Agina v. Chertoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11234-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eugene Okechukwu Agina, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Andrea J. Cabral, Respondent
No Logo Bruce Chadbourne, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Crowley +1 617 565 2415 Frank.Crowley@dhs.gov
No Logo Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement, Respondent
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Respondent
Office Boston
Filed 6/13/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Suffolk
Terminated 9/12/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, HABEAS
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Nicewicz, Craig)
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Motions terminated: ALLOWING [5] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bruce Chadbourne,, DENYING [4] MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Eugene Okechukwu Agina, DISMISSING [1] Petition.(Nicewicz, Craig)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE by Bruce Chadbourne of Intent to Execute Removal Order on September 13, 2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment A)(Crowley, Frank)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Response to Motion
        RESPONSE to Motion re [5] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eugene Okechukwu Agina. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
          MEMORANDUM in Support re [5] MOTION to Dismiss , and Return filed by Bruce Chadbourne. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment A)(Crowley, Frank)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION to Dismiss by Bruce Chadbourne.(Crowley, Frank)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Motion to Appoint Counsel
              MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eugene Okechukwu Agina.(Elefther, Elizabeth)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                Letter from Eugene Agina to Mr. Bruce Chadbourne of U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Service Order - 2241 PetitionCourt Filing
                  Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 60 days of rcpt of this order.(Elefther, Elizabeth)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241
                    PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) $ 5, receipt number 64924, filed by Eugene Okechukwu Agina. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Elefther, Elizabeth)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 76 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?