Almeida v. Pfizer, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11264-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Monica Almeida, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saggese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc A. Saggese +1 702 796 8882 +1 702 382 9309
v.
Pfizer, Inc. Pfizer, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Arqule, Inc.
Unknown Role, Icagen, Inc.
Unknown Role, Zoetis Inc.
Unknown Role, Celladon Corp
Unknown Role, Pfizer Production LLC
Unknown Role, Icu Medical Inc/de
Unknown Role, Upjohn Inc
Unknown Role, Insite Vision, Inc.
Unknown Role, pSivida LTD
Unknown Role, Cortexyme, Inc.
Unknown Role, Imara Inc.
Unknown Role, Bioatla, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Laxalt & Nomura, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela M Bader +1 775 322 1170 +1 775 322 1865 abader@laxalt-nomura.com
Space Steven E Guinn +1 775 322 1170 +1 775 322 1865 sguinn@laxalt-nomura.com
Office Boston
Filed 6/16/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Statistical Closing
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/20/2005
Origin 6
Reopened
Lead Case
104-cv-10981-PBS None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MDL
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 MDL Record received
MDL Record received from District of Nevada. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Removal District of Nevada# (2) Notice of Removal Exhibit A# (3) Notice of Removal Exhibit B)(Paine, Matthew)
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Order consolidating casesCourt Filing
    Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER consolidating cases; In order to facilitate the orderly management of the Neurontin related litigation the Court enters the following Order consolidating all cases presently pending in this Court that were transferred by the MDL to this Court under MDL Docket Number 1629. In Re Neurontin, C.A. No. 04-10981-PBS will be the lead case.(Paine, Matthew)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Administratively Closed. (Paine, Matthew)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 MDL Case Transferred In - District Transfer
        MDL Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 04-1694., filed by Monica Almeida. (Attachments: # (1) Original Docket)(Abaid, Kim)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 35 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?