STEWART v. MABUS

Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00576
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 11:15 PM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo ALEXANDER E. STEWART, Plaintiff

Represented by The Federal Practice Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Sebastian Montalvo +1 202 862 4360 emontalvo@fedpractice.com
v.
No Logo RAY MABUS, Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Alter Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Administrative Record
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Surreply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 12 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?