Sexton v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:14-cv-03509
District Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 5:08 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lacie Sexton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson Becker PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J Becker +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 tbecker@johnsonbecker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROLF T. FIEBIGER +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 fiebiger@johnsonbecker.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael K. Johnson +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 mjohnson@johnsonbecker.com
v.
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Defendant
Bayer Oy Bayer Oy, Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG Bayer Pharma AG, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-67), transferring case to the Southern District of New York per MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. (AKL) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
    Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG. (JAM) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 14-cv-3509 PJS/SER. (JAM) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT against Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4128690.) Filed by Lacie Sexton. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 176 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?