IN RE: Industrial Print Technologies, LLC, Patent Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-md-02614
District Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 12:24 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitch Even Tabin & Flannery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole L. Little +1 312 577 7000 +1 312 577 7007 nlittle@fitcheven.com
Space Timothy Paul Maloney +1 312 577 7000 +1 312 577 7007 tim@fitcheven.com
Space Alison Aubry Richards +1 312 577 7000 +1 312 577 7007 arichards@fitcheven.com
Space Steven C. Schroer +1 303 402 6966 +1 303 402 6970 Scschr@fitcheven.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
Space Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
Space Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A Gosse +1 312 577 7000 +1 312 577 7007 dgosse@fitcheven.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jared E Hedman +1 630 756 3100 +1 630 756 3101 jhedman@irwinip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
Space Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
No Logo Defendants' Lead Counsel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Brett Johnson +1 214 747 5070 johnson@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin J Malaney +1 414 319 7067 +1 414 297 4900 kmalaney@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keck, Mahin & Cate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey N. Costakos +1 414 297 5782 +1 414 297 4900 jcostakos@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Horwitz +1 302 984 6000 rhorwitz@potteranderson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda K Branch +1 650 802 3138 +1 650 802 3100 amanda.branch@weil.com
Space T Ray Guy +1 214 746 7872 +1 214 746 7777 ray.guy@weil.com
Space Audrey L Maness +1 713 546 5000 +1 713 224 9511 audrey.maness@weil.com
Space Andrew Louis Perito +1 650 802 3993 +1 650 802 3100 andrew.perito@weil.com
Space Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo ADR Provider, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 180

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Hesha Abrams +1 214 415 8797 +1 214 550 2598 nancy@heshaabramsmediation.com
No Logo Special Master, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Scott Woloson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Scott Woloson +1 281 352 9878 +1 281 978 2172 scott@scottwolosonlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
(Document Restricted) IPT's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal its Motion to Compel Defendants to Provide Fact Discovery Relevant to the Variable Data Patents (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Plaintiff IPT's Motion to Compel Defendants to Provide Fact Discovery Relevant to the Variable Data Patents, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Plaintiff IPT's Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants to Provide Fact Discovery Relevant to the Variable Data Patents, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Appendix Part 1, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Appendix Part 2, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5 - Appendix Part 3, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6 - Appendix Part 4, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7 - Appendix Part 5) (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for telephone conference regarding various matters, including status of discovery, held on 2/23/16 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Attorney appearances: Plaintiff - Alison Richards; Defense - Edward Reines. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in court - 30 minutes. (ash) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Claim Construction Proceedings held on November 14, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public termin If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (239 pages) Redaction Request due 3/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2016. (dkj) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/12/2016) (twd) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting Plaintiff Industrial Print Technologies LLC's 30 Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel: It is ORDERED that Jared E. Hedman be withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/8/2016) (twd) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Jared E. Hedman) filed by Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Markman Hearing held on 11/14/2015. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - David Gosse; Defense - Ed Reines. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 5:30. (axm) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER GRANTING MDL DEFENDANTS' 27 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: It is ORDERED that Andrew L. Perito be withdrawn as attorney of record for MDL Defendants. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/10/2015) (twd) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew L. Perito filed by Defendants' Lead Counsel (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Kathryn Branch on behalf of Defendants' Lead Counsel. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Branch, Amanda) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Technology Tutorial held on 10/29/2015. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - David Gosse, Brannon Latimer; Defense - Edward Reines, Audrey Maness. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:30. (mem) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RESPONSE filed by Defendants' Lead Counsel re: 22 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Appendix to Defs' Responsive Claim Construction Brief) (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          IPT's Reply Brief on Claim Construction filed by Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Appendix) (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            IPT's Opening Brief on Claim Construction filed by Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Appendix (part 1), # 2 Plaintifff's Appendix (part 2), # 3 Plaintiff's Appendix (part 3), # 4 Plaintiff's Appendix (part 4)) (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Defendants' Lead Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibits A-H to Defs' Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Appendix Exhibits I-S to Defs' Claim Construction Brief) (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 10/6/2015. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Tim Maloney, Alison Richards; Defense - Edward Reines, Audrey Maness, Andrew Perito, Brett Johnson. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :15. (jrr) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Memorandum Opinion and Order denying (64 in 3:15-cv-00165-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Hewlett Packard Company, Cenveo Inc, (155 in 3:15-cv-01100-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Quad/Graphics, Inc., Hewlett Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems Inc, (73 in 3:15-cv-01101-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Hewlett Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems Inc, (50 in 3:15-cv-01103-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Quad/Graphics Inc, Hewlett-Packard Company, (51 in 3:15-cv-01104-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, (53 in 3:15-cv-01106-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Vistaprint USA Inc, Hewlett-Packard Company, (68 in 3:15-cv-01195-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Fort Dearborn Company, Hewlett-Packard Company. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/7/2015) (jrr) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Defense Counsel Roles Pursuant to the Court's Order for Clarification re: 17 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, filed by Defendants' Lead Counsel (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER: On 9/4/2015, M. Brett Johnson filed a Notice of Appearance for "the MDL Defendants" in each action. In light of these Notices, the Court requests that all defense counsel clarify their roles in this litigation by filing a statement in the MDL matter, Case No. 3:15-md-02614-M, on or before 9/21/2015 indicating whether they are acting as lead counsel, local counsel, or in some other representative capacity. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/15/2015) (bdb) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER SETTING TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL: The parties may present a technology tutorial to the Court on 10/29/2015. The parties must exchange their final slide show and other presentation materials with each other on or before 10/16/2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/8/2015) (jrr) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER: Going forward from the date of this Order, a filing that relates to all cases must be filed only once, in the Master Docket, and must be identified by the notation, "THIS DOCUMENT RELATES TO ALL CASES." A filing that relates to fewer than all cases must still be filed in each appropriate individual action or actions and must be identified by the notation, "THIS DOCUMENT RELATES TO [CIVIL ACTION NO. ] [CIVIL ACTION NOS. ]." (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/8/2015) (jrr) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 9/1/2015. The Court held a telephone conference to discuss the parties' Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement and other logistical and scheduling matters. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Tim Maloney; Defense - Edward Reines. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (axm) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting 12 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Counsel for Plaintiff Industrial Technologies, L.L.C. and Request for Termination of Electronic Notices. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that T. John Ward, Jr., J. Wesley Hill, Claire A. Henry and Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC are permitted to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Industrial Technologies, L.L.C. effective the date of this order. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/1/2015) (tln) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney T. John Ward, Jr., J. Wesley Hill, Claire A. Henry, and Ward, Smith, & Hill, PLLC filed by Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Cecil, Thomas) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 8/4/2015. The Court held a telephone conference to discuss Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in 3:15cv1101, Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings, and scheduling matters. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Alison Richards, Nicole Little, Tim Maloney, Steven Schroer; Defense - Edward Reines, Audrey Maness, Andrew Perito. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (axm) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER: Defendant may file under seal their Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings, as well as the Amended Answers and Counterclaims and excerpts from the 12/11/2015 Deposition Transcript of Cristin Wagner, which are attached as exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings. The foregoing documents will be deemed filed as of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/8/2015) (jrr) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER: The Court Orders that the parties' respective Amended Infringement and Amended Invalidity Contentions are deemed served as of May 11 and June 12, 2015, respectively. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/7/2015) (jrr) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Rule 16 Conference Proceedings held on June 22, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (62 pages) Redaction Request due 7/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2015. (dkj) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          AGREED ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY: This order supplements all other discovery rules and orders. It streamlines Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") production to promote a "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination" of this action, as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 1. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/30/2015) (axm) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER: In light of the parties' Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that Defendants Cenveo, Inc., Fort Dearborn Co., Quad/Graphics, Inc., Vistaprint U.S.A., Inc. and Hewlett-Packard Company have until 6/12/2015 to serve Initial Invalidity Contentions in Case No. 3:15-cv-00165-M, Case No. 3:15-cv-01106-M, and Case No. 3:15-cv-01195-M; and Defendants O'Neil Data Systems, Inc., Quad/Graphics, Inc. and Hewlett-Packard Company have until 6/12/2015, to provide IPT with proposed Amended Invalidity Contentions in Case No. 3:15-cv- 01100-M, Case No. 3:15-cv-01101-M, Case No. 3:15-cv-01103-M, and Case No. 3:15-cv-01104-M. The parties are ORDERED to thereafter meet and confer regarding their respective proposed amendments prior to presenting the Court with any motions for leave to amend. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/2/2015) (twd) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Prior to the Rule 16 Conference [Docket Nos. 39, 132, 43, 27, 28, 28, 41]. The Motion is granted, except with respect to the discovery Defendants have already agreed to provide by May 15th and document production by GMC Software. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/12/2015) (jrr) (Main Document 5 replaced to correct format on 5/12/2015) (gmg). (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER regarding pretrial proceedings in MDL Master Docket 3:15-md-2614 and individual cases. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2015 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. A default agenda routinely used in patent cases before Judge Lynn is included as Exhibit A. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/27/2015) (gmg) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 4/20/2015. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Alison Richards, Nicole Little, Tom Cecil; Defense - Sonal Mehta, Evan Budai, Audrey Maness. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :35. (skt) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    TRANSFER ORDER: The JPML has issued the attached order transferring one or more cases to the NDTX in MDL 2614, and that order has now been filed in the NDTX. Upon receipt of this NEF, each transferor court should enter this order, which has been certified as required, in each affected action and effect transfer without delay. Please do not close the case before transfer (if possible) but do include in the extraction function Remarks field the MDL number, title of this order, and a contact name. (If this court should use a different contact to request a future MDL-related transfer, please notify us at InterdistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (skt) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      CONSENT OF TRANSFEREE COURT: The attached order has been entered by the JPML in MDL 2614. (skt) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 161 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?