Long Corner Consumer Electronics LLC v. Spectralink Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00519

Tags
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 7:46 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Long Corner Consumer Electronics LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Spectralink Corporation, Defendant
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 284 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?