Albader v. Riordan
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11215-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ramzi Albader, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by pampaninlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan M. Pampanin +1 617 498 0900 +1 617 876 0082 apampanin@pampaninlaw.com
v.
No Logo Denis Riordan, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 6/9/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 540 - Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Middlesex
Terminated 8/15/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Abaid, Kim)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw
    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [5] Motion to Withdraw Complaint (Abaid, Kim)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005, Terminated: 8/15/2005 Motion to Withdraw
      MOTION to Withdraw [1] Complaint by Ramzi Albader.(Abaid, Kim)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ramzi Albader. U.S Attorney served on June 20, 2005. (Abaid, Kim)
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ramzi Albader. U.S Department of Homeland Security served on June 22, 2005. (Abaid, Kim)
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ramzi Albader. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 6/22/2005, answer due 8/22/2005. (Abaid, Kim)
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Complaint
              COMPLAINT for Mandamus against Denis Riordan Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 64846, filed by Ramzi Albader. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service# (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Abaid, Kim)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Summons Issued as to USA
                Summons Issued as to Denis Riordan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Abaid, Kim)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Abaid, Kim)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?