC, Interstate Resources, Inc. and James Morgan in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/03/2015. [999654262] [15-1359] Gail Westover
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by John Cristos, Interstate Corrpack, LLC, Interstate Resources, Inc. and James Morgan. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Sealed Brief of Defendants-Appellees. [15-1359] Gail Westover
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 39 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                      ORDER filed [999627284] granting Motion to file corrected opening brief of appellants [38], sealing the sealed version of the brief. Copies to all parties. [15-1359] (ALC)
                        LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                        MOTION by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc. to file a corrected document Description of corrected document: Correct Opening Brief of Appellants (sealed and redacted versions). Date and method of service: 07/23/2015 ecf. [999626846] [15-1359] Rodney Miller
                          LREF
                          Blank 37 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                          Redacted BRIEF by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/24/2015. [999626845] [15-1359]--[Modifier Edited 07/24/2015 by ALC] Rodney Miller
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                            ORDER filed [999618162] denying Motion for leave to file entire brief under seal [30], sealing volumes III - XIII of the joint appendix. A corrected sealed version and a redacted version of opening brief due 07/23/2015. Copies to all parties. [15-1359]--[Docket Text Edited 07/10/2015 by ALC] (ALC)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc.. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Brief of Appellants and Sealed Joint Appendix Volumes III - XIII - Under Seal. [15-1359] Rodney Miller
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                MOTION by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc. leave to file MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF APPELLANTS UNDER SEAL Sealed Brief [27]. Date and method of service: 07/02/2015 ecf. [999614461] [15-1359] Rodney Miller
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                  FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 07/02/2015. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Yes. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999614458] [15-1359] Rodney Miller
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                    ORDER filed [999589282] granting Motion (by way of the response filed on this date) to extend filing time for response brief. Response brief due 09/03/2015. Copies to all parties. [15-1359]--[Edited 05/22/2015 by ALC] (ALC)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE/ANSWER by John Cristos, Interstate Corrpack, LLC, Interstate Resources, Inc. and James Morgan to Motion to extend filing time [23]. [15-1359] Gail Westover
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                        ORDER filed [999582534] granting Motion to extend filing time [23]. Opening brief and appendix due 07/02/2015. Response brief due 08/06/2015. Copies to all parties. [15-1359] (ALC)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                          MOTION by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc. to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until JULY 2, 2015. Date and method of service: 05/12/2015 ecf. [999582190] [15-1359] James Terrell
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                            ORDER filed [999577877] granting Motion to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel [21]. Copies to all parties. [15-1359] (ALC)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                              MOTION by J. Stephen Simms, Counsel for Appellants-Plaintiffs Marios J. Monopolis, Counsel for Appellants-Plaintiffs Simms Showers LLP, Counsel for Appellants-Plaintiffs to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? Y. Was the defendant advised of right to file response within 7 days? Y. Date and method of service: 05/04/2015 ecf. [999577835] [15-1359] John Simms
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by P. Michael Yancey for Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc..[999577221] [15-1359] Perry Yancey
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Rodney E. Miller for Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc..[999576944] [15-1359] Rodney Miller
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by James M. Terrell for Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc..[999576237] [15-1359] James Terrell
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Thomas R. Bundy, III for John Cristos, Interstate Corrpack, LLC, Interstate Resources, Inc. and James Morgan.[999573954] [15-1359] Thomas Bundy
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee John Cristos. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999569280] [15-1359] Gail Westover
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee James Morgan. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999569258] [15-1359] Gail Westover
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Interstate Corrpack, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999569254] [15-1359] Gail Westover
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Interstate Resources, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999569250] [15-1359] Gail Westover
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gail L. Westover for John Cristos, Interstate Corrpack, LLC, Interstate Resources, Inc. and James Morgan.[999569229] [15-1359] Gail Westover
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Initial mediation conference scheduled. [15-1359] (LP)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption modified. [15-1359] (ALC)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      Notice issued re: Transcript Order Form by Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc. deemed moot. [15-1359] (ALC)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Madison Oslin Research, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999567118] [15-1359] John Simms
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Madison Oslin, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999567112] [15-1359] John Simms
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc. for Julie Martin. [15-1359] John Simms
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc.. [15-1359] John Simms
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for Madison Oslin Research, Inc. and Madison Oslin, Inc..[999567105] [15-1359] John Simms
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Emil Hirsch and Gail Westover. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/18/2015. Response Brief due 06/22/2015. [15-1359] (ALC)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-03041-MJG. Mailed to: Emil Hirsch and Gail Westover. [15-1359] (ALC)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      Civil copyright case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-03041-MJG. Date notice of appeal filed: 04/08/2015. Case manager: ACarlheim. [15-1359] (ALC)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?