American Education Services/Pennsylvania Higher Education v. Pham
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-mc-10227-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Education Services/Pennsylvania Higher Education, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher R. Donato +1 617 748 3303 +1 617 748 3972 chris.donato@USDOJ.GOV
v.
No Logo Hau T. Pham, Defendant
No Logo Trustees Of Boston University, Garnishee

Toggle Switch Represented by Boston University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd L.C. Klipp +1 617 353 2326 +1 617 353 5529
Office Boston
Filed 6/3/2005
Jury Demand
Demand
Nature of Suit
Cause
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 7/6/2007
Origin
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Cummings, Mary)
    LREF
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered granting [6] Motion to Withdraw (Attachments: # (1)) (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
      LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007, Terminated: 4/27/2007 Motion to Withdraw
      MOTION to Withdraw Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment by American Education Services/Pennsylvania Higher Education.(Donato, Christopher)
        LREF
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
        Proposed Document(s) submitted by United States of America. Document received: Garnishment Order. (Donato, Christopher)
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
          ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Trustees of Boston University. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Certificate Of Service.
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America. (Donato, Christopher)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment
              Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered granting [2] Motion for Writ of Garnishment (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 1/4/2006 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                Case assigned to Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton, in light of the documents filed on 10/28/05. (Hurley, Virginia)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005, Terminated: 1/11/2006 Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                  MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Writ of Continuing Garnishment# (2) Text of Proposed Order Clerk's Notice# (3) Notice of Garnishment)(Donato, Christopher)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Registration of State Court Judgment
                    REGISTRATION of State Court Judgment received from Middlesex County Superior Court Principal: $48,214.54. Pre-judgment interest: $16,306.72. Totalling: $64,521.26..(Cummings, Mary)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 46 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?